AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY v. COOK COUNTY LAND VENTURES, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: COOK COUNTY LAND VENTURES LLC, BUSH FAMILY PROPERTIES LLC, ELDEN HOLMES and WILLIAM H BUSH
Case Number: 7:2019cv00087
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. as to ELDEN HOLMES (ABT, ELLEN)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/19/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(nop)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Jurisdictional Statement by WILLIAM H BUSH, BUSH FAMILY PROPERTIES LLC, COOK COUNTY LAND VENTURES LLC (GARLAND, JAMES)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILLIAM H BUSH, BUSH FAMILY PROPERTIES LLC, COOK COUNTY LAND VENTURES LLC (GARLAND, JAMES)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by WILLIAM H BUSH, BUSH FAMILY PROPERTIES LLC, COOK COUNTY LAND VENTURES LLC with Jury Demand.(GARLAND, JAMES)Attorney JAMES A GARLAND added to party WILLIAM H BUSH(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES A GARLAND added to party BUSH FAMILY PROPERTIES LLC(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES A GARLAND added to party COOK COUNTY LAND VENTURES LLC(pty:dft)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (rlw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COOK COUNTY LAND VENTURES, L.L.C. (rlw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM H. BUSH. (rlw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BUSH FAMILY PROPERTIES, LLC. (rlw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (ABT, ELLEN)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY for AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (ABT, ELLEN)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3190742, $400 filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Underlying Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit C- Reservation of Rights, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Bush Family, #6 Summons William Bush, #7 Summons Cook County Land Ventures)(ABT, ELLEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY v. COOK COUNTY LAND VENTURES, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK COUNTY LAND VENTURES LLC
Represented By: JAMES A GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUSH FAMILY PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By: JAMES A GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELDEN HOLMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM H BUSH
Represented By: JAMES A GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL C KENDALL
Represented By: ELLEN V ABT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?