DIAZ v. SULLIVAN et al
Petitioner: JOSE MAURO DIAZ
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR, K SULLIVAN and D PAULK
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 7:2019cv00183
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned - #9 Order sent to Jose Mauro Diaz returned as undeliverable. (sbd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned - #7 Order for Response (Habeas Petition), Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, sent to Jose Mauro Diaz returned as undeliverable. (sbd)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER notifying Petitioner of #8 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-15-19. (rcg)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Application for Habeas Corpus relief by WILLIAM BARR, D PAULK, K SULLIVAN filed by AMELIA G HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Supervision). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Respondents to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-13-19. (rcg)
November 8, 2019 Filing fee Paid: $5.00, Receipt 42353. (rlw)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlw)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to pay filing fee or submit proper motion to proceed IFP. The Clerk is directed to mail Petitioner the appropriate forms. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-29-19. (rcg)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JOSE MAURO DIAZ. (sbd)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (sbd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JOSE MAURO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(sbd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by JOSE MAURO DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIAZ v. SULLIVAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K SULLIVAN
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D PAULK
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE MAURO DIAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?