Khattab v. Morehouse School of Medicine
Plaintiff: Khaldoun Khattab
Defendant: Morehouse School of Medicine
Case Number: 1:2007cv00196
Filed: January 22, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Story
Presiding Judge: Linda T. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (other)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER granting Defendant's 522 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. The Court AWARDS to Defendant Morehouse School of Medicine attorneys' fees in the amount of $437,476.57. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/23/2009. (gar)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 508 Emergency Motion for Leave to File a response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court hereby ADOPTS the 505 Final Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker and GRANTS Defendant's 411 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/20/2009. (gar)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER DENYING 370 Motion to Honorable Judge Story to Issue Subpoena to compel the deposition testimony of Dr. Samuel Aguayo; 373 Motion requesting the interference of Honorable Judge Story to address discover disputes and interrupting justice; [3 75] Motion to Honorable Judge Story to Compel releasing documents approved by Morehouse BOT and is related to plaintiff; 376 Motion to provide any written reason(S) for denying plaintiffs Motion docket 183; 377 Motion to Schedule a Status confere nce; 383 Motion Requesting Honorable Judge Story to Intervene in compelling Discovery; 384 Appeal to Honorable Judge Story against Limiting deposition testimonies to be only eight (8); 386 Appeal to Honorable District Judge story against Magist rate Judge Walker verbal orders; 395 Motion Requesting the Intervene [sic] of Honorable Judge Story; 396 Motion to Honorable Chief Judge Camp to Intervene and Release all this case hearings recorded tapes; 397 Motion to Honorable Judge Story to certify clarify or reverse Honorable Judge Walker orders issued in 2008; 440 Motion to Honorable Judge Story to direct the clerk of court to serve the plaintiff; 490 Motion to Honorable Judge Richard W. Story, to Serve Plaintiff Electronically. Plaintiff's 442 Motion to Judge Story to rule on the pending Motions and 462 Motion to Expedite Ruling are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/11/09. (ekb)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER DENYING 491 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re 487 Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/28/09. (ekb)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER denying 332 Motion to Honorable Judge Story to Release the Transcripts and Recording of all this case Hearings; denying 334 Motion to Honorable Judge Story to Compel the defendant to release a copy of the Plaintiff's deposition transcr ipt and to File it through PACER; denying 343 Appeal to Honorable District Judge Story against Magistrate judge walker order denying submitting documents under seal docket (246); denying 348 Appeal to Honorable District Judge story against Magist rate Judge Walker order denying plaintiff Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Supplement Pleadings; denying 349 Appeal to the Honorable District Judge against Magistrate Judge order granting protective order against answering Request for admission (Docket 288); denying 351 Appeal to the Honorable District Judges against Magistrate Judge order issued August 14, 2008 denying compelling discovery or Sanctions. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/10/09. (ekb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khattab v. Morehouse School of Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morehouse School of Medicine
Represented By: Vernon M. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khaldoun Khattab
Represented By: Paul Crandall Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?