GUEYE v. BICKHAM et al
Petitioner: MAMADOU M GUEYE
Respondent: SEAN GALLAGHER, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, WILLIAM BARR and PHIL BICKHAM
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 7:2019cv00133
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by WILLIAM BARR, PHIL BICKHAM, SEAN GALLAGHER, KEVIN K MCALEENAN re #9 Order for Response, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scarberry Declaration)(SHOEMAKER, BOWEN)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Respondents to file supplemental briefing within fourteen (14) days. Petitioner may respond within fourteen (14) days from the day Respondents file their supplemental briefing. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9-23-19. (rcg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by MAMADOU M GUEYE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition (DUTTA, KREETEE)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition by WILLIAM BARR, PHIL BICKHAM, SEAN GALLAGHER, KEVIN K MCALEENAN filed by BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(SHOEMAKER, BOWEN)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-19-19. (rcg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by WILLIAM BARR, PHIL BICKHAM, SEAN GALLAGHER, KEVIN K MCALEENAN (SHOEMAKER, BOWEN)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-16-19. (rcg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to MAMADOU M GUEYE (rlw)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw)
August 16, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): Notice to Counsel - Kreetee Dutta. Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER including address, telephone number and email address. (rlw)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst WILLIAM BARR, PHIL BICKHAM, SEAN GALLAGHER, KEVIN K MCALEENAN Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3238340, $5 filed by MAMADOU M GUEYE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - ICE Travel Document, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Consulate Travel Document, #4 Summons Summons Bickham, #5 Summons Summons Gallagher, #6 Summons Summons McAleenan, #7 Summons Summons Barr, #8 Summons Summons Peeler)(DUTTA, KREETEE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUEYE v. BICKHAM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SEAN GALLAGHER
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PHIL BICKHAM
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MAMADOU M GUEYE
Represented By: KREETEE DUTTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?