PERNIA v. BICKHAM
Petitioner: JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA
Respondent: Warden BICKHAM
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 7:2019cv00164
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sheriff Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Aska Declaration)(SHOEMAKER, BOWEN)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned - #3 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA, #2 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #4 Order for Response (Habeas Petition) sent to Jose Daniel Perez Pernia Irwin County Detention returned as undeliverable. (Attachments: #1 Returned Envelope - Stewart Detention) (rlw)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-3-19. (rcg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by BICKHAM (HELMICK, AMELIA)
October 3, 2019 REMARK: Notified by telephone that Petitioner has been transferred to Adams County Correctional Center. He is mailing in a change of address. (rlw)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
October 1, 2019 REMARK: Notified by telephone that Petitioner has been transferred to Stewart Detention Center. He is mailing in change of address today. (sbd)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9-30-19. (jdl)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA (rlw)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA. ( Filing fee $ 5 Receipt number 42245.) (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Envelope)(rlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERNIA v. BICKHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden BICKHAM
Represented By: BOWEN REICHERT SHOEMAKER
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE DANIEL PEREZ PERNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?