KEGLEY et al v. FLETCHER
Case Number: 7:2020cv00135
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Valdosta Office
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER for the Parties to file the necessary dismissal document(s) in writing no later than Friday, June 17, 2022 or, by the same deadline, file with the Court a motion for additional time explaining why additional time is needed. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/18/2022. (sbd)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER for the parties to file a joint status report no later than Monday, May 16, 2022 stating whether discovery is complete and they are ready to proceed to trial or whether this case has been resolved and the motion in limine is now moot. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/10/2022. (sbd)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Compel. Defendant must serve amended Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents that comply with the Local Rules of this Court no later th an Friday, February 4, 2022, and Plaintiffs SHALL respond thereto no later than Friday, February 25, 2022. The Court sua sponte extends the close of discovery to Friday, March 18, 2022. Dispositive motions are due no later than Monday, April 18, 2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/21/2022. (rlw)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER memorializing the instructions given at the pretrial conference. The Court instructed defense counsel to file a motion to continue the trial and to reopen the discovery period no later than Friday, October 22, 2021. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motion no later than Friday, October 29, 2021. Plaintiffs' counsel is hereby ORDERED to file a written response to this Order no later than Friday, October 22, 2021 explaining why counsel failed to attend the pretrial conference. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 10/14/2021. (rlw)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for the parties to prepare and email to the Clerks Office a joint proposed pretrial order immediately and no later than Friday, October 8, 2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 10/7/2021. (sbd)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 14 Motion to Compel. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 9/15/2021. (sbd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEGLEY et al v. FLETCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?