DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES INC v. BENSON HILL HOLDINGS INC
Plaintiff: DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES INC
Defendant: J & J PRODUCE INC. and BENSON HILL HOLDINGS INC
Case Number: 7:2023cv00069
Filed: June 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2023 Filing 18 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 1/29/2024. Dispositive motions due by 2/28/2024. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/2/2023. (ksl)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #15 Stipulation filed by J & J PRODUCE INC. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/1/2023. (ksl)
August 1, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Scheduling Conference held on 8/1/2023. Scheduling and Discovery Order to be entered by the Court. Court Reporter: Sally Gray.Time in Court: 35 mins. (gda)
July 25, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER SUBSTITUTING DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF by J & J PRODUCE INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Assignment)(MILLER, JAMES)
July 25, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #15 Stipulation filed by J & J PRODUCE INC. ); JAMES MILLER - Pursuant to RULES 16/26 ORDER #10 it states The parties shall prepare and submit a joint proposed scheduling/discovery order not later than July 25, 2025, which is to be e-mailed in word processing format to the Clerks Office mailbox:valdosta.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov "DO NOT E-FILE". Please review Order #10 and send the word document to the clerks office mailbox.
July 25, 2023 Proposed Pretrial Order Received and forwarded to chambers. (ksl)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Accordingly, the Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically #13 is GRANTED-in-part and DENIED-in-part. Counsel for both parties shall attend the Initial Scheduling/Discovery Conference in-person. Plaintiffs Local Counsel may appear in person in lieu of Plaintiffs Lead Counsel. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/18/2023. (ksl)
July 14, 2023 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION To Appear by Telephone or Video for Scheduling Conference re #10 Order - Rules 16/26, by DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES INC filed by STEVEN M DE FALCO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DE FALCO, STEVEN)
July 14, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES INC.(DE FALCO, STEVEN)
June 29, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES INC (DE FALCO, STEVEN)
June 29, 2023 Notice of Deficiency DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by J & J PRODUCE INC. ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1. In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties. DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2.(ksl)
June 27, 2023 Filing 10 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/25/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2023 03:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 06/27/2023. (gda)
June 23, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, (), COUNTERCLAIM against DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES INC by J & J PRODUCE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Accord & Satisfaction Correspondence_Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2 Accord & Satisfaction Payment Conf_Redacted)(MILLER, JAMES)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by STEVEN M DE FALCO. (mdm)
June 19, 2023 Filing 7 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4396612, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Zachary R. Cowart, Ga. Bar No. 191980. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(DE FALCO, STEVEN)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by KATE ELLIS. (mdm)
June 8, 2023 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of J & J PRODUCE INC. Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4389822, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: James R. Miller; 159080. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Cert of Good Standing)(ELLIS, KATE)
June 7, 2023 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Deadline for Responsive Pleading re #1 Notice of Removal,, by J & J PRODUCE INC. (MILLER, JAMES)
June 6, 2023 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by J & J PRODUCE INC. (MILLER, JAMES)
June 6, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J & J PRODUCE INC. identifying Corporate Parent BENSON HILL FRESH LLC, Corporate Parent BENSON HILL HOLDINGS INC, Corporate Parent BENSON HILL INC, Other Affiliate J&J FLORIDA FARMS 2 LLC, Other Affiliate TROPHY TRANSPORT LLC for J & J PRODUCE INC.. (MILLER, JAMES)
June 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES INC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4386904, $402 filed by J & J PRODUCE INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Summons, #3 Exhibit C Case Information Form, #4 Exhibit D Certificate of Discovery, #5 Exhibit E Sheriff's Entry of Service) All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case.(MILLER, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES INC v. BENSON HILL HOLDINGS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEEP SOUTH VEGETABLES INC
Represented By: ZACHARY R COWART
Represented By: STEVEN M DE FALCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J PRODUCE INC.
Represented By: JAMES RAYMOND MILLER, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENSON HILL HOLDINGS INC
Represented By: KATE ELLIS
Represented By: JAMES RAYMOND MILLER, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?