CELLCO PARTNERSHIP v. CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA et al
Plaintiff: CELLCO PARTNERSHIP
Defendant: CITY COUNCIL FOR THE CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA, VIVIAN MILLER-CODY, ERIC HOWARD, SANDRA TOOLEY, ANDREW GIBBS, BEN H HORTON, CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA, JOSEPH VICKERS, TIMOTHY H CARROLL and IVY N CADLE
Case Number: 7:2020cv00050
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by VINCENT G NELAN (nop)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by W PATTON HAHN (nop)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3455788, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Ivy Cadle 353227. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CADLE, IVY)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by IVY N CADLE Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3455724, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Ivy Cadle 353227. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CADLE, IVY)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 5/29/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc for CELLCO PARTNERSHIP. (CADLE, IVY)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (rlw)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by TIMOTHY H CARROLL, CITY COUNCIL FOR THE CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA, CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA, ANDREW GIBBS, BEN H HORTON, ERIC HOWARD, VIVIAN MILLER-CODY, SANDRA TOOLEY, JOSEPH VICKERS.(TANNER, TIMOTHY)Attorney TIMOTHY M TANNER added to party TIMOTHY H CARROLL(pty:dft), Attorney TIMOTHY M TANNER added to party CITY COUNCIL FOR THE CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA(pty:dft), Attorney TIMOTHY M TANNER added to party CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA(pty:dft), Attorney TIMOTHY M TANNER added to party ANDREW GIBBS(pty:dft), Attorney TIMOTHY M TANNER added to party BEN H HORTON(pty:dft), Attorney TIMOTHY M TANNER added to party ERIC HOWARD(pty:dft), Attorney TIMOTHY M TANNER added to party VIVIAN MILLER-CODY(pty:dft), Attorney TIMOTHY M TANNER added to party SANDRA TOOLEY(pty:dft), Attorney TIMOTHY M TANNER added to party JOSEPH VICKERS(pty:dft)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CELLCO PARTNERSHIP (rlw)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITY COUNCIL FOR THE CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA. (rlw)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA. (rlw)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON no longer assigned to the case. (rlw)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3427236, $400 filed by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Zoning, #2 Exhibit Zoning Report, #3 Exhibit City's Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Case Opening Form, #5 Summons City Summons, #6 Summons City Council Summons)(CADLE, IVY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CELLCO PARTNERSHIP v. CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY COUNCIL FOR THE CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA
Represented By: EMILY E MACHESKI-PRESTON
Represented By: TIMOTHY M TANNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIVIAN MILLER-CODY
Represented By: EMILY E MACHESKI-PRESTON
Represented By: TIMOTHY M TANNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC HOWARD
Represented By: EMILY E MACHESKI-PRESTON
Represented By: TIMOTHY M TANNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA TOOLEY
Represented By: EMILY E MACHESKI-PRESTON
Represented By: TIMOTHY M TANNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW GIBBS
Represented By: EMILY E MACHESKI-PRESTON
Represented By: TIMOTHY M TANNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN H HORTON
Represented By: EMILY E MACHESKI-PRESTON
Represented By: TIMOTHY M TANNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF VALDOSTA GEORGIA
Represented By: EMILY E MACHESKI-PRESTON
Represented By: TIMOTHY M TANNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH VICKERS
Represented By: EMILY E MACHESKI-PRESTON
Represented By: TIMOTHY M TANNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY H CARROLL
Represented By: EMILY E MACHESKI-PRESTON
Represented By: TIMOTHY M TANNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVY N CADLE
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELLCO PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Represented By: VINCENT G NELAN
Represented By: W PATTON HAHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?