FIFFIA v. WALMART INC
Plaintiff: NICHOLE FIFFIA
Defendant: WALMART INC
Case Number: 7:2024cv00018
Filed: February 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: HUGH LAWSON
Referring Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Filing 8 FIRST MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PARTIAL by WALMART INC filed by DAVID N KORSEN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A-C)(KORSEN, DAVID)
April 6, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED #1 Complaint against NICHOLE FIFFIA by NICHOLE FIFFIA (MARTIN, KIMBERLY)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading is EXTENDED such that Defendant must file their answer or responsive pleading no later than Friday, April 19, 2024, or as otherwise ordered by the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 4/5/2024. (ksl)
April 5, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NICHOLE FIFFIA as to WALMART INC. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
April 4, 2024 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by WALMART INC filed by DAVID N KORSEN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(KORSEN, DAVID)
March 29, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DAVID N KORSEN on behalf of WALMART INC Attorney DAVID N KORSEN added to party WALMART INC(pty:dft)(KORSEN, DAVID)
March 29, 2024 Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON no longer assigned to the case. (ksl)
February 21, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to WALMART INC. (ksl)
February 21, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by Nichole Fiffia ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(ksl)
February 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WAL-MART INC. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4580990, $405 filed by Nichole Fiffia (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(MARTIN, KIMBERLY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIFFIA v. WALMART INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLE FIFFIA
Represented By: KIMBERLY N MARTIN
Represented By: THOMAS FRANCIS MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC
Represented By: DAVID N KORSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?