STEPHENS V. THOMAS COUNTY JAIL
Plaintiff: KELVIN STEPHENS
Defendant: THOMAS COUNTY JAIL, Captain RON JAMES and Lt. VIRGINIA WILLIAMS
Respondent: Sheriff R CARLTON POWELL
Case Number: 7:2019cv00182
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Referring Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
December 12, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE filed by RON JAMES, R CARLTON POWELL, VIRGINIA WILLIAMS re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (SEWELL, MICHAEL)
December 12, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR on behalf of R CARLTON POWELL Attorney MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR added to party R CARLTON POWELL(pty:res) (SEWELL, MICHAEL)
December 12, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
December 9, 2019 Filing 31 OBJECTION to #23 Report and Recommendations filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 30 OBJECTION to #23 Report and Recommendations filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
December 2, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (TRO) Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
November 27, 2019 Filing 28 OBJECTION to #23 Report and Recommendations filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
November 27, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Subpoena Records filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(sbd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 26 OBJECTION to #23 Report and Recommendations filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Envelope, #2 Envelope)(sbd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of OBJECTIONS to #23 Report and Recommendations filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 24 RECAST #18 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against R CARLTON POWELL by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #2 Statement of Petitioner) (sbd).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Petitioner's motion to proceed IFP, Directing Service, and requiring Petitioner to file a recast Petition, and ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: Recast Petition filed by KELVIN STEPHENS ; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: #14 Petitioner's motion for preliminary injunction and #19 Petitioner's motion for summary judgment. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 11/20/2019. (TQL)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 Standard Form 95 - Claim for Damage, Injury, or Death by KELVIN STEPHENS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from Plaintiff regarding copy of Inmate Account (Attachments: #1 Letter re: $5.00 filing fee for habeas petition, #2 Envelope)(rlw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 18 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER SECTION 2241 filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 RECAST #1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, against THOMAS COUNTY JAIL by KELVIN STEPHENS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 RECAST #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by KELVIN STEPHENS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Plaintiff / Petitioner to Recast his Complaint or Petition using the appropriate standard form, to either pay the appropriate filing fee or seek to proceed IFP, and denying #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File, denying as moot #7 , #9 , #10 , #11 , and #12 Plaintiff's Motions to Amend/Correct, and denying #13 Plaintiff's Motion to Subpoena. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 11/5/2019. (TQL)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Subpoena Records Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Timeline, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw) Modified text on 11/5/2019 (rlw).
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Order filed on 10/24/2019 Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Memo to Sgt. Smallwood, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, Filed by KELVIN STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Various handwritten documents, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(rlw)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to KELVIN STEPHENS (rlw)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04536. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Georgia, Valdosta Division, for further proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/24/19. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 10/24/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kelvin Stephens re #3 Order. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 10/24/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman terminated from case. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 10/24/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Claim for Damage, Injury, or Death by Kelvin Stephens re #1 Complaint. (bnp) [Transferred from gand on 10/24/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Submission of #1 Complaint for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop) [Transferred from gand on 10/24/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, titled, Motion for Redress; Motion for Illegal Incarceration, filed by Kelvin Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 10/15/2019 (eop). [Transferred from gand on 10/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEPHENS V. THOMAS COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain RON JAMES
Represented By: MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. VIRGINIA WILLIAMS
Represented By: MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELVIN STEPHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff R CARLTON POWELL
Represented By: MICHAEL CLAY SEWELL, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?