CROMARTIE v. SHEALY et al
Plaintiff: RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE
Defendant: RANDA WHARTON, BRADFORD SHEALY and BRADFIELD SHEALY
Case Number: 7:2019cv00181
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Referring Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 20 MANDATE of USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court as to #13 Notice of Appeal filed by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(sbd)
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIORARI DENIED as to #13 Notice of Appeal filed by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE. (sbd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 USCA Order denying Appellant's renewed motion for stay of execution as to #13 Notice of Appeal filed by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(rlw)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 USCA Order/Opinion as to #13 Notice of Appeal filed by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(sbd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 USCA Case Number 19-14268-P re #13 Notice of Appeal filed by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE. (sbd)
October 29, 2019 Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #13 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (sbd)
October 29, 2019 Appeal Instructions re #13 Notice of Appeal. The Transcript Information Form and instructions are available on the District Court website under Forms & Guides. **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 11/15/2019. (sbd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #14 Judgment, #12 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #13 Notice of Appeal Judge Appealed: Judge Treadwell. Fee: Not Paid. (sbd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT dismissing the case. (sbd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE. (ADJOIAN, AREN)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DENYING #6 Motion to Stay; and GRANTING #9 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 10/28/2019. (kat)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED #1 Complaint (IFP), against RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE (ADJOIAN, AREN)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Corrected) (ADJOIAN, AREN)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Corrected) by BRADFIELD SHEALY filed by SABRINA D GRAHAM.(GRAHAM, SABRINA)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by BRADFIELD SHEALY filed by SABRINA D GRAHAM.(GRAHAM, SABRINA)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE re: #6 MOTION to Stay Execution Pending Disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint Filed Pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(ADJOIAN, AREN)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Execution Pending Disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint Filed Pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983 by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE filed by AREN K ADJOIAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ADJOIAN, AREN)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TINA M PIPER on behalf of All Defendants Attorney TINA M PIPER added to party BRADFORD SHEALY(pty:dft), Attorney TINA M PIPER added to party RANDA WHARTON(pty:dft) (PIPER, TINA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SABRINA D GRAHAM on behalf of All Defendants Attorney SABRINA D GRAHAM added to party BRADFORD SHEALY(pty:dft), Attorney SABRINA D GRAHAM added to party RANDA WHARTON(pty:dft) (GRAHAM, SABRINA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BETH A BURTON on behalf of All Defendants Attorney BETH A BURTON added to party BRADFORD SHEALY(pty:dft), Attorney BETH A BURTON added to party RANDA WHARTON(pty:dft) (BURTON, BETH)
October 23, 2019 US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL added. US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON no longer assigned to case. (sbd)
October 23, 2019 **PLEASE DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR** NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (sbd) Modified on 10/23/2019 (sbd).
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE filed by AREN K ADJOIAN. (Attachments: #1 Required Form Motion to Proceed Without Payment of Fees and Affidavit, #2 Required Form Certified Inmate Account Statement)(ADJOIAN, AREN)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE filed by RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Part 1, #3 Appendix Part 2, #4 Appendix Part 3, #5 Appendix Part 4, #6 Appendix Part 5, #7 Appendix Part 6, #8 Appendix Part 7)(ADJOIAN, AREN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROMARTIE v. SHEALY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDA WHARTON
Represented By: TINA M PIPER
Represented By: BETH A BURTON
Represented By: SABRINA D GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADFORD SHEALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADFIELD SHEALY
Represented By: TINA M PIPER
Represented By: BETH A BURTON
Represented By: SABRINA D GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAY JEFFERSON CROMARTIE
Represented By: ERIC JOHN MONTROY
Represented By: AREN K ADJOIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?