FLOWERS v. TISHCO PROPERTIES LLC
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL FLOWERS
Defendant: TISHCO PROPERTIES LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00126
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RYAN B HOBBS (nop)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CRYSTAL FLOWERS Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # BGAMDC-3265393, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Issued on 9.17.19)(HOBBS, RYAN)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Corrected RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/29/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 03:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 9/11/2019. (jbk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 CORRECTED AND RE-FILED AT #9 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/29/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 03:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 9/11/2019. (jbk) Modified on 9/11/2019 (jbk).
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TISHCO PROPERTIES LLC (WILLCOX, C)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by TISHCO PROPERTIES LLC with Jury Demand.(WILLCOX, C)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C JASON WILLCOX on behalf of TISHCO PROPERTIES LLC Attorney C JASON WILLCOX added to party TISHCO PROPERTIES LLC(pty:dft) (WILLCOX, C)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CRYSTAL FLOWERS as to TISHCO PROPERTIES LLC. (MOLAGHAN, RYAN)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CRYSTAL FLOWERS (rlw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TISHCO PROPERTIES LLC. (rlw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TISHCO PROPERTIES LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3233966, $400 filed by CRYSTAL FLOWERS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. - Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons to be Issued)(MOLAGHAN, RYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLOWERS v. TISHCO PROPERTIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL FLOWERS
Represented By: RYAN P MOLAGHAN
Represented By: RYAN B HOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TISHCO PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By: C JASON WILLCOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?