Stallings et al v. Michelin Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dontarie M. Stallings and Rhonda Woods
Defendant: Michelin North America, Inc., Michelin Americas Research & Development Corporation, Michelin Corporation, Isuzu Motors America, Inc., Isuzu Motors, Ltd. and Fictitious Defendants A through Z
Case Number: 1:2007cv02497
Filed: October 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Cobb
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Story
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal-Property Damage/Product Liabili
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 135 Motion to Reconsider 2/15/12 Spoliation Sanction Order against Plaintiffs and Troy Cottles. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/23/12. (cem)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying 117 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration re 116 the Court's 2/25/11 Order. Having examined Defendants Statement of Fees and Expenses 119 and finding the request to be reasonable, the Court AWARDS $6,723.00 for the fees and expenses incurred in pursuing the Motion for Contempt and Sanctions 112 and $10,904.58 for the fees and expenses resulting from the re-inspection of the tires. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/2/11. (cem)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying 74 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Troy Cottles, Defendants' 75 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, Defendants' 80 Motion for Oral Argument is DENIED as moot, Def endants' 89 Motion to Compel Discovery Relating to Mr. Troy Cottles's "Compression Grooving Study" is GRANTED, and Defendants' 91 Motion to Compel Documents is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/12/2010. (gar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallings et al v. Michelin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelin North America, Inc.
Represented By: C. Angela Marie Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelin Americas Research & Development Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelin Corporation
Represented By: Sharon Leah Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isuzu Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isuzu Motors, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fictitious Defendants A through Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontarie M. Stallings
Represented By: Lara Peace Percifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Woods
Represented By: Lara Peace Percifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?