ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC
Plaintiff: ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS, INC. and BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC
Case Number: 7:2022cv00113
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,, by BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC with Jury Demand.(MIDDLETON, F)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #16 Amended Answer to Complaint filed by BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Answer and then you link it to the Amended Complaint.(ksl)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ANSWER by BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC. (MIDDLETON, F)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/24/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2023 03:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/30/2022. (gda)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED #1 Complaint,,,,,, against BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC by ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CGL Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Umbrella Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - City of Rome Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - City of Rome Short Form, #5 Exhibit 5 - Clinch County Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - Clinch County Short Form, #7 Exhibit 7 - City of Opp Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - City of Opp Short Form, #9 Exhibit 9 - Grady County Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 - Grady County Short Form, #11 Exhibit 11 - DeKalb County Complaint, #12 Exhibit 12 - City of Atlanta Complaint, #13 Exhibit 13 - Berkeley County Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit 14 - Bon Secours Complaint, #15 Exhibit 15 - Bon Secours Short Form, #16 Exhibit 16 - Pierce County Complaint, #17 Exhibit 17 - Pierce County Short Form, #18 Exhibit 18 - Jackson County Complaint, #19 Exhibit 19 - Jackson County Short Form, #20 Exhibit 20 - ApolloMD LLC Complaint, #21 Exhibit 21 - Wilcox County Complaint, #22 Exhibit 22 - Wilcox County Short Form, #23 Exhibit 23 - Heard County Complaint, #24 Exhibit 24 - Heard County Short Form, #25 Exhibit 25 - March 13, 2018 Reservation of Rights Letter, #26 Exhibit 26 - August 29, 2018 Reservation of Rights Letter, #27 Exhibit 27 - February 18, 2022 Reservation of Rights Letter, #28 Exhibit 28 - October 18, 2022 Reservation of Rights Letter, #29 Exhibit 29 - November 23, 2022 Reservation of Rights Letter)(CLAYTON, DOUGLAS)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Jurisdictional Statement by BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC (MIDDLETON, F)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC (MIDDLETON, F)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC with Jury Demand.(MIDDLETON, F)Attorney F FAISON MIDDLETON, IV added to party BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC(pty:dft)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY as to BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC. (CLAYTON, DOUGLAS)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent ALLIED GROUP INC for AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY. (CLAYTON, DOUGLAS)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent Allied Group Inc. for ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (CLAYTON, DOUGLAS)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Jurisdictional Statement by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (CLAYTON, DOUGLAS)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (CLAYTON, DOUGLAS)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Jurisdictional Statement by ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (CLAYTON, DOUGLAS)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (CLAYTON, DOUGLAS)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LAUREN D WOODRICK on behalf of ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY Attorney LAUREN D WOODRICK added to party ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney LAUREN D WOODRICK added to party AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla)(WOODRICK, LAUREN)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(ksl)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. These must be added within CM/ECF while the document is being filed.(ksl)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC. (ksl)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4211230, $402 filed by ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - CGL Policy (5-31-16 - 5-31-17), #3 Exhibit 2 - Umbrella Policy (5-31-16-5-31-17), #4 Exhibit 3 - City of Rome Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 - City of Rome Short Form for Supplementing Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 - Clinch County Complaint, #7 Exhibit 6 - Clinch County Short Form for Supplementing Complaint, #8 Exhibit 7 - City of Opp Complaint, #9 Exhibit 8 - City of Opp Short Form for Supplementing Complaint, #10 Exhibit 9 - Grady County Complaint, #11 Exhibit 10 - Grady County Short Form for Supplementing Complaint, #12 Exhibit 11 - DeKalb County Complaint, #13 Exhibit 12 - City of Atlanta Complaint, #14 Exhibit 13 - Berkeley County Amended Complaint, #15 Exhibit 14 - Bon Secours Complaint, #16 Exhibit 15 - Bon Secours Short Form for Supplementing Complaint, #17 Exhibit 16 - Pierce County Complaint, #18 Exhibit 17 - Pierce County Short Form for Supplementing Complaint, #19 Exhibit 18 - Jackson County Complaint, #20 Exhibit 19 - Jackson County Short Form for Supplementing Complaint, #21 Exhibit 20 - ApolloMD LLC Complaint, #22 Exhibit 21 - Mar 13, 2018 Reservation of Rights Letter, #23 Exhibit 22 - Aug 29, 2018 Reservation of Rights Letter, #24 Exhibit 23 - Feb 18, 2022 Reservation of Rights Letter, #25 Exhibit 24 - Oct 18, 2022 Reservation of Rights Letter, #26 Summons)(CLAYTON, DOUGLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DOUGLAS LEE CLAYTON
Represented By: LAUREN D WOODRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DOUGLAS LEE CLAYTON
Represented By: LAUREN D WOODRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOODWORTH WHOLESALE DRUGS INC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L FOREMAN
Represented By: F FAISON MIDDLETON, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?