In Re: Mirant Corp ERISA, et al v. Mirant Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: James Brown
Defendant: Americas Benefits Committee, Qualified Plans Investment Review Committee, Carlos Ghosn, T. Rowe Price Trust Company, Stuart E. Eizenstat, David J. Lesar, ABC, W. L. Westbrook, William J. Hierpe, Mirant Corporation, James A. Ward, A. W. Dahlberg, Ray M. Robinson, IRC, James F. McDonald, S. Maurice Fuller, Raymond D. Hill, A. D. Correll, Vance Booker, Elmer B. Harris, Dianne W. Davenport, Unknown Fudiciary Defendants 1-100, The Southern Company, Michael L. Smith and Richard J. Pershing
Petitioner: Arthur N. Lankford
Consolidated Plaintiff: Greg Waller, Sr.
Case Number: 1:2003cv01027
Filed: April 17, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2007. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2007 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Approval Proceedings held on 9/7/2006 before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter: Sharon D. Upchurch. (sjk)
December 7, 2006 Filing 120 TRANSCRIPT of Final Approval Hearing Proceedings held on 11/16/2006 before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter: Sharon D. Upchurch. (sjk)
November 16, 2006 Filing 119 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Motion Hearing on 11/16/2006 re #116 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval. Final Judgment to be entered. (Court Reporter Sharon Upchurch.)(sjk)
November 16, 2006 Civil Case Terminated. (sjk)
November 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/16/2006. (sjk)
November 15, 2006 Filing 117 NOTICE by James Brown of Report of Independent Fiduciary (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Millican, Joshua)
November 13, 2006 Filing 116 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval with Brief In Support by Elmer B. Harris, William J. Hierpe, David J. Lesar, W. L. Westbrook, A. W. Dahlberg, Americas Benefits Committee, Qualified Plans Investment Review Committee, Stuart E. Eizenstat, Carlos Ghosn, James F. McDonald, Ray M. Robinson, Richard J. Pershing, Michael L. Smith, Dianne W. Davenport, Mirant Corporation, Vance Booker, S. Maurice Fuller, Raymond D. Hill, James A. Ward, A. D. Correll. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Hinson, Howard)
November 6, 2006 Filing 115 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Case Contribution Awards to Class Representatives with Brief In Support by Greg Waller, Sr, James Brown. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees#2 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities#3 Exhibit 1 to Appendix-In re Household Int'l, Inc. ERISA Litig.#4 Exhibit 2-In re ADC Telecommunications ERISA Litig.#5 Exhibit 3-In re Westar Energy, Inc., ERISA Litig.#6 Affidavit of Lynn Lincoln Sarko#7 Exhibit A to Sarko Declaration-Keller Rohrback resume#8 Exhibit B to Sarko Declaration-Schiffrin & Barroway resume#9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sarko, Lynn)
November 6, 2006 Filing 114 MOTION for Order for Final Approval, Certification of Settlement Class, and for Approval of Plan of Allocation with Brief In Support by Greg Waller, Sr, James Brown. (Attachments: #1 Brief #2 Exhibit 1 to Brief#3 Affidavit of Joseph H. Meltzer#4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sarko, Lynn) Modified on 11/7/2006 to correct text to more accurately reflect e-filed pleading (sjk).
October 25, 2006 Filing 113 Letter from Movant Arthur N. Lankford, disagreeing with settlement offer. (sjk)
September 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING #108 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/22/2006, nunc pro tunc to the 30th day of August, 2006. (sjk)
September 20, 2006 Submission of #108 MOTION to Reopen Case to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sjk)
September 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING #109 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/15/2006. (sjk)
September 4, 2006 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin A. Schmahl on behalf of T. Rowe Price Trust Company (Schmahl, Robin)
August 30, 2006 Filing 109 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval Thereof) with Brief In Support by James Brown. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Conditional Certification of Settlement Class, Approval of Notice Plan and Setting of Fairness Hearing#2 Exhibit A to Brief#3 Exhibit B to Brief)(Millican, Joshua)
August 30, 2006 Filing 108 MOTION to Reopen Case with Brief In Support by James Brown. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Reopen the Case)(Millican, Joshua)
August 30, 2006 Filing 107 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Approval Hearing set for 9/7/2006 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1707 before Judge Richard W. Story. (rag)
August 25, 2006 Submission of #106 Notice of Filing Stipulation of Settlement (and proposed Orders) to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sjk)
August 24, 2006 Filing 106 NOTICE Of Filing Stipulation of Settlement by William J. Hierpe, David J. Lesar, A. W. Dahlberg, Americas Benefits Committee, Qualified Plans Investment Review Committee, Stuart E. Eizenstat, Carlos Ghosn, James F. McDonald, Ray M. Robinson, Richard J. Pershing, Michael L. Smith, Dianne W. Davenport, Mirant Corporation, Vance Booker, S. Maurice Fuller, Raymond D. Hill, James A. Ward, A. D. Correll (Attachments: #1 Attachment#2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3)(Hinson, Howard)
February 4, 2005 Filing 105 NOTICE of Change of Address for Joseph H. Meltzer, counsel for James Brown (Meltzer, Joseph)
September 7, 2004 Filing 104 NOTICE of Change of Address for James P. Baker and Heather Reinschmidt, counsel for T. Rowe Price Trust Company (epm)
August 4, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying as moot #29 Motion to Consolidate Cases, denying with a right to refile #48 motion to transfer case, denying as moot #67 Motion to Dismiss, denying with a right to refile #68 Motion to Dismiss, denying with a right to refile #78 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, denying with a right to refile #79 Motion for Judgment, denying with a right to refile #96 Motion for Leave to File, granting #102 Motion for Leave to File. Action is STAYED pending the lifting of the stay by the USBC. The clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY close action pending the lifting of the stay by the USBC.. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/4/04. (fmm)
July 30, 2004 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File Mirant Defendants' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Americas Benefits Committee, Vance Booker, A. D. Correll, A. W. Dahlberg, Dianne W. Davenport, Stuart E. Eizenstat, S. Maurice Fuller, Carlos Ghosn, William J. Hierpe, Raymond D. Hill, David J. Lesar, James F. McDonald, Mirant Corporation, Richard J. Pershing, Qualified Plans Investment Review Committee, Ray M. Robinson, Michael L. Smith, James A. Ward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Surreply)(Hinson, Howard) Modified on 8/26/2004 to correct attachment description (mmc).
July 21, 2004 Filing 100 Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of their #96 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Mirant Defendants) filed by James Brown, Greg Waller Sr. (epm)
July 20, 2004 Filing 101 Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of their #96 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (T. Rowe Price) filed by James Brown, Greg Waller Sr. (epm)
July 1, 2004 Filing 99 Response by defendant T. Rowe Price Trust in opposition to [96-1] motion for leave to file to file second amended complaint (epm)
July 1, 2004 Filing 98 Response by defendants Mirant Corporation in opposition to [96-1] motion for leave to file to file second amended complaint (epm)
June 16, 2004 Filing 97 Response by Mirant defendants to [92-1] notice of supplemental authority (epm) Modified on 06/17/2004
June 14, 2004 Filing 96 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for leave to file to file second amended complaint with memorandum of law in support. (epm)
June 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story GRANTING [93-1] motion for leave to exceed the page limitation (cc) (jdb)
June 4, 2004 SUBMITTED to Judge Richard W. Story on [79-1] motion for judgment on the pleadings (FILE IN CHAMBERS) (jdb)
May 26, 2004 Filing 94 Reply brief in support of the [79-1] motion for judgment on the pleadings by defendant T. Rowe Price Trust. (aaq)
May 26, 2004 Filing 93 MOTION by defendant T. Rowe Price Trust (and unopposed to by plaintiffs) for leave to exceed the page limitation with proposed order. (to RWS) (aaq)
May 24, 2004 Filing 92 Notice of Supplemental Authority by plaintiff. (epm)
May 11, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story GRANTING [88-1] motion for leave to exceed the page limits of LR 7.1(D); Mirant dfts may file a reply brief not to exceed 40 pages, excluding exhibits and attachments. (cc) (kt)
May 6, 2004 Filing 90 Certificate of service re: Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Dft T. Rowe Price Trust Company, Inc.'s Motion for Jgm on the Pleadings by Katherin B. Bornstein. (jdb)
May 6, 2004 Filing 89 Reply brief to [68-1] motion to dismiss by Mirant Dfts. (jdb)
May 6, 2004 Filing 88 UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to exceed the page limits of LR 7.1(D) by Mirant Dfts with prop. order. (to RWS) (jdb)
May 5, 2004 Filing 87 Memo of law by consolidated plaintiff Greg Waller Sr., plaintiff James Brown in opposition to [79-1] motion for judgment on the pleadings (vs)
April 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story GRANTING [84-1] motion for leave to exceed the page limits of L.R. 7.1(D) (cc) (jdb)
April 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CONSENT ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story, extending time thru 05/05/04 to respond to [79-1] motion for judgment on the pleadings and dft shall have up to and including 05/26/04 to reply thereto , [79-1] motion for judgment on the pleadings to be submitted on 5/27/04 (cc) (jdb)
April 21, 2004 SUBMITTED to Judge Richard W. Story on [78-1] motion to exceed the page limitation, [79-1] motion for judgment on the pleadings (FILE IN CHAMBERS) (jdb)
April 14, 2004 Proposed consent order to extend response deadlines. (to RWS) (jdb)
April 14, 2004 Filing 84 UNOPPOSED MOTION by plaintiff for leave to exceed the page limits of L.R. 7.1(D) with prop. order. (to RWS) (jdb)
April 13, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story GRANTING [80-1] motion for leave to exceed the page limit (cc) (vs)
April 12, 2004 SUBMITTED to Judge Richard W. Story on [68-1] motion to dismiss, [67-1] motion to dismiss plas' consolidated amended ERISA complaint (FILE IN CHAMBERS) (jdb)
April 1, 2004 Filing 82 Response by plaintiff in opposition to [68-1] motion to dismiss with declaration of T. David Copley attached. (jdb)
March 29, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CONSENT ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story extending time to 4/1/04 for plas' to respond to Mirant dfts' [67-1] motion to dismiss plas' consolidated amended ERISA complaint ; Mirant dfts shall reply by 5/6/04; [67-1] motion to dismiss plas' consolidated amended ERISA complaint to be submitted on 5/6/04 (cc) (bj)
March 24, 2004 Filing 80 UNOPPOSED MOTION by plaintiffs for leave to exceed the page limit with proposed order in support. (als)
March 23, 2004 Filing 79 MOTION by defendant T. Rowe Price Trust for judgment on the pleadings with Memorandum of Law in Support. (aaq)
March 23, 2004 Filing 78 MOTION by defendant T. Rowe Price Trust to exceed the page limitation with proposed order. (aaq)
March 15, 2004 Proposed Consent Order to extend response deadlines. (to RWS) (jdb)
March 12, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CONSENT ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story to extend response deadlines. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Plas to respond to the Mirant Dfts motion to dismiss Pla's consolidated Amended ERISA complaint is hereby extended up to and including 03/18/04. The Mirant Dfts shall have up to and including 04/22/04, to reply thereto. (cc) (jdb)
March 4, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story APPROVING [74-1] voluntary dismiss/dismissal of dft Southern Company only by James Brown (cc) (vs)
March 4, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CONSENT ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story extending deadline to 3/18/04, for Plas to respond to dft's motion to dismiss. Dfts shall have until 4/22/04, to reply thereto. (cc) (vs)
March 1, 2004 Proposed Consent Order to extend response deadlines. (to RWS) (vs)
February 19, 2004 Filing 74 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of dft Southern Company without prejudice by plaintiff James Brown pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i), FRCP. (to RWS) (jdb)
February 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CONSENT ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story, extending time thru 3/4/04 for Plas to respond to Mirant Dfts' [68-1] motion to dismiss . (cc) (lme)
February 3, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CONSENT ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story, extending time thru 2/19/04 for Plas to respond to Dfts' [67-1] motion to dismiss plas' consolidated amended ERISA complaint and [68-1] motion to dismiss . (cc) (lme)
January 30, 2004 Proposed Consent Order to extend time thru 3/4/04 for Plas' to respond to the Mirant Dfts' [68-1] motion to dismiss. (To RWS) (lme)
January 28, 2004 Proposed Consent Order to extend time thru 3/25/04 for Plas to respond to Dfts' [67-1] motion to dismiss plas' consolidated amended ERISA complaint. (To RWS) (lme)
January 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story GRANTING [65-1] pro hac vice application for James P. Baker. (cc) (lme)
January 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story GRANTING [64-1] pro hac vice application for Heather Reinschmidt. (cc) (lme)
January 12, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story GRANTING Mirant Dfts' [63-1] motion for leave to exceed page limitation. (cc) (lme)
January 9, 2004 Filing 68 MOTION by Mirant defendants Mirant Corporation, Vance Booker, S. Maurice Fuller, Raymond D. Hill, James A. Ward, A. D. Correll, William J. Hierpe, David J. Lesar, A. W. Dahlberg, Americas Benefits, Qualified Plans, Stuart E. Eizenstat, Carlos Ghosn, James F. McDonald, Ray M. Robinson, Richard J. Pershing, Michael L. Smith, Dianne W. Davenport to dismiss with brief in support, appendix of exhibits and excerpts of plas' amended complaint exhibits cited in Dft's motion to dismiss. (lme)
January 9, 2004 Filing 67 MOTION by defendant Southern Company to dismiss plas' consolidated amended ERISA complaint with brief in support. (lme)
January 9, 2004 Filing 66 ANSWER by defendant T. Rowe Price Trust to complaint [38-1] Discovery ends 6/7/04. (lme)
January 7, 2004 Filing 65 Application for admission of James P. Baker pro hac vice for defendant T. Rowe Price Trust. (To RWS) (lme)
January 7, 2004 Filing 64 Application for admission of Heather Reinschmidt pro hac vice for defendant T. Rowe Price Trust. (To RWS) (lme)
January 6, 2004 Filing 63 UNOPPOSED MOTION by dfts Mirant Corporation, Vance Booker, S. Maurice Fuller, Raymond D. Hill, James A. Ward, A. D. Correll, William J. Hierpe, David J. Lesar, A. W. Dahlberg, Americas Benefits, Qualified Plans, Stuart E. Eizenstat, Carlos Ghosn, James F. McDonald, Ray M. Robinson, Richard J. Pershing, Micahel L. Smith, Dianne W. Davenport for leave to exceed page limitation with brief in support. (To RWS) (lme)
January 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CONSENT ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story, extending time thru 1/9/04 for dft to respond to [26-1] complaint and [38-1] amended complaint . Plas shall have until 2/12/04 to respond to dft's answer and dfts shall have until 3/12/04 to reply. (cc) (lme)
December 16, 2003 Proposed Consent Order to extend time thru 1/9/04 for dfts to resspond to [38-1] amended consolidated ERISA complaint. (To RWS) (lme)
December 8, 2003 Filing 61 Certificate of service by plas re: notices of appearance of Lynn Sarko, Derek Loeser and Garry A. Gotto. (lme)
December 8, 2003 Filing 60 Attorney appearance for plaintiffs by Gary A. Gotto. (lme)
December 8, 2003 Filing 59 Attorney appearance for plaintiffs by Derek W. Loeser. (lme)
December 8, 2003 Filing 58 Attorney appearance for plaintiffs by Lynn L. Sarko. (lme)
December 8, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CONSENT ORDER by Judge Richard W. Story, extending time thru 12/1/03 for dft T. Rowe Price to respond to [38-1] consolidated amended complaint , Answer due 12/19/03 for T. Rowe Price Trust . (cc) (lme)
December 1, 2003 Proposed Consent Order to extend time thru 12/19/03 for dft T. Rowe Price to answer [38-1] consolidated complaint by pla and dft T. Rowe Price Trust. (To RWS) (lme)
November 26, 2003 SUBMITTED to Judge Richard W. Story on the [29-1] motion for consolidation of Mirant Corporation Erisa Cases and for entry of consolidation order and [48-1] motion to transfer case. (aaq)
November 26, 2003 Terminated submissions. (aaq)
November 25, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin REASSIGNING this action to Judge Richard W. Story inasmuch as this case is related to Civil Action No. 1:02-cv-1467-RWS. The next case to be assigned to Judge Story shall be assigned to the undersigned as a result of this change. (cc) (aaq)
November 7, 2003 SUBMITTED to Judge Beverly B. Martin on the [48-1] motion to transfer case. (aaq)
November 4, 2003 Filing 55 Response by plaintiffs to the [48-1] motion to transfer case. (aaq)
November 3, 2003 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to T. Rowe Price Trust, mailed 9/30/03. Answer due by 11/29/03 for T. Rowe Price Trust. (aaq)
October 27, 2003 Filing 53 STATUS REPORT (Notice of Bankruptcy Court's Hearing on the Motion to Stay) filed by defendants. (aaq)
October 27, 2003 Filing 52 Attorney appearance for defendants Richard J. Pershing, Michael L. Smith, Dianne W. Davenport, Carlos Ghosn, James F. McDonold and Ray M. Robinson by Michael G. Monnolly. (aaq)
October 27, 2003 Filing 51 Attorney appearance for defendants Richard J. Pershing, Michael L. Smith, Dianne W. Davenport, Carlos Ghosn, James F. McDonold and Ray M. Robinson by Howard Douglas Hinson. (aaq)
October 24, 2003 Filing 50 Certificate of interested persons. (to BBM) (aaq)
October 22, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin APPROVING the [45-1] pro hac vice application of Gary A. Gotto. (cc) (aaq)
October 20, 2003 Filing 48 MOTION by defendants Southern Company, Vance Booker, S. Maurice Fuller, Raymond D. Hill, James A. Ward, A. W. Dahlbert, A. D. Correll, Elmer B. Harris, William J. Hierpe and David J. W. L. Westbrook to transfer case. (aaq)
October 20, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin APPROVING the [43-1] pro hac vice application of Lynn Lincoln Sarko. (cc) (aaq)
October 20, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin APPROVING the [42-1] pro hac vice application of Derek William Loeser. (cc) (aaq)
October 14, 2003 Filing 45 Application for the admission of Gary Gotto pro hac vice for plaintiffs. (to BBM) (aaq)
October 10, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin DIRECTING the parties to file JOINTLY a Certificate of Interested Persons within 10 days of the docketing of this order. This [44-1] order to be submitted on 10/30/03 if parties fail to comply. (cc) (aaq)
October 7, 2003 Filing 43 Application for the admission of Lynn Lincoln Sarko pro hac vice for plaintiffs. (to BBM) (aaq)
October 7, 2003 Filing 42 Application for the admission of Derek W. Loeser pro hac vice for plaintiffs. (to BBM) (aaq)
October 7, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CONSENT ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin GRANTING the [40-1] joint motion to extend response deadlines until 20 days after either the Bankruptcy Court denies Mirant's Motion to Stay or lifts the automatic stay as to the non-debtor defendants in this action. In the event any defendant files a motion directed at the Consolidated Amended ERISA Complaint, plaintiffs shall have 30 days from service of defendant's motion to respond thereto. The parties are DIRECTED to notify the court of the outcome of the 10/22/03 hearing in Bankruptcy Court. (cc) (aaq)
October 2, 2003 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to extend response deadlines. (to BBM) (aaq)
September 30, 2003 Filing 39 Summons issued for T. Rowe Price Trust Company. (aaq)
September 23, 2003 Filing 38 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED ERISA COMPLAINT by plaintiffs. (aaq)
September 12, 2003 Filing 37 Attorney appearance for defendants Southern Company by J. Kirk Quillian, Bridget Bobick and Jaime L. McMahon (Theriot). (cc to SE) (aaq)
September 12, 2003 Filing 36 Notice of Attorney appearance for defendants Mirant Corporation, Vance Booker, S. Maurice Fuller, Raymond D. Hill, James A. Ward, A. W. Dahlbert, A. D. Correll, William J. Hierpe and David J. Lesar by Howard Douglas Hinson (aaq)
September 12, 2003 Filing 35 Attorney appearance for defendants Mirant Corporation, Vance Booker, S. Maurice Fuller, Raymond D. Hill, James A. Ward, A. W. Dahlbert, A. D. Correll, William J. Hierpe and David J. Lesar by Michael G. Monnolly. (aaq)
September 3, 2003 Terminated submissions. (aaq)
September 2, 2003 Filing 34 Notice of Bankruptcy filed by defendant Mirant Corporation. (***CONSOLIDATED FROM 1:03-CV-1558-BBM PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 09/02/03***) (aaq)
September 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin APPROVING the [31-1] pro hac vice application of Gerald L. Rutledge. (cc) (***CONSOLIDATED FROM 1:03-CV-1558-BBM PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 09/02/03***) (aaq)
September 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin APPROVING the [30-1] pro hac vice application of Alfred Yates. (cc) (***CONSOLIDATED FROM 1:03-CV-1558-BBM PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 09/02/03***) (aaq)
September 2, 2003 Filing 31 Application for the admission of Gerald L. Rutledge pro hac vice for Greg Waller Sr. (to BBM) (***CONSOLIDATED FROM 1:03-CV-1558-BBM PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 09/02/03***) (aaq)
September 2, 2003 Filing 30 Application for the admission of Alfred Yates pro hac vice for consolidated plaintiff Greg Waller Sr. (to BBM) (***CONSOLIDATED FROM 1:03-CV-1558-BBM PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 09/02/03***) (aaq)
September 2, 2003 Filing 29 MOTION by consolidated plaintiff for consolidation of Mirant Corporation Erisa Cases and for entry of consolidation order with Memorandum of Law in Support and proposed Consolidation Order. (***CONSOLIDATED FROM 1:03-CV-1558-BBM PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 09/02/03***) (aaq) Modified on 09/04/2003
September 2, 2003 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Southern Company mailed 6/9/03. Answer due by 8/8/03 for Southern Company. (***CONSOLIDATED FROM 1:03-CV-1558-BBM PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 09/02/03***) (aaq)
September 2, 2003 Filing 27 Acknowledgment of service by defendants Mirant Corporation, Vance Booker, S. Maurice Fuller, Raymond D. Hill, James A. Ward and A. W. Dahlbert. (***CONSOLIDATED FROM 1:03-cv-1558-BBM PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 09/02/03***) (aaq)
September 2, 2003 Filing 26 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 506351 (***CONSOLIDATED FROM 1:03-cv-1558-BBM PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 09/02/03***) (aaq)
September 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin GRANTING the [23-1] motion for consolidation of Mirant Corporation Erisa Cases and for entry of consolidation order. This action is CONSOLIDATED with 1:03-cv-1558-BBM. (All parties and pleadings are to added to this action from 1:03-cv-1558-BBM.) ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS ARE TO BE FILED IN THIS (1:03-cv-1027-BBM) ACTION captioned as In re: Mirant Corporation ERISA Litigation. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFIC INSTRUCTIONS.) The court TAKES NOTICE of the [24-1] Bankruptcy Notice and this action is STAYED as to defendant Mirant Corporation. (cc) (aaq)
July 25, 2003 Filing 24 Notice of Bankruptcy filed by defendant Mirant Corporation (aaq)
July 15, 2003 SUBMITTED to Judge Beverly B. Martin on the [23-1] motion for consolidation of Mirant Corporation Erisa Cases and for entry of consolidation order (aaq)
June 27, 2003 Filing 23 MOTION by plaintiff for consolidation of Mirant Corporation Erisa Cases and for entry of consolidation order with Memorandum of Law in Support and Proposed Consolidation Order. (aaq)
June 16, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin APPROVING the [19-1] pro hac vice application of Joseph H. Meltzer. (cc) (aaq)
June 16, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin APPROVING the [18-1] pro hac vice application of Lee D. Rudy. (cc) (aaq)
June 16, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin APPROVING the [17-1] pro hac vice application of Richard S. Schiffrin. (cc) (aaq)
June 11, 2003 Filing 19 Application for the admission of Joseph H. Meltzer pro hac vice for plaintiff. (to BBM) (aaq)
June 11, 2003 Filing 18 Application for the admission of Lee D. Rudy pro hac vice for plaintiff. (to BBM) (aaq)
June 11, 2003 Filing 17 Application for the admission of Richard S. Schiffrin pro hac vice for plaintiff. (to BBM) (aaq)
May 30, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin DIRECTING Messrs. Schiffrin, Meltzer and Ciolko to submit a pro hac vice application or to file a withdrawal in this action as directed by the the Clerk on 04/21/03 within 20 days of the docketing of this order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove the names of Richard S. Schiffrin, Joseph H. Meltzer and Edward W. Ciolko from the court's docket pursuant to this [16-1] order on 6/25/03 if attorneys fail to comply. (cc) (aaq)
May 9, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper, reassigning case to Judge Beverly B. Martin, as this case is related to civil action 1:02-CV-1467-BBM . The next case to be docketed to Judge Beverly Martin shall be assigned to Judge Clarence Cooper. (cc) (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 14 Return of service executed 4/22/03 as to David J. Lesar on original complaint. (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 13 Return of service executed 4/22/03 as to W. L. Westbrook on original complaint. (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 12 Return of service executed 4/29/03 as to Southern Company on original complaint. (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 11 Return of service executed 4/22/03 as to Mirant Corporation on original complaint. (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 10 Return of service executed 4/22/03 as to Vance Booker on original complaint. (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 9 Return of service executed 4/22/03 as to S. Maurice Fuller on original complaint. (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 8 Return of service executed 4/22/03 as to Raymond D. Hill on original complaint. (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 7 Return of service executed 4/22/03 as to James A. Ward on original complaint. (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 6 Return of service executed 4/22/03 as to A. W. Dahlbert on original complaint. (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 5 Return of service executed 4/22/03 as to Elmer B. Harris on original complaint. (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 4 Return of service executed 4/22/03 as to A. D. Correll on original complaint. (slc)
May 6, 2003 Filing 3 Return of service executed 4/22/03 as to William J. Hierpe on original complaint. (slc)
May 5, 2003 Proposed consent order extending time thru 06/30/03 within which defendants may respond to [1-1] complaint. (to CC) (slc)
May 2, 2003 Filing 2 Notice of filing of a related action of this cv action to cv action no 1:02-cv-1467-BBM by defendants. (slc)
April 17, 2003 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 504351 (aet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Mirant Corp ERISA, et al v. Mirant Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americas Benefits Committee
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualified Plans Investment Review Committee
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Ghosn
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rowe Price Trust Company
Represented By: Daniel M. Klein
Represented By: James P. Baker
Represented By: Heather Reinschmidt
Represented By: Robin A. Schmahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart E. Eizenstat
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Lesar
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. L. Westbrook
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Hierpe
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirant Corporation
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Ward
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. W. Dahlberg
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray M. Robinson
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRC
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. McDonald
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Maurice Fuller
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond D. Hill
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. D. Correll
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance Booker
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmer B. Harris
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne W. Davenport
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Fudiciary Defendants 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Southern Company
Represented By: Bridget Bobick James
Represented By: Jaime L. Theriot
Represented By: J. Kirk Quillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Smith
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Pershing
Represented By: Howard Douglas Hinson
Represented By: Michael G. Monnolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur N. Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown
Represented By: Edward W. Ciolko
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Joshua A. Millican
Represented By: Lee D. Rudy
Represented By: Gary A. Gotto
Represented By: Richard S. Schiffrin
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Joseph H. Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Greg Waller, Sr.
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Joshua A. Millican
Represented By: Gary A. Gotto
Represented By: Gerald L. Rutledge
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Alfred G. Yates, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?