Toffoloni v. LFP Publishing Group, LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Maureen Toffoloni
Defendant: LFP Publishing Group, LLC, Mark Samansky and Defendants X, Y, and Z
Case Number: 1:2008cv00421
Filed: February 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Thrash
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2011 Filing 272 USCA Acknowledgment of COR re: 259 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC, and 245 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-12922-DD. (kac)
October 12, 2011 Filing 271 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re: 259 Notice of Cross Appeal and 245 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-12922-DD. (kac)
September 28, 2011 Filing 270 FORTHWITH LETTER from USCA re: 259 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC, and 245 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-12922-DD. Appeal Record due by 10/12/2011. (kac)
August 22, 2011 Filing 269 USCA Acknowledgment of COR re: 259 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC, and 245 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-12922-DD. (kac)
August 16, 2011 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to LFP Publishing Group, LLC, and Maureen Toffoloni mailed to William M. Feigenbaum re: 268 Certificate of Readiness Transmission. (kac)
August 16, 2011 Filing 268 Certified copy of CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of Record on Appeal transmitted to USCA re: 259 Notice of Cross Appeal and 245 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-12922-DD. (kac)
August 16, 2011 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of Record on Appeal re: 259 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC, and 245 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-12922-DD. (kac)
August 15, 2011 Filing 267 DEPOSITION of Christopher Lee Helton taken on April 22, 2011 by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(kac)
August 15, 2011 Filing 266 DEPOSITION of Tyler Downey taken on April 21, 2011 by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(kac)
August 4, 2011 Filing 265 USCA Acknowledgment of 259 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-12922-DD. (kac)
August 3, 2011 Filing 264 Appeal notice from USCA sent to counsel of record re: 259 Notice of Cross Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-12922-DD. (kac)
July 20, 2011 Filing 262 NOTICE Of Filing Notification that 253 , 255 , 252 , 251 and 254 Transcripts have been filed in District Court by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (kac)
July 18, 2011 Filing 261 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on June 13, 2011 through June 17, 2011 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., re: 259 Notice of Cross Appeal. Court Reporter: Susan C. Baker. Certificate of Readiness due on 8/1/2011. (All necessary transcripts on file.)(kac)
July 18, 2011 Filing 260 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Verdict, Minute Sheets, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 259 Notice of Cross Appeal. (kac)
July 18, 2011 Filing 259 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 244 Clerk's Judgment, 173 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Oral Argument, 236 Jury Verdict and 237 Minute Sheet by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. Filing fee $455.00; Receipt Number 113E-3410650. Transcript Order Form due on 7/28/2011 (Solomon, Darrell) Modified on 7/18/2011 to include document relationship (kac).
July 12, 2011 Filing 258 USCA Acknowledgment of certified copy of docket sheets reflecting payment of appeal filing and docketing fees re: 245 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-12922-D. (kac)
July 12, 2011 Filing 257 USCA Acknowledgment of certified copy of docket sheets reflecting payment of appeal filing and docketing fees re: 245 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-12922-D. (kac)
July 8, 2011 Filing 256 NOTICE Of Filing Notification that 253 , 255 , 252 , 251 , and 254 Transcripts Have Been filed in District Court by Maureen Toffoloni.(kac)
July 7, 2011 Set Certificate of Readiness deadline. Certificate of Readiness due on 7/18/2011.(kac)
July 7, 2011 Filing 255 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings (Volume V) held on June 17, 2011, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notification of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
July 7, 2011 Filing 254 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings (Volume IV) held on June 16, 2011, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notification of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
July 7, 2011 Filing 253 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings (Volume III) held on June 15, 2011, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notification of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
July 7, 2011 Filing 252 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings (Volume II) held on June 14, 2011, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notification of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
July 7, 2011 Filing 251 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings (Volume I) held on June 13, 2011, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notification of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
July 1, 2011 Filing 250 USCA Acknowledgment of 245 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-12922-D. (kac)
June 30, 2011 Filing 249 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on June 13, 2011 through June 17, 2011 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., re: 245 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Susan C. Baker. Financial Arrangements due on 7/14/2011. (kac)
June 27, 2011 Filing 248 Forwarded certified copy of docket sheets reflecting payment of appeal filing and docketing fees to USCA re: 245 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 00-00000-00. (kac)
June 24, 2011 Filing 247 USCA Appeal Fees received $455.00; Receipt Number GAN100036591 re: 245 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (kac)
June 23, 2011 Filing 246 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 245 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
June 22, 2011 Filing 245 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 244 Clerk's Judgment, by Maureen Toffoloni. Transcript Order Form due on 7/6/2011 (Decker, Richard)
June 17, 2011 Civil Case Terminated. (rvb)
June 17, 2011 Filing 244 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant. It is Ordered and Adjudged that Plaintiff Maureen Toffoloni, as Administrator and Personal Representative of the Estate of Nance E. Benoit, recover of defendant LFP PUBLISHING GROUP, LLC $375,000.00 plus interest and her costs of action. (rvb)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
June 17, 2011 Filing 243 EXHIBITS received from Courtroom Deputy re the Jury Trial from 06/13/2011 until 06/17/2011 held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. and placed in Exhibit room. (rvb)
June 17, 2011 Filing 242 Exhibit List, by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(rvb)
June 17, 2011 Filing 241 Exhibit List, by Maureen Toffoloni. (rvb)
June 17, 2011 Filing 240 Witness List, by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (rvb)
June 17, 2011 Filing 239 Witness List, by Maureen Toffoloni. (rvb)
June 17, 2011 Filing 238 JURY VERDICT in the amount of $19,603,600 as punitive damages. (rvb)
June 17, 2011 Filing 237 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Jury Trial concluded on 6/17/2011. Defense counsel requested reconsideration as to Punitive Damages charge. The Court will leave as is. Closing argument by counsel. Charge by the Court on Punitive Damages. Verdict filed and published. Jury released. The Court heard argument from counsel on defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Punitive Damages that was taken under advisement. The Court GRANTED the defendant's motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Punitive Damages as to specific intent to harm plaintiff as detailed on the record and that the $250,000.00 cap applies. The Court directed the Clerk to enter judgment for the plaintiff and against the defendant for $125,000 compensatory damages and $250,000 punitive damages. Plaintiff objected to the Court's ruling. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(rvb)
June 16, 2011 Filing 236 JURY VERDICT for Plaintiff in the amount of $125,000. (rvb)
June 16, 2011 Filing 235 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Jury Trial continued on 6/16/2011. Jury note filed. The Court conferred with counsel for response to jury. Objection to response as stated by plaintiff. Verdict filed and published. Defendant renewed motion for judgment as a Matter of Law, Court considered it renewed. Proceeded with Punitive Damages phase.Plaintiff called Donna Hahner, EXHIBITS ADMITTED. Evidence Closed. Charge conference held. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(hfm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2011: # 1 Jury Note 2) (rvb).
June 15, 2011 Filing 234 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Jury Trial continued on 6/15/2011. Closing Argument & Charge by the Court. Note from jury filed. The Court conferred with counsel as to the response to be given. Recharge to the jury. Juror release for evening. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(hfm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2011: # 1 Jury Note) (rvb).
June 14, 2011 Filing 233 Minute Entry Jury Trial continued on 6/14/2011 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Pff called the witnesses: Mark Johnson by video depo for cross-exam; James Daus; Larry Flynt by video depo. Plaintiff rests. Dft moved for Judgment as a Matter of Law, the Court will hear argument at the break. Dft called the following witnesses: Christopher Helton by video depo; Donna Downey by video depo; William Otten by video depo; Donna Hahner. Defendant rests. The Dft renewed its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Jury released for the evening. Charge conf. The Court will allow each side 45 minutes for closing arguments. The Court heard from cnsl on dft's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Punative Damages. The Court took the motion under advisement. Exhs retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(kt)
June 13, 2011 Filing 232 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Jury Trial began and Voir Dire held on 6/13/2011. Voir Dire and jury selection. Preliminary instructions to jury by the Court. Opening statements by counsel. Initial jury instructions to the jurors by the Court. Plaintiff called the following witnesses: Donna Hahner for cross examination, Maureen Toffoloni. EXHIBITS ADMITTED. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(ank)
June 13, 2011 Filing 231 RESPONSE to the 228 OBJECTION: Defendant's Supplemental Objection to Plaintiff's Exhibit List filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard) Modified on 6/14/2011 to edit text. (aaq).
June 13, 2011 Filing 230 Witness List by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
June 13, 2011 Filing 229 Amended Exhibit List by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.. (Solomon, Darrell)
June 13, 2011 Filing 228 OBJECTION by LFP Publishing Group, LLC to the Exhibit List RE: 176 Proposed Pretrial Order (Bauer, S.) Modified on 6/14/2011 to edit event text. (aaq).
June 12, 2011 Filing 227 Requests to Charge by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.)
June 10, 2011 Filing 226 Proposed Jury Instructions by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
June 10, 2011 Filing 225 Proposed Voir Dire by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER that the Pretrial Order is amended to reflect the removal of Paul Toffoloni and Sandra Toffoloni from Plaintiff's "will call" witness list. Plaintiff may call these witnesses for rebuttal testimony, should the need rise. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/10/11. (dr)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER that the 187 Pretrial Order is amended to reflect the changes to Defendant's exhibit list described in Attachment A. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/10/11. (dr)
June 10, 2011 Filing 222 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2011; denying as moot 198 Motion in Limine, granting in part and denying in part 199 Motion in Limine, granting 200 Motion for Hearing, granting in part and denying in part 201 Motion in Limine, granting 202 Motion for Hearing, granting 210 Motion to Amend, granting 211 Motion to Amend. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(dr)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL AND OTHER ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM. This order replaces order filed 6/7/11 for LFP Publishing's counsel and paralegal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/9/11. (ss)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL AND OTHER ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on June 10, 2011. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/8/11. (ss)
June 8, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Re: ALL PENDING MOTIONS: 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence, 210 MOTION to Amend 187 Pretrial Order, 202 MOTION for Hearing re 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony, 211 Second MOTION to Amend 187 Pretrial Order, 198 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Witnesses, 200 MOTION for Hearing re 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence, 198 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Witnesses, 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony. (ss)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL and OTHER ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on Friday, June 10, 2011. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/8/11. (ss)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL and OTHER ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM for trial beginning June 13, 2011. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/7/11. (ss)
June 6, 2011 Filing 217 DEPOSITION of TYLER DOWNEY taken on 4/21/11 by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (bse)
June 6, 2011 Filing 216 NOTICE Of Filing by LFP Publishing Group, LLC of Original Transcript of Deposition of Tyler Downey (Solomon, Darrell)
June 6, 2011 Filing 215 RESPONSE re 211 Second MOTION to Amend 187 Pretrial Order filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
June 3, 2011 Filing 214 DEPOSITION of Christopher Lee Helton taken on 4/22/11 by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(dr)
June 3, 2011 Filing 213 NOTICE Of Filing by LFP Publishing Group, LLC of Original Transcript of Deposition of Christopher Lee Helton (Solomon, Darrell)
June 1, 2011 Trial set for 6/13/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (dr)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting 209 Motion for Special Trial Setting; trial shall commence at 9:30am on 6/13/11. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/1/11. (dr)
May 31, 2011 Filing 211 Second MOTION to Amend 187 Pretrial Order by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.)
May 31, 2011 Filing 210 MOTION to Amend 187 Pretrial Order by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
May 31, 2011 Filing 209 Joint MOTION for Order Specially Setting Trial by LFP Publishing Group, LLC, Maureen Toffoloni. (Bauer, S.)
May 31, 2011 Filing 208 REPLY BRIEF re 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
May 31, 2011 Filing 207 RESPONSE re 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
May 27, 2011 Filing 206 RESPONSE re 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL, COMPUTER & OTHER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM for the purposes of trial during the June trial calendar beginning 6/6/11 through trial. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/26/11. (ss)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL, COMPUTER & OTHER EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM for training purposed on June 2, 2011. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/26/11. (ss)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting 197 Motion to Amend the Pretrial Order.. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/23/11. (dr)
May 23, 2011 Filing 202 MOTION for Hearing re 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
May 23, 2011 Filing 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony with Brief In Support by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(Decker, Richard)
May 23, 2011 Filing 200 MOTION for Hearing re 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence, 198 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Witnesses by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
May 23, 2011 Filing 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence with Brief In Support by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Solomon, Darrell)
May 20, 2011 Filing 198 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Witnesses with Brief In Support by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief re Exclusion of Testimony of Plaintiff's Witnesses)(Solomon, Darrell)
May 20, 2011 Filing 197 MOTION to Amend 187 Pretrial Order by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.)
May 6, 2011 Filing 196 NOTICE Of Filing Video Depositions of Tyler Downey and Christopher Lee Helton by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Manually filed CD/DVDs attached and placed in file) (Solomon, Darrell) Modified on 5/9/2011 (dr).
May 5, 2011 Filing 195 CORRECTED NOTICE setting Trial: (Corrected PDF attached) Jury Trial set for 6/6/2011 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss)
May 4, 2011 Filing 194 NOTICE setting Trial: Jury Trial set for 6/6/2011 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss)
April 20, 2011 Filing 193 Proposed Voir Dire by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
April 20, 2011 Filing 192 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christopher Lee Helton filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Solomon, Darrell)
April 20, 2011 Filing 191 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tyler Downey filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Solomon, Darrell)
April 12, 2011 Filing 190 Proposed Voir Dire by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying 180 MOTION for Protective Order for Depositions of Tyler Downey, Mark Samansky and Christopher Helton filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/29/11. (dr)
March 28, 2011 Filing 188 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Protective Order (DI 180) re: 181 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Bauer, S.)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 PRETRIAL ORDER Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/28/11. (dr)
March 28, 2011 Filing 186 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Pretrial Conference, Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2011 denying 180 MOTION for Protective Order for Depositions of Tyler Downey, Mark Samansky and Christopher Helton filed by Maureen Toffoloni. The Court advised counsel that he would bifurcate the trial: Phase 1 will determine the amount ofcompensatory damages and if punitive damages are to be awarded. Phase 2 will determine the amount of punitive damages (if determination that any are due) and if attorney fees and expenses, if any should be awarded. The Court then advised counsel of the voir dire procedure that will be followed. 12 Jurors will be selected. After jurors have answered the court's questions, if counsel have any follow up as to a particular juror that question should be written down and handed to Ms. Sewell for the Court's consideration. The Court will conduct the voir dire based on the questions submitted by counsel. The question(s) regarding certain reading materials will be given to the jurors in written form for a written response and distribution to counsel, again any follow up question should be submitted in written form and given to Ms. Sewell for the Court's consideration. Counsel to confer in an attempt to agree on thequestions and submit no later than April 11, 2011. If counsel are unable to agree separate proposed questions may be submitted by that same date. The Court inquired about named defendant Mark Samansky, plaintiff's counsel advised that this defendant had been in Bankruptcy at the beginning of thecase, and the Bankruptcy had been terminated. The Court DISMISSED Mark Samansky. The Court will allow each side 7 1/2 hours for presentation of their case, this included both phases and other details as explained by the court. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(dr)
February 28, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 180 MOTION for Protective Order for Depositions of Tyler Downey, Mark Samansky and Christopher Helton. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2011 at 10:00 AM during the previously scheduled pretrial conference on this date, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., in chambers 2188.(ss)
February 25, 2011 Submission of 180 MOTION for Protective Order for Depositions of Tyler Downey, Mark Samansky and Christopher Helton, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (dr)
February 24, 2011 Clerks Notation re 185 Leave of Absence 5/2-22/11, 11/2-9/11, by Richard Paul Decker. The Court will not require an appearance by R. Decker on these dates. (ss)
February 24, 2011 Filing 185 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/2-22/11, 11/2-9/11, by Richard Paul Decker. (ss)
February 18, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., in Chambers 2188. (ss)
February 7, 2011 Filing 184 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by LFP Publishing Group, LLC of Subpoena and Waiver (Solomon, Darrell) Modified on 2/8/2011 (dr).
February 4, 2011 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2011 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., until further order and setting of new trial date. (ss)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER that the trial is postponed indefinitely while the Court has under advisement the 180 MOTION for Protective Order for Depositions of Tyler Downey, Mark Samansky and Christopher Helton filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/2/11. (dr)
February 2, 2011 Filing 182 NOTICE Of Filing Acknowledgment of Service of Subpoena and Waiver by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Solomon, Darrell)
January 31, 2011 Filing 181 RESPONSE in Opposition re 180 MOTION for Protective Order for Depositions of Tyler Downey, Mark Samansky and Christopher Helton filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
January 27, 2011 Filing 180 MOTION for Protective Order for Depositions of Tyler Downey, Mark Samansky and Christopher Helton with Brief In Support by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Certificate of Good Faith, # 6 Exhibit A (to Certificate of Good Faith))(Decker, Richard)
January 26, 2011 Filing 179 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christopher Lee Helton filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Solomon, Darrell)
January 21, 2011 Filing 178 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Samansky filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Solomon, Darrell)
January 18, 2011 Filing 177 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tyler Downey filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Solomon, Darrell)
January 5, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2011 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., in Chambers 2188. (ss)
January 3, 2011 Filing 176 Proposed Pretrial Order by LFP Publishing Group, LLC, Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bauer, S.)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting the 174 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for filing the parties' consolidated pretrial order is extended until January 3, 2011. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/20/2010. (dfb)
December 19, 2010 Filing 174 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Submit Consolidated Pre-Trial Order by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, S.)
November 24, 2010 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to William M. Feigenbaum attorney for LFP Publishing Group, LLC re 173 Order. (cem)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 119 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Gregory C. Lisby; granting 120 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 124 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 125 Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Usha Nair-Reichert. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 11/23/10. (cem)
October 1, 2010 Filing 172 RESPONSE re 169 Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
September 27, 2010 Filing 171 NOTICE of Manual Filing the origianl DVD containing the videotaped deposition of Kevin Sullivan by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (DVD attached) (Solomon, Darrell) Modified text on 9/28/2010 (dr).
September 21, 2010 Submission of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 120 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 156 MOTION for Oral Argument, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (cem)
September 17, 2010 Filing 170 REPLY to Response to Motion re 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.)
September 17, 2010 Filing 169 OBJECTIONS re 159 Response to Statement of Material Facts filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.) Modified on 9/20/2010 to correct docket entry to reflect e-filed pleading. (cem)
September 17, 2010 Filing 168 RESPONSE re 160 Statement of Material Facts filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.)
September 17, 2010 Filing 167 REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
September 16, 2010 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to William M. Feigenbaum attorney for LFP Publishing Group, LLC re 166 Order. (cem)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 165 Plaintiff's counsel Richard Decker's Motion for extended leave of absence during the dates of September 14, 2010 through September 28, 2010 and October 4, 2010 through October 29, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 9/15/10. (cem)
September 7, 2010 Filing 165 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 9/14-28, 10/4-29, by Richard Paul Decker. (Decker, Richard)
September 7, 2010 Submission of 125 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Report and Opinion Testimony of Dr. Nair-Reichert, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (cem)
September 2, 2010 Filing 164 AFFIDAVIT of Counsel by Maureen Toffoloni. FILED UNDER SEAL by Oral Order of the Court. (dr)
September 2, 2010 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to William M. Feigenbaum attorney for LFP Publishing Group, LLC re 163 Order. (cem)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 CONSENT ORDER granting 157 Motion to extend the page limitation for filing Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment from twenty-five (25) pages to thirty (30) pages, pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(D) of theNorthern District of Georgia. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 9/1/10. (cem)
August 31, 2010 Filing 162 NOTICE Of Filing Original Affidavit to include Exhibit C by Maureen Toffoloni re 161 Affidavit of Richard P. Decker (Decker, Richard)
August 31, 2010 Filing 161 AFFIDAVIT of Richard P. Decker by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
August 31, 2010 Filing 160 Statement of Material Facts re 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Statement of Additional Material Facts) filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
August 31, 2010 Filing 159 Response to Statement of Material Facts re 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
August 31, 2010 Filing 158 RESPONSE re 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
August 31, 2010 Filing 157 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment) by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
August 31, 2010 Filing 156 MOTION for Oral Argument re 125 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Report and Opinion Testimony of Dr. Nair-Reichert, 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 119 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Gregory C. Lisby, 120 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
August 31, 2010 Submission of 119 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Gregory C. Lisby, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (cem)
August 31, 2010 Filing 155 REPLY to Response to Motion re 125 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Report and Opinion Testimony of Dr. Nair-Reichert filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
August 31, 2010 Filing 154 Response to Statement of Material Facts re 120 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
August 31, 2010 Filing 153 RESPONSE in Opposition re 120 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
August 27, 2010 Filing 152 REPLY to Response to Motion re 119 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Gregory C. Lisby filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
August 26, 2010 Filing 151 NOTICE Of Filing Original Discovery Material by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing of Original Discovery Material Under Seal)(Solomon, Darrell) (Attachment Filed Under Seal on 8/27/2010: # 2 Exhibit A) (dr).
August 25, 2010 Submission of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 120 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (cem)
August 19, 2010 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to William M. Feigenbaum re 150 Order. (cem)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 141 Plaintiff's Motion to remove the expert report of Usha Nair-Reichert, Ph.D., originally filed on 5/28/10 as exhibit D to plaintiff's supplemental disclosures. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/17/10. (cem)
August 16, 2010 Filing 149 RESPONSE re 125 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Report and Opinion Testimony of Dr. Nair-Reichert (Amended to include Exhibit A) filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit of Richard P. Decker)(Decker, Richard)
August 16, 2010 Filing 148 RESPONSE re 125 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Report and Opinion Testimony of Dr. Nair-Reichert filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard P. Decker)(Decker, Richard)
August 13, 2010 Filing 147 RESPONSE in Opposition re 119 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Gregory C. Lisby filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab A to Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Testimony of Gregory C. Lisby)(Bauer, S.)
August 13, 2010 Filing 146 NOTICE Of Filing Manual Filing of Discovery Material by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing of Discovery Material Under Seal)(Solomon, Darrell)
August 2, 2010 Filing 145 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 04-01 as to S. Derek Bauer re 137 Notice of Filing, 131 Affidavit, 136 Notice of Filing, 129 Affidavit, 134 Affidavit, 133 Affidavit, 135 Affidavit, 130 Affidavit, 132 Affidavit. (dr)
August 2, 2010 Filing 141 MOTION to Seal Expert Report of Usha Nair-Reichert, Ph.D by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Decker, Richard)
July 30, 2010 Filing 144 FILED UNDER SEAL - AFFIDAVIT of Donna Hahner by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 143 FILED UNDER SEAL - Statement of Undisputed Material Facts re 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (dr) (Additional attachment(s) added/verified by bse on 8/2/2010: # 2 Exhibit A) (dr).
July 30, 2010 Filing 142 FILED UNDER SEAL - DEPOSITION of William Otten taken on 4/1/10 by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 140 FILED UNDER SEAL - DEPOSITION of James Michael Daus taken on 4/2/10 by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 139 DEPOSITION of Maureen R. Toffoloni taken on 4/2/10 by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 138 DEPOSITION of Kevin Sullivan taken on 3/1/10 by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 137 NOTICE of Filing Deposition of Maureen Toffoloni by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 136 NOTICE of Filing Deposition of Kevin Sullivan by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Lee Helton by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 134 AFFIDAVIT of Mark Samansky by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 133 AFFIDAVIT of Tyler Downey by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT of Larry Flynt by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 131 AFFIDAVIT of Charles Bruce David by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (dr) (Attachment modified on 8/2/2010: # 1 Main Document) (dr).
July 30, 2010 Filing 130 AFFIDAVIT of S. Derek Bauer by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (dr)
July 30, 2010 Filing 129 AFFIDAVIT of Gregory C. Lisby by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (dr)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE by LFP Publishing Group, LLC Requesting Manual Filing of Original Discovery Material Under Seal by Plaintiff (Bauer, S.)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE by LFP Publishing Group, LLC Requesting Electronic Filing of Original Discovery Material by Plaintiff (Bauer, S.)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE Of Filing Manual Filing of Pleadings Under Seal and Original Deposition Transcripts and Affidavits by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Bauer, S.)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Report and Opinion Testimony of Dr. Nair-Reichert with Brief In Support by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.) (Additional attachment(s) added and Filed Under Seal on 8/4/2010: # 2 Brief in Support, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C) (dr).
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Appendix MANUALLY FILED UNDER SEAL, # 3 Statement of Material Facts MANUALLY FILED UNDER SEAL)(Bauer, S.) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 FILED UNDER SEAL - DEPOSITION of Donna Mahner taken on 4/13/10 by Maureen Toffoloni.(dr)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 FILED UNDER SEAL - DEPOSITION of Mark Johnson taken on 4/13/10 by Maureen Toffoloni.(dr)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE Of Filing Original Depositions Under Seal by Maureen Toffoloni (Decker, Richard)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Brief (with specific exhibits filed separately under seal))(Decker, Richard) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Gregory C. Lisby, or in the alternative, MOTION to Disqualify expert with Brief In Support by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(Decker, Richard) . Added MOTION to Disqualify expert on 7/28/2010 (cem).
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Request to File Original Discovery Under Seal by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Solomon, Darrell)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Expert Report of F. Edwin Hallman, Jr. by Maureen Toffoloni.(Decker, Richard)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Usha Nair-Reichert, Ph.D. filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Solomon, Darrell)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Legal Services Agreement, # 3 Exhibit C - Billing Records, # 4 Exhibit D - Expert Report)(Decker, Richard)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Expert Report by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Solomon, Darrell)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 101 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/30/10. (dr)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Submission of 101 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery Response, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (dr)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Samansky filed by Maureen Toffoloni (Hallman, Francis)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response to Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Solomon, Darrell)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Appeal notice from USCA notifying the United States District Court, Clerk of Court, that the United States Supreme Court has DENIED the Petitioner's Writ of Certiorari re: 15 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case No. 08-16148-GG. (kac)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Johnson filed by Maureen Toffoloni (Decker, Richard)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/31/2010. Discovery ends 4/26/2010; expert reports to be exchanged on or before 5/28/2010; rebuttal reports to be exchanged on or before 6/11/2010; depositions of expert witnesses to be conducted on or before 6/30/2010; dispositive motions to be filed on or before 7/30/2010, with any oppositions to be filed on or before 8/31/2010. (pdw)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Joint MOTION to Amend 81 Order to Extend Time for Discovery and 58 by Maureen Toffoloni, LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bauer, S.) Modified on 3/31/2010 to remove unnecessary text(pdw).
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re 101 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery Response filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to LFP Opposition to Emergency Motion to Compel)(Bauer, S.)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Responses by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Solomon, Darrell)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE by LFP Publishing Group, LLC of Service of Subpoena (Solomon, Darrell)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE Of Filing Acknowledgment of Service of Subpoena and Waiver by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Solomon, Darrell)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Proceedings held on February 17, 2010, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (kac)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery Response with Brief In Support by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion)(Decker, Richard)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Flint filed by Maureen Toffoloni (Decker, Richard)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Anderson filed by Maureen Toffoloni (Decker, Richard)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of LFP Publishing Group, d/b/a Hustler Magazine filed by Maureen Toffoloni (Decker, Richard)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE Of Filing Acknowledgment of Service of Subpoena and Waiver by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Solomon, Darrell)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE by LFP Publishing Group, LLC of Service of Subpoena (Solomon, Darrell)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Maureen Toffoloni filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Solomon, Darrell)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE by LFP Publishing Group, LLC of Service of Subpoena (Solomon, Darrell)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Responses by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Bauer, S.)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Interrogatories and Requests for Production to LFP Publishing Group by Maureen Toffoloni.(Decker, Richard)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response filed by Maureen Toffoloni, granting in part and denying in part 73 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's "Punitive Damages" Discovery filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED and Motion to Compel is DENIED with respect to the discovery directed to the Non-Parties; and the Motion for Protective is DENIED and Motion to Compel is GRANTED with respect to the discovery directed to LFP. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/22/10. (dr)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Defendant's Motion for Protective Order re: 89 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Compel, Motion Hearing,,,. (Bauer, S.)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 2/17/2010; granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Protective Order, granting in part and denying in part 75 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(dr)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 73 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's "Punitive Damages" Discovery, 75 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., in Chambers 2188. (ss)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 73 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's "Punitive Damages" Discovery, 75 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2010 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. A new hearing date to be determined.(ss)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 73 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's "Punitive Damages" Discovery, 75 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2010 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., in Chambers 2188. (ss)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Responses by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Bauer, S.)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE by LFP Publishing Group, LLC of Service of Subpoena (Solomon, Darrell)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Submission of 75 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (dr)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE by LFP Publishing Group, LLC of Service of Subpoena (Solomon, Darrell)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re 75 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Wilson, Zachary)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Solomon, Darrell)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re 75 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER that Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition of LFP Publishing Group, LLC will occur at the offices of McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP in Los Angeles, CA; and that Defendant pay for one economy class round trip airfare for Plaintiff's travel to Los Angeles, and one night's hotel accommodation at a reasonable rate. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/22/10. (dr) Modified related doc on 2/10/2010 (dr).
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER extending time for Discovery. Discovery ends on 4/26/2010. (Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/26/2010. If no summary judgment motions filed the Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/26/2010. However, if a Motion for Summary Judgment is filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due within 30 days of the Court's ruling on the Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to submit this action on 5/27/10 if the parties have not filed a Motion for Summary Judgment or Proposed Pretrial Order.) Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/22/10. (ss)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PROPOSED ORDER re: 77 Motion Hearing,,. (Solomon, Darrell)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Darrell)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 1/15/2010. The Court heard from counsel on Mr. Bauer's letter to the Court re the location of the 30(b)(6) deposition of defendant LFP Publishing, which the Court treated as a motion for protective order. The Court granted the motion on the condition that the Corporation pay cost of the plaintiff to attend the deposition - economy round trip airfare to Los Angeles and one night's hotel expense at a reasonable rate. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(dr)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/12/10. (dr)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response with Brief In Support by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Counsel)(Decker, Richard)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 1/15/2010 at 09:30 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., counsel for plaintiff to make call arrangements. (ss)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: 71 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Re discovery dispute. Due to a conflict with Judge Thrash's schedule the hearing set for 1/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. is cancelled. A new date will be set in the near future. (ss) (ss)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's "Punitive Damages" Discovery with Brief In Support by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit A to Brief in Support of Motion, # 3 Exhibit B to Brief in Support of Motion, # 4 Exhibit C to Brief in Support of Motion, # 5 Exhibit D to Brief in Support of Motion, # 6 Exhibit E to Brief in Support of Motion, # 7 Exhibit F to Brief in Support of Motion, # 8 Exhibit G to Brief in Support of Motion, # 9 Exhibit H to Brief in Support of Motion, # 10 Exhibit I to Brief in Support of Motion, # 11 Exhibit J to Brief in Support of Motion, # 12 Exhibit K to Brief in Support of Motion, # 13 Text of Proposed Order, # 14 Certification of Good Faith Conference)(Bauer, S.)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response and Objections to Plaintiff's Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Bauer, S.)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Re discovery dispute. Hearing set for 1/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Confidential Material and Inadvertent Production of Privileged Information. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/22/09. (dr)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Maureen Toffoloni, LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bauer, S.)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE by LFP Publishing Group, LLC of Service of Subpoena (Solomon, Darrell)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE by LFP Publishing Group, LLC of Service of Subpoena (Solomon, Darrell)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Amended Initial Disclosures by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Solomon, Darrell)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Bauer, S.)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceedings held on October 2, 2009, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (kac)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Submission of 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (dr)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents by Maureen Toffoloni.(Decker, Richard)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 51 Certificate of Service by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Bauer, S.)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Submission of 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (dr)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/18/09. (dfb)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE to Statement of Material Facts re 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard) Modified event/text on 11/18/2009 (dr).
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SCHEDULING ORDER approving 53 Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan; Discovery ends on 2/25/2010, Summary Judgment Motions due by 3/17/2010, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/29/2010. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 11/12/09. (dr)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (dr)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability and Rule 56(f) Request for Relief filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rule 56(f) Affidavit of S. Derek Bauer, Esq.)(Bauer, S.)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Response to Statement of Material Facts re 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Bauer, S.)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Joint PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Maureen Toffoloni, LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Initial Disclosures by LFP Publishing Group, LLC.(Bauer, S.)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Submission of 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (dr)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Maureen Toffoloni regarding service of Discovery Requests (Decker, Richard)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability with Brief In Support by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Statement of Material Facts)(Decker, Richard) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 39 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Paul Cambria. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/15/09. (dr)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey Reina. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/15/09. (dr)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 29 MOTION to Stay filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/14/09. (dr)
October 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Initial Disclosures by Maureen Toffoloni.(Decker, Richard)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary McCree Wilson, III on behalf of Maureen Toffoloni (Wilson, Zachary)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Wingate on behalf of Maureen Toffoloni (Wingate, Richard)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Edwin Hallman, Jr on behalf of Maureen Toffoloni (Hallman, Francis)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Motion to Stay Proceedings re: 41 Order on Motion to Stay, Motion Hearing,,. (Decker, Richard)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 40 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey F. Reina Pro Hac Vice, 39 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul J. Cambria, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Paul J. Cambria, Jeffrey F. Reina added appearing on behalf of LFP Publishing Group, LLC (cdg)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 10/2/2009 denying 29 MOTION to Stay and Notice of Intent to Petition for Certiorari filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC; Mr. Decker inquired about his motion for attorney fees relating to this motion. The Court advised he would look at that and defendant's response and if he needed to hear further from anyone he would advise. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(dr)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey F. Reina Pro Hac Vice by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul J. Cambria, Jr. Pro Hac Vice by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order RETURN of 36 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul J. Cambria, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002366750), 37 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey F. Reina Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002366796) to attorney for correction. (cdg)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re 34 Certificate of Interested Persons, OK per TWT. (ss)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey F. Reina Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002366796)by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul J. Cambria, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002366750)by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Solomon, Darrell)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell Jay Solomon on behalf of LFP Publishing Group, LLC (Solomon, Darrell)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by LFP Publishing Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent LFP, Inc., Corporate Parent LFP Publishing Advisors, LLC for LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. Discovery ends on 2/25/2010.(Bauer, S.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Stay and Notice of Intent to Petition for Certiorari filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Maureen Toffoloni. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Richard P. Decker)(Decker, Richard)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of docket entry correction re 30 Notice of Hearing on Motion. EDITED TO REFLECT 10/2/09 AS THE CORRECT HEARING DATE. (ss)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Remark re 30 Notice of Hearing on Motion, mailed to non-registered counsel and advised by letter that no further paper orders/notices will be mailed to non-registered counsel by the Court. Pro Hac Vice counsel may make arrangements with the Clerks Office to receive electronic notices or arrange to have your local counsel forward electronic notices and/or orders. (ss)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 29 MOTION to Stay and Notice of Intent to Petition for Certiorari. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., in Chambers 2188. (ss) Modified on 9/21/2009 (ss).
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Stay and Notice of Intent to Petition for Certiorari with Brief In Support by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay)(Bauer, S.)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER making the USCA mandate the judgment of this Court re 15 Notice of Appeal, Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 08-16148. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 09/14/09. (fap)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Submission of 27 USCA Judgment, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (dr)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Certified copy of JUDGMENT of USCA REVERSING and REMANDING to the District Court for further action re: 15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Maureen Toffoloni Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 08-16148. (dr)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Returned re: 15 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 08-16148. (kac)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of Address for Richard Paul Decker, counsel for Maureen Toffoloni (Decker, Richard)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Forwarded sealed exhibit (docket entry no. 5) to USCA re: 15 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 08-16148-GG. (kac)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re: 15 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 08-16148-GG. (kac)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re: 15 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 08-16148-GG. (kac)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FORTHWITH LETTER from USCA re: 15 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 08-16148-GG. Appeal Record due by 2/25/2009. (kac)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 USCA Acknowledgment of COR re: 15 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 08-16148-GG. (kac)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Certified copy of CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of Record on Appeal transmitted to USCA re: 15 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 08-16148-GG. (kac)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of Record on Appeal re: 15 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 08-16148-GG. (kac)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 USCA Acknowledgment of 15 Notice of Appeal filed by Maureen Toffoloni. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 08-16148-GG. (kac)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Costs Taxed in amount of $760.15 against Plaintiff (dr)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 BILL OF COSTS by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Defendant's Bill of Costs)(Bauer, S.)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 15 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 14 Clerk's Judgment and 13 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Maureen Toffoloni. Filing fee $455; Receipt Number 113E0000000001877518. Transcript Order Form due on 11/10/2008 (Decker, Richard) Modified on 10/28/2008 to modify document relationship (kac).
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case. (dr)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated. (dr)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/3/08. (dr)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Submission of 10 MOTION to Dismiss, submitted to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash. (dr)
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Armstrong, Barry)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maureen Toffoloni. (Decker, Richard)
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Armstrong, Barry)
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William Feigenbaum. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/10/08. (dr)
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 8 APPLICATION for Admission of William M. Feigenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001558106). Attorney William M. Feigenbaum for LFP Publishing Group, LLC added. (pb)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of William M. Feigenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001558106)by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Bauer, S.)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/8/08 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.. Court Reporter: Susan Baker. (dr)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Maureen Toffoloni. LFP Publishing Group, LLC waiver mailed on 2/11/2008, answer due 4/11/2008. (Decker, Richard)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILED UNDER SEAL - EXHIBITS received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in Sealed Documents room. (dr)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Evidentiary Hearing held on 2/8/2008, Attorney S. Derek Bauer for LFP Publishing Group, LLC added. The Court heard from counsel on Motion for TRO, and denied the motion; the Court ordered the Clerk to place Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 UNDER SEAL. (Court Reporter Susan Baker.)(dr)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO)(Bauer, S.)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. TRO Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by LFP Publishing Group, LLC. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 574099) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2008: # 3 Memorandum continued) (dr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toffoloni v. LFP Publishing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Toffoloni
Represented By: Richard Paul Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LFP Publishing Group, LLC
Represented By: James Clifton Rawls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Samansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants X, Y, and Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?