KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN v. JAY GANESH FOOD MART, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC and KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN
Defendant: NEEL FOOD MART INC and JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC
Case Number: 7:2020cv00046
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff to file its motion for default judgment is extended through June 11, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 5/12/2020. (aks)
May 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment. by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC filed by CHRISTIAN R RUIZ.(RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by THOMAS L HOLT. Docketed separately due to error in combined entry. (nop)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by THOMAS L HOLT, JEREMY L BUXBAUM (Attachments: #1 PHV Admission) (nop)
April 21, 2020 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC, NEEL FOOD MART INC - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (rlw)
April 21, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #15 Motion for Entry of Default filed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC ); Wrong event used - No need to refile - correct event is Application to Clerk for Entry of Default. (rlw)
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christian Ruiz ISO Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendants)(RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC filed by CHRISTIAN R RUIZ.(RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
March 26, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC as to JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC. (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC as to JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC. (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
March 26, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC as to JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC. (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
March 26, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC as to NEEL FOOD MART INC. (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC as to NEEL FOOD MART INC. (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC as to NEEL FOOD MART INC. (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
March 25, 2020 REMARK: PHV petition deadline terminated for attorneys Thomas Holt and Jeremy Buxbaum who will comply with the requirements on or before 5/16/2020 (due to coronavirus). (nop)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 AO120, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. Forwarded this date, by virtue of this notice, to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, Alexandria, VA. (rlw)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC (rlw)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to NEEL FOOD MART INC. (rlw)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC. (rlw)
March 17, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL THOMAS L HOLT, JEREMY L BUXBAUM - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (rlw)
March 17, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC ); Documents must include a description of exhibit(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. The description must be of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court. No need to refile; docket entry has been corrected by case administrator. (rlw)
March 17, 2020 Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER no longer assigned to the case. (rlw)
March 17, 2020 This is a text only entry; no document issued.CASE TRANSFERRED TO Valdosta Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 Statement. (bcl)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHRISTIAN R RUIZ on behalf of KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN re #1 Complaint, (RUIZ, CHRISTIAN)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3418628, $400 filed by KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Jay Ganesh Food Mart, LLC, #4 Summons Neel Food Mart, Inc.)(RUIZ, CHRISTIAN) Modified text on 3/17/2020 (rlw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS, LLC d/b/a KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN v. JAY GANESH FOOD MART, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISPY KRUNCHY FOODS LLC
Represented By: THOMAS L HOLT
Represented By: JEREMY L BUXBAUM
Represented By: CHRISTIAN R RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISPY KRUNCHY CHICKEN
Represented By: THOMAS L HOLT
Represented By: JEREMY L BUXBAUM
Represented By: CHRISTIAN R RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEEL FOOD MART INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY GANESH FOOD MART LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?