Goshawk Dedicated Ltd. et al v. American Viatical Services, LLC
Case Number: |
1:2005cv02343 |
Filed: |
September 8, 2005 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard W. Story |
Nature of Suit: |
Fraud or Truth-In-Lending |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 4, 2013 |
Filing
739
ORDER denying Goshawk's 659 Motion to Strike Jury Demand, AVS's 676 Motion for Trial is GRANTED, and Goshawk's 663 Motion to Strike Expert Report by Defendant's Expert Larry Warnock is GRANTED. The Court reserves ruling on AVS's Motion for Summary Judgment 664 , pending a hearing on the issue of damages set for Wednesday, 2/13/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/4/13. (cem)
|
December 6, 2010 |
Filing
579
ORDER granting 530 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 537 Non-party Life Settlement Corporation's Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs are directed to pay non-party LSC $2500.00 in sanctions . Further, Plaintiffs' Motion for Permission to use documents in a related arbitration 549 is MOOT, in part and DENIED, in part. Additionally, the Report and Recommendation NO. 10 of the Special Master, Albert M. Pearson III 557 is ADOPTED as the Order of this Court, and Non-Party Life Settlement Corporation's Motion for In Camera Review of an Exhibit 568 has been rendered MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/06/10. (cem)
|
October 4, 2010 |
Filing
557
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master re 1 Complaint,, filed by Albert M. Pearson, III. (Pearson, Albert)
|
January 21, 2009 |
Filing
489
ORDER granting Defendant's 462 Rule 37 Motion Seeking Compliance with the Court's July 23, 2008 Order and denying Defendant's 461 Motion for Leave to Serve a Subpoena upon Ed Stone and Stone-Related Entities. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/21/09. (dfb)
|
December 16, 2008 |
Filing
469
ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 438 Motion for Compliance. The motion is GRANTED as to Paragraph 2 on page 8 of the Court's July 23, 2008 Order. The Motion is DENIED as to Paragraph 1 on page 8 of the Court's July 23, 2008 Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/15/2008. (sjk)
|
November 13, 2008 |
Filing
454
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART LSC's 425 Motion for Appointment of a Special Master to Oversee Production of Electronically-Stored Information; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiffs Goshawk Dedicated Limited and Kite Dedi cated Limited's 434 Cross Motion for Appointment of Special Master. The Special Master shall be Albert M. Pearson III. Within five (5) days, the Special Master shall file an affidavit disclosing whether there is any grounds for disqualification pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/13/08. (ekb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?