BAKALA v. ALBENCE et al
Petitioner: CONSTANTIN BAKALA
Respondent: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, SEAN GALLAGHER, WILLIAM BARR, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, Major DAVID PAULK, MATTHEW T ALBENCE and DAVID PAULK
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 7:2019cv00127
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT dismissing the case. (sbd)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by MATTHEW T ALBENCE, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, DAVID PAULK, WILLIAM BARR, SEAN GALLAGHER. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/26/19. (sbd)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAVID PAULK, WILLIAM BARR, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, MATTHEW T ALBENCE, SEAN GALLAGHER as to All Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ICE Form I-830)(HELMICK, AMELIA)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JESSICA MYERS VOSBURGH (nop)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-15-19. (rcg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MATTHEW T ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, SEAN GALLAGHER, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, DAVID PAULK (HELMICK, AMELIA)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CONSTANTIN BAKALA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-13-19. (rcg)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL HILLARY LI - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (sbd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CONSTANTIN BAKALA. (sbd)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (sbd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst CONSTANTIN BAKALA Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3234105, $5 filed by CONSTANTIN BAKALA (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Phi Nguyen with Exhibit 1)(NGUYEN, PHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAKALA v. ALBENCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CONSTANTIN BAKALA
Represented By: PHI NGUYEN
Represented By: HILLARY LI
Represented By: JESSICA MYERS VOSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SEAN GALLAGHER
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Major DAVID PAULK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T ALBENCE
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID PAULK
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?