United States of America, ex rel, et al. v. The Public Warehousing Company, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America Ex Rel and Kamal Al-Sultan
Defendant: The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C., Agility, The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C., Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, Charles Tobias Switzer, Emad Alsaleh and Agility Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.
Case Number: 1:2005cv02968
Filed: November 18, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice by United States of America Ex Rel re #292 Stipulation of Dismissal, Clerks Entry of Dismissal (Berne, Amy)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #292 Stipulation of Dismissal of action pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (btql)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated. (btql)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by United States of America Ex Rel. (Berne, Amy)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting #290 Motion for Extension of Time through 5/17/2017 to complete Rule 26(f) Conference and through 5/31/2017 to serve initial disclosures and file Certificate of Interested Persons and Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/3/2017. (ss)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to serve initial disclosures and complete discovery plan by United States of America Ex Rel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Patrick)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ANSWER to #78 Amended Complaint in Intervention of the United States of America with Jury Demand by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. Discovery ends on 8/28/2017.(Marmaro, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 3/31/2017 to remove double wording (btql).
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , #13 Amended Complaint, #60 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. Discovery ends on 8/28/2017.(Marmaro, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 3/31/2017 to remove double wording (btql).
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , #13 Amended Complaint, #60 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. Discovery ends on 8/28/2017.(Cochran, Anthony) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 3/31/2017 to remove double wording (btql).
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ANSWER to #78 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. Discovery ends on 8/28/2017.(Cochran, Anthony) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 3/31/2017 to include jury demand (btql).
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER denying as moot #180 Motion for Reconsideration and for Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/23/2017. (ss)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 OPINION and ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part #196 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; DENYING AS MOOT #197 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; GRANTING #201 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; GRANTING #202 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part #205 Motion to Dismiss. Counts 1-2 and 7-9 against PWC and The Sultan Center have been superseded by the governments intervention, while the Relator retains control of Count 3. Counts 4-6 against all Defendants are dismissed for lack of standing, and all counts against Al-Essa, Al-Saleh, and Switzer are dismissed under Rule 9(b). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/17. (jkl)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 OPINION and ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part #163 Motion to Dismiss and #182 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2017. (jkl)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 OPINION AND ORDER that the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [Docs. 163-8, 181, 195, 201, 202, 205-2] are DENIED as to the issue of insufficiency of service. The Clerk is directed to close Docket Nos. #181 and #195 , but to leave Docket Nos. #163 , #201 , #202 , and #205 open until such time as the Court addresses the other substantive claims in those motions. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/17/2017. (tcc)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Lauren Misztal and Michal Tingle re #282 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (tcc)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER denying #164 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/27/2017. (ss)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting #279 Motion for Leave of Absence for Richard Marmaro from February 27, 2017 through May 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/20/2017. (ss)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MOTION for Leave of Absence for Richard Marmaro from February 27, 2017 through May 2, 2017 by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marmaro, Richard) Text modified on 1/19/2017 (jkl).
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER GRANTING #262 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jordan E. Alexander. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/9/2017. (jkl)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #262 APPLICATION for Admission of Jordan E. Alexander Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6878961). Attorney Jordan E. Alexander added appearing on behalf of Agility Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C., The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (pmb)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Submission of #195 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, #196 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6), #197 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on United States' Notice of Election to Intervene, #201 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #202 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #205 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint of Relator Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan, Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b), 12(b)(1), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (jkl)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER GRANTING #271 Motion to Adopt. The Clerk should modify PWC's #236 Reply Brief to reflect that Mr. Sultan has adopted all of the arguments in PWCs Reply to the Governments Venue Transfer Response. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/29/2016. (jkl)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER GRANTING #274 Motion to Adopt. The Clerk should modify the docket text of #273 Reply to reflect that TSC has adopted Sections I, II.B.1., II.B.2., and II.C. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/29/2016. (jkl)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING #268 Motion to Adopt Section II.B of co-Defendant Emad Al-Salehs Reply Brief in Support of Emad Al-Salehs Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/27/2016. (jkl)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MOTION to Adopt PWC's Reply (Doc. 273) #273 Reply Brief, by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cochran, Anthony)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Sections I, II.B.1., II.B.2., and II.C. ADOPTED by TSC per #276 Order REPLY BRIEF re #205 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint of Relator Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan, Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b), 12(b)(1), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) Reply Brief pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(6) filed by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (Marmaro, Richard) Modified on 12/29/2016 (jkl).
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 272 REPLY BRIEF re #204 Supplemental Brief in Support of #203 MOTION for Order, #164 MOTION to Transfer Case to Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Marmaro, Richard)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION for Order to Adopt Co-Defendant The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Dkt. 236) by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa. (Marmaro, Richard)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 REPLY BRIEF re #205 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint of Relator Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan, Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b), 12(b)(1), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) Reply Brief pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(1) filed by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Marmaro, Richard)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 269 REPLY BRIEF re #196 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Cochran, Anthony)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MOTION to Adopt Section II.B of co-Defendant Al-Saleh's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Charles Tobias Switzer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Diffley, Daniel)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Section II.B of Al-Salehs Reply is ADOPTED by Switzer, per 12/27/16 Order REPLY BRIEF re #202 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles Tobias Switzer. (Diffley, Daniel) Modified on 12/27/2016 (jkl).
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 REPLY BRIEF re #201 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Emad Alsaleh. (Kendall, Michael)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #264 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/22/2016. (ss)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants PWC's and Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa's Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(6) by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marmaro, Richard)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE by Kamal Al-Sultan re #257 Response in Opposition to Motion Notice of Correction (Moss, Raymond)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 APPLICATION for Admission of Jordan E. Alexander Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6878961)by Agility Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Andrews, Lucas)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 RESPONSE in Opposition re #196 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Moss, Raymond)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 RESPONSE in Opposition re #202 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Moss, Raymond)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 RESPONSE in Opposition re #205 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint of Relator Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan, Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b), 12(b)(1), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) with Brief In Support filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Relators Response to Defendant The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. and Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essas Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint of Relator Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan, pursuant To Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure 9(b), 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Brief in Support of Relators Response To Defendant The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. and Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essas Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint of Relator Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan, Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5))(Moss, Raymond)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 RESPONSE in Opposition re #203 MOTION to Adopt Co-Defendant The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.'s #164 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a), #204 Supplemental Brief in Support of #203 MOTION for Order, #164 MOTION to Transfer Case to Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Moss, Raymond)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 257 RESPONSE in Opposition re #201 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moss, Raymond)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 RESPONSE in Opposition re #197 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on United States' Notice of Election to Intervene filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Moss, Raymond)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 RESPONSE in Opposition re #195 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Moss, Raymond)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER GRANTING Relator's #249 , #250 , #251 , #252 , & #253 Motions To Adopt United States' Responses. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/17/16. (jkl)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION to Adopt the United States' #231 Response in Opposition to Motion To Dismiss The First Amended Complaint In Intervention of The United States of America, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Moss, Raymond)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MOTION to Adopt the United States' #230 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint In Intervention for Insufficient Service of Process by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Moss, Raymond)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION to Adopt the United States' #223 Response in Opposition to Motion To Dismiss The First Amended Complaint In Intervention Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Moss, Raymond)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION to Adopt the United States' #222 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint In Intervention Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Moss, Raymond)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MOTION to Adopt the United States' #221 Response in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Moss, Raymond)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #247 MOTION to Adopt PWC's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint in Intervention of the USA. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/16/2016. (jkl)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #182 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b), submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (jkl)
November 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION to Adopt PWC's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint in Intervention of the USA (Doc. 234) #234 Reply Brief by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cochran, Anthony)
November 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 REPLY BRIEF re #182 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) filed by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Cochran, Anthony)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting #242 Motion for Extension of Time until 11/23/2016 for the Relator to file any responses to Defendants' motions. Defendants shall have until 12/23/2016 to file any replies. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/3/2016. (jkl) Modified on 11/9/2016 (adg).
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #196 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6), #195 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, #202 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #197 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on United States' Notice of Election to Intervene, #205 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint of Relator Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan, Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b), 12(b)(1), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6), #182 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b), #201 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (jkl)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #243 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 11/3/2016. (jkl)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Relators Response to Defendants The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.s and Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essas Motion to Dismiss Relators Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Raymond)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Deadlines by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Raymond)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #224 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael Kendall. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/27/2016. (jkl)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #225 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Yakov Malkiel. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/27/2016. (jkl)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 239 RESPONSE in Opposition re #198 MOTION to Adopt Co-Defendant PWC's #164 Transfer Case to Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by United States of America Ex Rel. Adopted per #238 ORDER. (jkl)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER GRANTING #229 Motion to Adopt #221 Response in Opposition to Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/25/2016. (jkl)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #163 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b), 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6), #195 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, #181 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, #164 MOTION to Transfer Case to Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (jkl)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 REPLY BRIEF re #181 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, #195 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Cochran, Anthony)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Mr. Sultan has ADOPTED all of the arguments per #277 Order REPLY BRIEF re #164 MOTION to Transfer Case to Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Marmaro, Richard) Modified on 12/29/2016 (jkl).
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 235 REPLY BRIEF re #163 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(5) filed by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (Marmaro, Richard) Text modified on 10/18/2016 (jkl).
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 REPLY BRIEF re #163 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b), 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) filed by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. ADOPTED BY TSC, see ( #248 Order.) (Marmaro, Richard) Modified on 10/18/2016 to remove double text(jkl).
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting #232 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/17/16. (jkl)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PWC's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marmaro, Richard)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #224 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Kendall Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael Kendall added appearing on behalf of Emad Alsaleh (pb)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #225 APPLICATION for Admission of Yakov Malkiel Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Yakov Malkiel added appearing on behalf of Emad Alsaleh (pb)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 RESPONSE in Opposition re #182 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by United States of America Ex Rel. Adopted by Kamal Mutafa Al-Sultan. (Klein, Patrick)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 RESPONSE in Opposition re #181 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by United States of America Ex Rel. Adopted by Kamal Mutafa Al-Sultan. (Klein, Patrick)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION for Order To Adopt Previous Transfer Opposition Brief by United States of America Ex Rel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Patrick)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE by United States of America Ex Rel re #169 Affidavit of Service of Supplement to Affidavit of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Klein, Patrick)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting #226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. Attorney Jack P. DiCanio terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/27/2016. (bdb)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION for Withdrawal of Jack P. DiCanio as Counsel of Record by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.(Marmaro, Richard) Modified on 9/23/2016 to change to motion. (jkl).
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 APPLICATION for Admission of Yakov Malkiel Pro Hac Vice by Emad Alsaleh. (Cecil, Emma)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Kendall Pro Hac Vice by Emad Alsaleh. (Cecil, Emma)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 RESPONSE in Opposition re #163 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b), 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) Opposition to Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by United States of America Ex Rel. Adopted by Kamal Mutafa Al-Sultan. (Klein, Patrick)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 RESPONSE in Opposition re #163 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b), 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) Opposition in Response to Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) filed by United States of America Ex Rel. Adopted by Kamal Mutafa Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick Klein, #2 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Klein, Patrick)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 RESPONSE in Opposition re #164 MOTION to Transfer Case to Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by United States of America Ex Rel. Adopted by Kamal Mutafa Al-Sultan. (Klein, Patrick)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint to The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. a/k/a Agility, Agility Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - I)(Klein, Patrick) Text modified on 9/15/2016 (jkl).
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #218 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 9/14/2016. (ss)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re Submission to District Judge on #195 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process; #196 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6); #197 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on United States' Notice of Election to Intervene; #201 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; #202 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #205 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint of Relator Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan, Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b), 12(b)(1), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6): Submission deadline reset per the #149 Order which extended the deadline until 9/16/2016 for the USA to respond to to answers and/or motions to the First Amended Complaint and extended PWC's reply time to 10/17/2016. (adg)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by United States of America Ex Rel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Patrick)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #196 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6), #195 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, #201 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #202 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #197 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on United States' Notice of Election to Intervene, and #205 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint of Relator Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan, Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b), 12(b)(1), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (jkl)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order RETURN of #191 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Kendall Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction re: address. (pb)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #180 MOTION for Reconsideration re #147 Order, and MOTION for Extension of Time to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (jkl)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order RETURN of #190 APPLICATION for Admission of Yakov Malkiel Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction re: address. (pb)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Murali Menon by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. re: #216 Order. (jkl)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #211 Motion for Leave to File Declaration of Murali Menon. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/31/16. (jkl)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER GRANTING #203 Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.'s #164 To Transfer Venue. The Clerk should modify the docket text of the Motion to Show the party that it has adopted the motion. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/30/2016. (adg)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING #198 Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant PWC's Motion #164 To TransferVenue. The Clerk should modify the docket text of the Motion to Show the partythat it has adopted the motion. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/30/2016. (adg)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #200 Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant Charles Tobias Switzer's #202 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The Clerk should modify the docket text of the Motion to Show the party that it has adopted the motion. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/30/2016. (adg)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER GRANTING #199 Motion to Adopt co-Defendant Emad Al-Saleh's Motion #201 ToDismiss for Failure to State A Claim. The Clerk should modify the docket text ofthe Motion to Show the party that it has adopted the motion. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/30/2016. (adg)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Murali Menon in Support of The Sultan Center's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint in Intervention of the United States of America for Insufficient Service of Process by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Murali Menon, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cochran, Anthony)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE Of Filing Updated Version of The Sultan Center's #200 Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant Charles Tobias Switzer's Motion and Brief by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Cochran, Anthony) Modified on 8/25/2016 (jkl).
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE Of Filing Updated Version of The Sultan Center's #199 Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant Emad El-Saleh's Motion and Brief (to Add Docket Numbers) by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Cochran, Anthony) Modified on 8/25/2016 (jkl).
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE Of Filing Updated Version of The Sultan Center's #198 Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant PWC's Motions and Briefs (to Add Docket Numbers) by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Cochran, Anthony) Modified on 8/25/2016 (jkl).
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE Of Filing Updated Version of Brief in Support of #196 Motion to Dismiss by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Brief (updated with docket numbers))(Cochran, Anthony) Modified on 8/25/2016 (jkl).
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Table of Contents included in Defendant Charles Tobias Switzer's Memorandum In Support Of His #202 MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Diffley, Daniel) Modified on 8/24/2016 (jkl).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint of Relator Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan, Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b), 12(b)(1), 12(b)(5), and 12(b)(6) with Brief In Support by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b), 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), #2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(1), #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Affidavit of Ahmed Alsayed Abdul Aziz, #5 Affidavit of Nedhal Al Humaidan, #6 Affidavit of Richard Marmaro, #7 Affidavit of Matthew E. Sloan, #8 Affidavit of Kristin N. Tahler, #9 Affidavit of Richard H. Deane, Jr., #10 Affidavit of Michael Charness)(Marmaro, Richard)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Supplemental Brief in Support of #203 MOTION for Order by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Emily Ludmir Aviad, #2 Exhibit A-G)(Marmaro, Richard) Modified on 8/24/2016 (jkl).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION to Adopt Co-Defendant The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.'s #164 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa. (Marmaro, Richard) Modified on 8/26/2016 (adg).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Charles Tobias Switzer adopted by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Diffley, Daniel) Modified on 8/31/2016 (adg).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Emad Alsaleh, adopted by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Affidavit of Emad A. Al-Saleh)(McEvoy, Brian) Modified on 8/31/2016 (adg).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MOTION to Adopt Co-Defendant Charles Tobias Switzer's #202 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Cochran, Anthony) Modified on 8/26/2016 (adg). Modified on 8/26/2016 (adg).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION to Adopt Co-Defendant Emad Al-Saleh's #201 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Cochran, Anthony) Modified on 8/26/2016 (adg). Modified on 8/26/2016 (adg).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MOTION to Adopt Co-Defendant PWC's #164 MOTION Transfer Case to Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Cochran, Anthony) Modified on 8/26/2016 (adg).
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Based on United States' Notice of Election to Intervene with Brief In Support by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Cochran, Anthony)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) with Brief In Support by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Cochran, Anthony)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process with Brief In Support by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Cochran, Anthony)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #176 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Emily Aviad as counsel for The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/22/16. (jkl)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #177 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Ross M Cuff for The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/22/16. (jkl)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting #189 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Defendants PWC and Tarek Sultan's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/22/2016. (ss)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Kendall Pro Hac Vice by Emad Alsaleh. (McEvoy, Brian)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 APPLICATION for Admission of Yakov Malkiel Pro Hac Vice by Emad Alsaleh. (McEvoy, Brian)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order RETURN of #178 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Kendall Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6611013) to attorney for correction re: format. (pb)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order RETURN of #179 APPLICATION for Admission of Yakov Malkiel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6611047) to attorney for correction re: format. (pb)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Defendants PWC and Tarek Sultan's Motion to Dismiss by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marmaro, Richard)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #176 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Aviad (amended petition) Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Emily Ludmir Aviad added appearing on behalf of The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (pb)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #177 APPLICATION for Admission of Ross M. Cuff Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ross M. Cuff added appearing on behalf of The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (pb)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order RETURN of #175 APPLICATION for Admission of Ross M. Cuff Pro Hac Vice to attorney. (pb)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order RETURN of #174 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Aviad Pro Hac Vice to attorney. (pb)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 RESPONSE in Opposition re #180 MOTION for Reconsideration re #147 Order MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moss, Raymond)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, First Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint , as to Emad Alsaleh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit E-2, #7 Exhibit F)(Moss, Raymond)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, First Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint , as to Charles Tobias Switzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit E-2)(Moss, Raymond)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, First Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint , as to Tarek Sultan Al-Essa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit E-2)(Moss, Raymond)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, First Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint , as to The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit E-2, #7 Exhibit F)(Moss, Raymond)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, First Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint , as to The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C., a/k/a Agility. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit E-2)(Moss, Raymond)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Lauren Misztal re #171 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkl)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) with Brief In Support by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Cochran, Anthony)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process with Brief In Support by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1)(Cochran, Anthony)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION for Extension of Time and MOTION for Reconsideration re #147 Order with Brief In Support by Emad Alsaleh. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(McEvoy, Brian) Text modified on 8/5/2016 (jkl).
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 APPLICATION for Admission of Yakov Malkiel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6611047)by Emad Alsaleh. (McEvoy, Brian)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Kendall Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6611013)by Emad Alsaleh. (McEvoy, Brian)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 APPLICATION for Admission of Ross M. Cuff Pro Hac Vice by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Andrews, Lucas)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Aviad (amended petition) Pro Hac Vice by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Andrews, Lucas)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 APPLICATION for Admission of Ross M. Cuff Pro Hac Vice by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Andrews, Lucas)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Aviad Pro Hac Vice by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Andrews, Lucas)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma R. Cecil on behalf of Emad Alsaleh (Cecil, Emma)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order RETURN of #165 APPLICATION for Admission of Ross M. Cuff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6577341) to attorney for correction re: form. (pb)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order RETURN of #166 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Aviad Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6577413) to attorney for correction re: form. (pb)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Fenton McEvoy on behalf of Emad Alsaleh (McEvoy, Brian)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #162 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lauren Misztal to appear on behalf of The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/2/16. (jkl)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #168 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer First Amended Complaint, Answer due 10/11/2016 by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/1/2016. (ss)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #162 APPLICATION for Admission of Lauren Misztal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6573024). Attorney Lauren Misztal added appearing on behalf of The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (pb)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint , as to The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Klein, Patrick)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Deadlines by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cochran, Anthony) Modified on 7/28/2016 to remove double wording (adg).
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #161 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for defendants' to file answer and/or motions in response to Relator to 8/22/2016. #13 First Amended Complaint and #60 Second Amended Complaint; Relator shall have until 11/9/2016 to file any response to Defendants' answers and/or motion; and Defendants shall have until 12/9/2016 to file any replies. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/25/2016. (bdb)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Aviad Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6577413)by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Andrews, Lucas)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 APPLICATION for Admission of Ross M. Cuff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6577341)by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Andrews, Lucas)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION to Transfer Case to Venue to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania with Brief In Support by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. , adopted by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. and Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit of Binoe Verghese, #3 Exhibit 1-9 to Declaration of Binoe Verghese, #4 Affidavit of Shakir Iqbal, #5 Affidavit of Emily Ludmir Aviad, #6 Exhibit A-U to Declaration of Emily Ludmir Aviad, #7 Affidavit of Matthew E. Sloan)(Marmaro, Richard) Modified on 8/31/2016 (adg).
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b), 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) with Brief In Support by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6), #2 Exhibit 1_part 1, #3 Exhibit 1_part 2, #4 Exhibit 2-7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10-15, #8 Brief pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(5), #9 Exhibit 1-2, #10 Affidavit of Ahmed Alsayed Abdul Aziz, #11 Affidavit of Nedhal Al-Humaidan, #12 Affidavit of Ehad Aziz, #13 Affidavit of Richard Marmaro, #14 Affidavit of Matthew E. Sloan, #15 Affidavit of Kristin N. Tahler, #16 Affidavit of Richard H. Deane, #17 Affidavit of Michael Charness)(Marmaro, Richard)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 APPLICATION for Admission of Lauren Misztal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6573024)by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Andrews, Lucas)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file answers and/or motions in reponse to Relator's Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Second Amended Complaint by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marmaro, Richard)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas W. Andrews on behalf of The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (Andrews, Lucas)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages re: Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/14/2016. (ss)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support of PWC's Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Page Limits Under Local Rule 7.1 by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marmaro, Richard) Text modified on 7/13/2016 (jkl).
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion for Extension of Time to 8/1/16 for defendant Sultan Center Food Product Company, K.S.C. ("TSC") to respond to #78 Amended Complaint. USA shall have until 10/4/2016 to file any response to answer or motion and TSC have until 11/4/16 to file any reply. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/8/2016. (ss)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for The Sultan Center to answer or file motion(s) re #78 First Amended Complaint, for the government to file response, and for The Sultan Center to file reply by The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cochran, Anthony) Text modified on 7/8/2016 (jkl).
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Electronic Summons Issued as to Emad Alsaleh. (jkl)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa. (jkl)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Electronic Summons Issued as to Charles Tobias Switzer. (jkl)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. (jkl)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Electronic Summons Issued as to Agility Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (jkl)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kamal Al-Sultan Agility Public Warehousing Co., KSC (Attachments: #1 Summons Sultan Center Food Products Co., KSC, #2 Summons Tarek Abdulaziz Sultan AlEssa, #3 Summons Charles Tobias Switzer, #4 Summons Emad AlSaleh)(Moss, Raymond)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #78 First Amended Complaint. The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (PWC)'s answer and/or responsive pleading due 7/18/2016. Plaintiff United States of America shall have until 9/16/16 to file any response to PWCs answer and/ormotion(s); and PWC shall have until 10/17/16 to file any reply. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/3/16. (jkl)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re #148 MOTION for Extension of Time. (jkl)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Consent Motion for Extension of Filing Deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marmaro, Richard) Event type modified on 6/2/2016 (jkl).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #134 Plaintiff's Motion for Authorization of Alternative Service. For The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C., Tarek Sultan Al-Essa and Charles Tobias Switzer the Court orders service of any and all judicial documents, including the Summons and Complaint, through electronic mail and certified mail on the counsel. For The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C., the Court orders service of any and all judicial documents, including the Summons and Complaint, through electronic mail and certified mail on counsel. In addition, for The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C., the Court also orders service of any and all judicial documents, including the Summons and Complaint, through electronic mail and international courier on TSCs Kuwaiti counsel. For Emad Alsaleh, the Court orders service of any and all judicial documents, including the Summons and Complaint, through electronic mail through the following LinkedIn address: https://www.linkedin.com/in/emad-alsaleh-43a4a82. In addition, for Emad Alsaleh, the Court also orders service of any and alljudicial documents, including the Summons and Complaint, through electronic mail and international courier on Emad Alsaleh's Kuwaiti counsel. For The PublicWarehousing Company, K.S.C. The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C., Tarek Sultan Al-Essa, Charles Tobias Switzer and Emad Alsaleh, the Court orders service of any and all judicial documents, including the Summons and Complaint, through international courier at the following addresses and publication in a Kuwait newspaper of general circulation, such as Al Qabas, Al Rai, Alshahid or the Kuwait Times.(See order for emails and addresses) Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/13/2016. (bdb)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #134 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/18/16. (TWT)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #134 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, MOTION for Leave to File Relators and MOTION for Authorization of Alternative Service. Submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (bdb)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re #134 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION for Leave to File Relators MOTION for Authorization of Alternative Service Surreply filed by Charles Tobias Switzer. (Mitchelson, William)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #143 Motion for Leave to File Surreply by Charles Tobias Switzer. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/16/16. (TWT)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Charles Tobias Switzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mitchelson, William)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPLY to Response to Motion re #134 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION for Leave to File Relators MOTION for Authorization of Alternative Service filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Moss, Raymond)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING #136 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clifford M. Sloan. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/5/2016. (adg)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER GRANTING #132 Motion for Service by Alternative Means on Defendants Residing in Kuwait. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/4/2016. (adg)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #136 APPLICATION for Admission of Clifford M. Sloan Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Clifford M. Sloan added appearing on behalf of Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (pb)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #132 MOTION for Service By Alternative Means, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (adg)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE re #134 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION for Leave to File Relators MOTION for Authorization of Alternative Service filed by Charles Tobias Switzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Mitchelson, William)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re #134 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION for Leave to File Relators MOTION for Authorization of Alternative Service filed by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Affidavit of Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, #3 Affidavit of Nedhal Humaidan, #4 Affidavit of Richard Marmaro, #5 Affidavit of Matthew E. Sloan, #6 Affidavit of Kristin N. Tahler, #7 Affidavit of Richard H. Deane, #8 Affidavit of Michael Charness)(Marmaro, Richard)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 REPLY to Response to Motion re #132 MOTION for Service By Alternative Means filed by United States of America Ex Rel. (Klein, Patrick)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 APPLICATION for Admission of Clifford M. Sloan Pro Hac Vice by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Deane, Richard)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order RETURN of #133 APPLICATION for Admission of Clifford M. Sloan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6230854) to attorney for correction re: form. (pb)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition re #132 MOTION for Service By Alternative Means Defendant The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.'s Opposition to United States' Motion for Leave to Serve the Defendants Residing in Kuwait By Alternative Means filed by The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Affidavit of Ehab Aziz, #3 Affidavit of Ahmed Alsayed Abdul Aziz, #4 Affidavit of Nedhal Humaidan, #5 Affidavit of Richard Marmaro, #6 Affidavit of Matthew E. Sloan, #7 Affidavit of Kristin N. Tahler, #8 Affidavit of Richard H. Deane, #9 Affidavit of Michael Charness)(Marmaro, Richard)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , MOTION for Leave to File Relators MOTION for Authorization of Alternative Service with Brief In Support by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Relators Motion for Authorization of Alternative Service with Brief in Support, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Affidavit, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Raymond) Modified on 1/13/2016 to edit text (kdw). Modified on 1/19/2016 (adg).
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 APPLICATION for Admission of Clifford M. Sloan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6230854)by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deane, Richard)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION for Service By Alternative Means with Brief In Support by United States of America Ex Rel. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Patrick)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/30/15 (Status Conf), before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Alicia Bagley, Telephone number 706-378-4017. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (pjm)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order The Court approves the #130 Fourth Status Report of the United States Regarding Efforts to Serve its First Amended Complaint-in-Intervention (ss)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STATUS REPORT Fourth Status Report of the United States Regarding Efforts to Serve its First Amended Complaint-in-Intervention by United States of America Ex Rel. (Berne, Amy)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 9/30/2015, granting #124 Motion to Reopen Case. Government to file a status report by 11/2/16. (Court Reporter Alicia Bagley)(dr)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Berne on behalf of United States of America Ex Rel (Berne, Amy)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/30/2015 at 10:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: It appearing that a related case, United States v. The Public Warehousing Company, K.D. C., 1:09-CR-490, is presently pending before the Honorable Thomas W. Thrash, the Clerk is hereby directed to TRANSFER this case to Chief Judge Thrash. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:05-cv-2968-TWT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/15/2015. (cem)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Submission of #124 MOTION to Reopen Case, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (cem)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Submission of #124 MOTION to Reopen Case, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (cem)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DECLINING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard W. Story for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:05-cv-2968-RWS. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 9/9/2015. (adg)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STATUS REPORT Third Status Report of the United States Regarding Efforts to Serve its Complaint-in-intervention by United States of America Ex Rel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Berne, Amy)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION to Reopen Case with Brief In Support by United States of America Ex Rel. (Berne, Amy)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr.. Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:05-cv-02968-CAP. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (tcc)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Change of Address for Kristin N. Tahler, counsel for Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (Tahler, Kristin)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #121 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gerald B. Kline terminated. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 11/4/13. (jpa)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Submission of #121 MOTION to Withdraw Gerald B. Kline as Attorney, to District Judge Robert L. Vining. (bjh)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to Withdraw Gerald B. Kline as Attorneyby Kamal Al-Sultan. (Kline, Gerald)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Summons Issued as to The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. (bdb)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Change of Address for Raymond L. Moss, counsel for Kamal Al-Sultan (Moss, Raymond)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. of Withdrawal of Garrett L. Bradford and Certificate of Consent Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1E(2) (Deane, Richard)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER administratively closing the case. The case may be reopened upon the motion of any party when the Kuwaiti appeal has been resolved. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 1/17/13. (jpa)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated. (jpa)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STATUS REPORT by Agility Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C., Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, Charles Tobias Switzer, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Marmaro, Richard)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying #102 Motion for Extension of Time ; denying #103 Motion to Stay. Within 14 days of the docketing of this order, the court DIRECTS the defendants to file a status report regarding the status of any appeal of the Kuwaiti judgment referred to in the plaintiff's pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr on 6/6/2012. (dob)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Submission of #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defaulting Defendants' Motions and Related Submissions #103 , MOTION to Stay Adjudication of Pending Defensive Motions and Submissions, to District Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. (bjh)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting #110 Proposed Consent Order Extending Time for Relator Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan to file his Memoranda in Response to Defendant Switzer's Brief in Opposition #105 and Supplemental Brief in Opposition #109 through and including May 11, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 5/8/12. (bjh)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting #83 Motion to Set Aside Default; Granting #86 Joint Motion to Set Aside Default; Clerk's entry of default against defendants Tobias Switzer, Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C., and Tarek Adbul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa is set aside. Denying as Moot #87 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 5/7/12. (bjh)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Mishari Al-Ghazali in Support re #103 MOTION to Stay Adjudication of Pending Defensive Motions and Submissions, #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defaulting Defendants' Motions and Related Submissions Second Supplemental Declaration of Mishari Al-Ghazali in Support of Relator Kamal Al-Sultan filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Kline, Gerald) Modified on 5/8/2012 to edit text to reflect pdf (bjh).
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum in Support re #103 MOTION to Stay Adjudication of Pending Defensive Motions and Submissions, #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defaulting Defendants' Motions and Related Submissions filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Kline, Gerald) Modified on 5/8/2012 to edit text to reflect pdf (bjh).
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Extending Time re #108 Response in Opposition to Motion, #105 Response in Opposition to Motion, #103 MOTION to Stay Adjudication of Pending Defensive Motions and Submissions, #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defaulting Defendants' Motions and Related Submissions, #109 Response in Opposition to Motion, #83 MOTION to Set Aside Default. (Kline, Gerald) Modified on 5/7/2012 to delete double wording (bjh).
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Opposition re #103 MOTION to Stay Adjudication of Pending Defensive Motions and Submissions, #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defaulting Defendants' Motions and Related Submissions filed by Charles Tobias Switzer. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Diffley, Daniel) Modified on 5/1/2012 to edit text to reflect pdf (bjh).
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Submission of #87 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, #86 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Default, to District Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. (bjh)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION to Stay Adjudication of Pending Defensive Motions and Submissions, #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defaulting Defendants' Motions and Related Submissions filed by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Meshal Al-Nimesh, #3 Declaration of Ahmed Sayed Sharhan)(Deane, Richard)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re #107 Reply Brief. Incorrect event selected, double wording, not captioned to the Judge, Clerk made necessary corrections and notified atty of same. (bjh)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #103 MOTION to Stay Adjudication of Pending Defensive Motions and Submissions, re #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defaulting Defendants' Motions and Related Submissions filed by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Kline, Gerald) Modified on 4/24/2012 to edit text to reflect pdf, to delete double wording (bjh).
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE by Kamal Al-Sultan of Filing Supplemental Exhibits re #102 Motion for Extension, re #103 Motion to Stay. (Kline, Gerald) Modified on 4/24/2012 to provide linkage (bjh).
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 BRIEF in Opposition re #103 MOTION to Stay Adjudication of Pending Defensive Motions and Submissions, #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defaulting Defendants' Motions and Related Submissions filed by Charles Tobias Switzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Diffley, Daniel) Modified on 4/24/2012 to edit text to reflect pdf (bjh).
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE Of Filing of correct copy of Exhibit 2 (Document 83-4) by Charles Tobias Switzer re #83 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Diffley, Daniel)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION to Stay Adjudication of Pending Defensive Motions and Submissions with Brief In Support by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Relator's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defaulting Defendants' Motions and Related Submissions and Motion to Stay Adjudication of Pending Defensive Motions and Submissions, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Raymond L. Moss, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Mishari Al-Ghazali, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Yousef Dashti)(Kline, Gerald)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defaulting Defendants' Motions and Related Submissions with Brief In Support re #83 , re #86 , re #88 by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Relator's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defaulting Defedants' Motions and Related Submissions and Motion to Stay Adjudication of Pending Defensive Motions and Submissions, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Raymond L. Moss, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Mishari Al-Ghazali, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Yousef Dashti)(Kline, Gerald) Modified on 4/18/2012 to edit text to provide linkage (bjh).
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting #95 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kristin N. Tahler o/b/o Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 4/13/12. (bjh)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Granting #94 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E. Sloan o/b/o Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 4/13/12. (bjh)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting #93 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jack P. DiCanio o/b/o Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 4/13/12. (bjh)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting #92 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Marmaro o/b/o Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. on 4/13/12. (bjh)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett L. Bradford on behalf of Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bradford, Garrett)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Bailey on behalf of Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bailey, David)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #92 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard Marmaro Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3874728), #95 APPLICATION for Admission of Kristin N. Tahler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3874753), #94 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew E. Sloan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3874747), #93 APPLICATION for Admission of Jack P. DiCanio Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3874741). Attorney Kristin N. Tahler, Richard Marmaro, Matthew E. Sloan, Jack P. DiCanio added appearing on behalf of Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (pb)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 APPLICATION for Admission of Kristin N. Tahler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3874753)by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Deane, Richard)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew E. Sloan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3874747)by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Deane, Richard)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 APPLICATION for Admission of Jack P. DiCanio Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3874741)by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Deane, Richard)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard Marmaro Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3874728)by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Deane, Richard)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Special Appearance by the firm Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP by Richard H. Deane, Jr., David J. Bailey, and Garrett L. Bradford on behalf of Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Deane, Richard) Modified on 4/12/2012 to edit text to reflect pdf (bjh).
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Clerks Notation re #84 Certificate of Interested Persons signed on 4/10/12 by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. (bjh)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Clerks Notation re #85 Certificate of Interested Persons signed on 4/10/12 by Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. (bjh)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition To Relator's Application For Entry Of Default Judgment filed by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Nedhal Humaidan, #3 Declaration of Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, #4 Declaration of Ahmed Al Sayed Abdul Aziz)(Deane, Richard)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Deane, Richard)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Default with Brief In Support by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Deane, Richard)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Certificate of Interested Persons by Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (Deane, Richard)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Certificate of Interested Persons by Charles Tobias Switzer. (Diffley, Daniel)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default And In Opposition to Relator's Application for Entry of Default Judgment with Brief In Support by Charles Tobias Switzer. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and in Opposition to Relator's Application for Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Diffley, Daniel) Modified on 4/10/2012 to edit text to reflect pdf (bjh).
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Francis Diffley on behalf of Charles Tobias Switzer (Diffley, Daniel)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order SET ASIDE PER ORDER #113 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, Charles Tobias Switzer. (bjh) Modified on 5/8/2012 (bjh).
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Public Warehousing Company-K.S.C. d/b/a PWC Logistics (n/k/a Agility Public Warehousing Co., (K.S.C.); Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa; and Charles Tobias Switzer with Brief In Support by Kamal Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Application for Entry of Default Judgment Against Certain Defendants, #2 Relator's Memorandum in Support, #3 Affidavit of Rick Hamilton, #4 Proposed Order and Judgment)(Kline, Gerald)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order SET ASIDE PER ORDER #113 Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C. (bjh) Modified on 5/8/2012 (bjh).
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Summons Reissued as to Emad Alsaleh. (dfb)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Summons Reissued as to Agility Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C., Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa, Charles Tobias Switzer, The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C. (dfb) Modified on 11/18/2011 to correct parties served. (dfb)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 First AMENDED COMPLAINT In Intervention Of The United States Of America against The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C., The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C., Agility Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C., filed by United States of America Ex Rel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Berne, Amy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STATUS REPORT Second Regarding Efforts To Serve Complaint In Intervention On Defendants by United States of America Ex Rel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Berne, Amy)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STATUS REPORT Of The United States Of America Regarding Efforts To Serve Complaint In Intervention On Defendants by United States of America Ex Rel. (Berne, Amy)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (pdw)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge G. Ernest Tidwell recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert L. Vining, Jr. for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:05-cv-2968-RLV. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge G. Ernest Tidwell on 1/20/11. (jlm)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Summons Issued as to The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.. (tcc)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Summons Issued as to The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.. (tcc)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT in Intervention of the United States of America against The Public Warehousing Company - - K.S.C., The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C., filed by United States of America Ex Rel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Berne, Amy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING pla/relator's #67 Motion to Amend and GRANTING the United States' #69 Motion to Amend as follows: Paragraphs 2 & 3 of the 11/13/09 order are stricken in their entirety; Paragraph 2 shall now state: "The Government shall serve its complaint in this action upon dfts Public Warehousing Co - KSC d/b/a PWC Logistics, The Sultan Center Food Products Co and Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al Essa in accordance with Rule 4 of the FRCP pertaining to service upon individuals and corporations not within any judicial district of the United States." Paragraph 3 shall now state: "Relator shall serve his complaint, First Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint upon dfts in accordance with Rule 4 of the FRCP pertaining to service upon individuals and corporations not within any judicial district of the United States." To the extent there are any dfts to whom the provisions of FRCP 4 pertaining to service upon individuals and corporations not within any judicial district of the United States are inapplicable, nothing in this order shall prevent either the United States or the pla/relator from seeking an extension of time for service of process for good cause shown pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Nothing in this order shall prevent the United States or the pla/relator from undertaking at any time to commence or to perfect service of process upon any of the defendants here in by any means and procedures permitted under the applicable law. Signed by Judge G. Ernest Tidwell on 3/8/10. (jlm)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE MOTION to Modify 11/13/09 #66 Order with Brief in Support by United States of America Ex Rel. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(jlm)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RELATOR'S AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER re: #67 MOTION to Modify Prior #66 Order and to Suspend and Defer Service of Process on Defendants. (jlm)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RELATOR'S EX PARTE MOTION to Modify Prior #66 Order and to Suspend and Defer Service of Process on Defendants, with Brief In Support by Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(jlm)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER UNSEALING DOCUMENTS #1 Complaint, #13 Amended Complaint, #60 Second Amended Complaint, #65 Notice of Election to Intervene in Part and to Decline to Intervene in Part and this present #66 Order on 11/16/09. Govt shall serve its complaint upon defendants PWC, Sultan Center Foods Products Company and Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa within 120 days of this order. Relator shall serve his complaint, amended complaint and second amended complaint upon defendants within 120 days of this order. All other documents or orders on file in this matter shall REMAIN UNDER SEAL. SEAL IS LIFTED on all other matters occurring in this action ON OR AFTER 11/16/09. As to the part of action the United States has declined to intervene, parties shall serve all pleadings and motions filed in that part of the action including supporting memorandum upon the United States pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3730(c)(3). United States may order any deposition transcripts and is entitled to intervene in that part of the action for good cause at any time. All orders of this Court shall be sent to the United States. The Court will solicit written consent of the United States before ruling or granting its approval of any dismissal, settlement or discontinuation of the part of the action in which the United States has not intervened. Signed by Judge G. Ernest Tidwell on 11/13/09. (jlm) Modified on 11/16/2009 (jlm).
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Election to Intervene, In Part and to Decline to Intervene, In Part by The United States of America. (jlm)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by United States of America Ex Rel, Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan.(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by United States of America Ex Rel, Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P) (adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 11/16/2009 to remove "Sealed" from docket entry (scg).
November 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by United States of America Ex Rel and Kamal Mustafa Al-Sultan. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney ( Filing fee $ 250.00 receipt number 544297.)(epm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2009: #1 Exh A, #2 Exh B, #3 Exh C, #4 Exh D, #5 Exh E, #6 Exh F, #7 Exh G, #8 Exh H, #9 Exh I-1, #10 Exh I-2, #11 Exh J-1, #12 Exh J-2, #13 Exh K-1, #14 Exh K-2, #15 Exh L-1, #16 Exh L-2, #17 Exh M, #18 Exh N, #19 Exh O) (jlm). Modified on 11/16/2009 (jlm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, ex rel, et al. v. The Public Warehousing Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.
Represented By: Clifford M. Sloan
Represented By: Emily Ludmir Aviad
Represented By: Richard Marmaro
Represented By: Ross M. Cuff
Represented By: David J. Bailey
Represented By: Garrett L. Bradford
Represented By: Jack P. DiCanio
Represented By: Lucas W. Andrews
Represented By: Jordan E. Alexander
Represented By: Kristin N. Tahler
Represented By: Lauren Misztal
Represented By: Matthew E. Sloan
Represented By: Richard H. Deane, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agility
Represented By: Jordan E. Alexander
Represented By: Kristin N. Tahler
Represented By: Lauren Misztal
Represented By: Matthew E. Sloan
Represented By: Ross M. Cuff
Represented By: Emily Ludmir Aviad
Represented By: Lucas W. Andrews
Represented By: Clifford M. Sloan
Represented By: Richard Marmaro
Represented By: David J. Bailey
Represented By: Garrett L. Bradford
Represented By: Jack P. DiCanio
Represented By: Richard H. Deane, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sultan Center Food Products Company, K.S.C.
Represented By: John D. Dalbey
Represented By: Anthony L. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarek Abdul Aziz Sultan Al-Essa
Represented By: Clifford M. Sloan
Represented By: Kristin N. Tahler
Represented By: Matthew E. Sloan
Represented By: Richard Marmaro
Represented By: David J. Bailey
Represented By: Garrett L. Bradford
Represented By: Jack P. DiCanio
Represented By: Richard H. Deane, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Tobias Switzer
Represented By: Daniel Francis Diffley
Represented By: Thomas C. Spencer Pryor
Represented By: William Roy Mitchelson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emad Alsaleh
Represented By: Michael Kendall
Represented By: Yakov Malkiel
Represented By: Brian Fenton McEvoy
Represented By: Emma R. Cecil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agility Public Warehousing Company, K.S.C.
Represented By: Lucas W. Andrews
Represented By: Jordan E. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America Ex Rel
Represented By: Michal Tingle
Represented By: Patrick M. Klein
Represented By: Amy L. Berne
Represented By: Art J. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamal Al-Sultan
Represented By: Raymond L. Moss
Represented By: Jerome Froelich, Jr
Represented By: Gerald B. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?