KOH v. PAULK
Petitioner: JUNNE KYOO KOH
Respondent: WARDEN PAULK
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 7:2019cv00107
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE Lead Case # 7:19-cv-12. Member Case # 7:19-cv-107. The Clerk is directed to administratively close case number 7:19-cv-107. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-12-19. (jdl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Application for Habeas Corpus Relief by PAULK filed by AMELIA GODFREY HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. Musante, Supervisory Detention and Deportation Officer, #2 Exhibit A - G to Musante Declaration). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JUNNE KYOO KOH. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-8--19. (jdl)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
August 8, 2019 Filing fee Paid: Habeas $5.00, Receipt No. 42240. (sbd) Modified text on 8/8/2019 (sbd).
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned - #3 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by JUNNE KYOO KOH, #2 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Notice of Deficiency, sent to Junne Kyoo Koh returned as undeliverable. (rlw)
July 22, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JUNNE KYOO KOH ); You must either pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal by the court. An Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit are enclosed. (sbd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JUNNE KYOO KOH. (sbd)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (sbd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by JUNNE KYOO KOH. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(sbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOH v. PAULK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN PAULK
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JUNNE KYOO KOH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?