VARN v. NASHVILLE, GA ET AL
Plaintiff: Richard M Varn, II
Defendant: City of Nashville Georgia, Chief Charles Edwards and NASHVILLE GEORGIA
Case Number: 7:2022cv00054
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs as to All Defendants. (WARREN, MALCOLM)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NASHVILLE GEORGIA. (rlw)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CHARLES EDWARDS. (rlw)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(WARREN, MALCOLM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2022: #3 Completed Civil Cover Sheet) (rlw).
June 9, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by RICHARD M VARN, II ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(rlw)
June 9, 2022 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by RICHARD M VARN, II ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9. Use the Complaint (IFP) event to avoid duplicate payment. Also, include as an attachment a completed JS44 Civil Cover Sheet and a completed AO 440 Summons form.(rlw)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4106523, $402 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(WARREN, MALCOLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VARN v. NASHVILLE, GA ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard M Varn, II
Represented By: MALCOLM JAMAL WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Nashville Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Charles Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASHVILLE GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?