SHARP v. POLYMER80 INC et al
Plaintiff: SHAMIAH SHARP
Defendant: POLYMER80 INC, POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC and DELTATEAMTACTICALCOM a Utah Limited Liability Company d/b/a DELTA TEAM TACTICAL
Case Number: 7:2023cv00033
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STAYING Discovery. All discovery in the above-styled matter is STAYED pending the Courts order on Defendants Motions to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/18/2023. (ksl)
May 16, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #20 Memorandum in Support filed by POLYMER80 INC, POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC ); Other: Per Page 13 of the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing, a motion and any supporting documents filed concurrently with that motion (e.g., memorandum in support, statement of material facts, exhibits, affidavits) should be filed in a single docket entry. Likewise, a response or reply brief and any concurrently filed supporting documents should be filed as a single docket entry. The motion, response, or reply should be the main document, and the supporting documents should be filed as attachments. DO NOT REFILE. (rlw)
May 16, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #21 Response to Motion, filed by SHAMIAH SHARP ); Other (Pursuant to the Administrative Procedures Manual, page 7, all electronically filed documents mustinclude a signature block and must set forth the filers name, BAR number, address, telephone number, and e-mail address. The response is missing a proper signature block; additionally, on page 12 of the same manual, a Certificate of Service is only required when a document is served by means other than CM/ECF.) DO NOT REFILE, but remember for future filings. (esl)
May 15, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by SHAMIAH SHARP re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint : (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Morehouse Order Denying Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Order Dismissing Morehouse Appeal by Stipulation)(SCHWARTZ, EDWARD)
May 15, 2023 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC, POLYMER80 INC re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint : (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Loran Kelley, #2 Exhibit B - Polymer80 FFLs)(WARBURTON, REED)
May 15, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint : by POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC, POLYMER80 INC filed by REED THOMAS WARBURTON.(WARBURTON, REED)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Plaintiff's deadline for a response is now May 15, 2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/1/2023. (ksl)
April 27, 2023 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC, POLYMER80 INC filed by REED THOMAS WARBURTON.(WARBURTON, REED)
April 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by REED THOMAS WARBURTON on behalf of POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC, POLYMER80 INC Attorney REED THOMAS WARBURTON added to party POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC(pty:dft), Attorney REED THOMAS WARBURTON added to party POLYMER80 INC(pty:dft)(WARBURTON, REED)
April 27, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by POLYMER80 INC, POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC, #16 Notice of Attorney Appearance, filed by POLYMER80 INC, POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC ); Notice to Counsel R. THOMAS WARBURTON. The e mail address on the document does not match your e mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e mail address via PACER. #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by POLYMER80 INC, POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC, - Wrong event used. Please do NOT re-file, corrected by case manager. The correct event is Stipulation.(ksl)
April 25, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint : by DELTATEAMTACTICALCOM filed by JAMES RAYMOND MILLER, IV. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support of MTD)(MILLER, JAMES)
April 21, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHAMIAH SHARP as to POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC. (HEWITT, MELVIN)
April 21, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHAMIAH SHARP as to POLYMER80 INC. (HEWITT, MELVIN)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The deadline for Defendant Delta to file a response or answer is hereby extended to Tuesday, April 25, 2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 4/18/2023. (ksl)
April 13, 2023 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DELTATEAMTACTICALCOM filed by JAMES RAYMOND MILLER, IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(MILLER, JAMES)
April 13, 2023 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DELTATEAMTACTICALCOM filed by JAMES RAYMOND MILLER, IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(MILLER, JAMES)
April 13, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by DELTATEAMTACTICALCOM ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9.(ksl)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MATTHEW J ORME. (mdm)
April 6, 2023 Filing 8 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by DELTATEAMTACTICALCOM Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4340609, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: James Raymond Miller 159080. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(ORME, MATTHEW)
April 4, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHAMIAH SHARP as to DELTATEAMTACTICALCOM. (HEWITT, MELVIN)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MICHAEL S DAVIS. (mdm) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/28/2023) (mdm).
March 28, 2023 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by SHAMIAH SHARP Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4333064, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Mel Hewitt 350319. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(DAVIS, MICHAEL)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by EDWARD S SCHWARTZ. (mdm)
March 28, 2023 Filing 3 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by SHAMIAH SHARP Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # BGAMDC-4332714, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Melvin L. Hewitt Jr. Ga Bar #350319. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing SD Fla)(SCHWARTZ, EDWARD)
March 20, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES, LLC, #2 Summons DELTATEAMTACTICAL.COM)(ksl)
March 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4325788, $402 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(HEWITT, MELVIN)
March 20, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL -Michael Davis and Edward Schwartz - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(ksl) Modified to add atty's names on 3/22/2023 (ksl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHARP v. POLYMER80 INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAMIAH SHARP
Represented By: MELVIN HEWITT, JR
Represented By: EDWARD S SCHWARTZ
Represented By: MICHAEL S DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLYMER80 INC
Represented By: REED THOMAS WARBURTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLYMER80 ENTERPRISE PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By: REED THOMAS WARBURTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELTATEAMTACTICALCOM a Utah Limited Liability Company d/b/a DELTA TEAM TACTICAL
Represented By: MATTHEW J ORME
Represented By: JAMES RAYMOND MILLER, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?