Cobb v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Jonathan Cobb sued Defendants Google, Inc. and WorkforceLogic USA. Plaintiff alleges that Google had misappropriated the Google Sky concept and idea, which Plaintiff had presented, advanced and refined through an internal e-mail discussion group.

Plaintiff: Jonathan Cobb
Defendant: Workforcelogic USA and Google, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00483
Filed: February 13, 2008
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Gwinnett
Presiding Judge: Shoob
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2009 Civil Case Terminated. (alc)
March 4, 2009 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING 62 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (alc)
March 4, 2009 62 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jonathan Cobb, Google, Inc., Workforcelogic USA. (Schroeder, Eric)
March 4, 2009 61 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Filing re 60 Stipulation of Dismissal by Google, Inc. (Bush, John) Modified on 3/5/2009 to clarify text (alc).
March 4, 2009 60 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jonathan Cobb, Google, Inc., Workforcelogic USA. (Bush, John)
January 15, 2009 59 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Change of Firm Name (Schroeder, Eric)
January 8, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery now ends on 3/5/2009, pursuant to 12/8/08 order, which gave additional 2 months of discovery after plaintiff's deposition. (jsr)
January 7, 2009 58 NOTICE of Compliance with Order by Jonathan Cobb, Google, Inc. re 56 Order. Defendant deposed Plaintiff on 1/5/2009. (Schroeder, Eric) Modified on 1/8/2009 in order to update docket text (ank).
December 22, 2008 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc..(Schroeder, Eric)
December 18, 2008 Featured Case ORAL ORDER finding as moot 54 Motion for Oral Argument. (Underlining motions already ruled on in order of 12/8/08.) Approved by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 12/18/08. (jsr)
December 9, 2008 Submission of 54 MOTION for Oral Argument, submitted to District Judge Marvin H. Shoob. (ank)
December 8, 2008 56 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 33 Motion to Compel discovery; granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Protective Order. The Court orders discovery stayed until plaintiff is deposed on the issue of the particular ideas and concepts he claims were misappropriated by defendant Google, Inc. The parties shall notify the Court of the date plaintiff's deposition is completed, which should not be later than 30 days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 12/8/2008. (ank)
December 2, 2008 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION for Oral Argument re 41 MOTION for Protective Order, 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Google, Inc. filed by Jonathan Cobb. (Dailey, Michael)
November 18, 2008 Submission of 41 MOTION for Protective Order, submitted to District Judge Marvin H. Shoob. (ank)
November 17, 2008 54 MOTION for Oral Argument re 41 MOTION for Protective Order, 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Google, Inc. by Google, Inc.. (Schroeder, Eric)
November 17, 2008 53 REPLY to 41 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Google, Inc.. (Schroeder, Eric) Modified on 11/18/2008 in order to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (ank).
November 3, 2008 Submission of 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery,submitted to District Judge Marvin H. Shoob. (ank)
October 31, 2008 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Google, Inc. filed by Jonathan Cobb. (Dailey, Michael)
October 31, 2008 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re 41 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Jonathan Cobb. (Dailey, Michael)
October 31, 2008 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion to Seal Document 43 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 10/30/2008. (ank)
October 28, 2008 Submission of 42 MOTION to Seal Document, submitted to District Judge Marvin H. Shoob. (ank)
October 28, 2008 49 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to file responses to 41 MOTION for Protective Order and 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery. The Plaintiff has through and until 10/31/2008 to file his aforementioned response and reply. Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 10/23/2008. (ank)
October 21, 2008 48 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 41 Motion for Protective Order and Reply to 47 Motion to Compel Discovery by Jonathan Cobb. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dailey, Michael) Modified on 10/22/2008 to update docket text (ank).
October 15, 2008 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Google, Inc. filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Eric P. Schroeder, # 2 Exhibit Tab 1 to the Affidavit of Eric P. Schroeder, # 3 Exhibit Tab 2 to the Affidavit of Eric P. Schroeder, # 4 Exhibit Tab 3 to the Affidavit of Eric P. Schroeder, # 5 Exhibit Tab 4 to the Affidavit of Eric P. Schroeder, # 6 Exhibit Tab 5 to the Affidavit of Eric P. Schroeder, # 7 Exhibit Tab 6 to the Affidavit of Eric P. Schroeder)(Schroeder, Eric)
October 15, 2008 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs First Continuing Request for Production of Documents and Things by Google, Inc..(Schroeder, Eric) Modified on 10/16/2008 to remove duplicative wording (ank).
October 15, 2008 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs First Continuing Interrogatories by Google, Inc..(Schroeder, Eric) Modified on 10/16/2008 to remove duplicative text (ank).
October 7, 2008 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Deposition of Jonathan Cobb by Google, Inc..(Schroeder, Eric)
October 7, 2008 43 FILED UNDER SEAL Memorandum in Support re 41 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Google, Inc.. (ank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2008: # 1 Affidavit of Eric P. Schroeder, # 2 Declaration of Theresa Beaumont, # 3 Plaintiff's Answers and Objections to First Set of Interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2A, # 6 Exhibit 2B, # 7 Exhibit 2C, # 8 Exhibit 2D, # 9 Exhibit 2E, # 10 Exhibit 2F, # 11 Exhibit 3, # 12 Exhibit 4A, # 13 Exhibit 4B, # 14 Exhibit 4C, # 15 Exhibit 5A, # 16 Exhibit 5B, # 17 Exhibit 5C, # 18 Exhibit 5D, # 19 Exhibit 5E, # 20 Exhibit 5F, # 21 Exhibit 5G, # 22 Exhibit 5H, # 23 Exhibit 6, # 24 Exhibit 7A, # 25 Exhibit 7B, # 26 Exhibit 7C, # 27 Exhibit 7D, # 28 Exhibit 8A, # 29 Exhibit 9A, # 30 Exhibit 9B, # 31 Exhibit 9C, # 32 Exhibit 10A, # 33 Exhibit 10B, # 34 Exhibit 10C, # 35 Exhibit 10D, # 36 Exhibit 10E, # 37 Exhibit 10F, # 38 Exhibit 10G, # 39 Exhibit 10H, # 40 Exhibit 10I, # 41 Exhibit 10J, # 42 Exhibit 11, # 43 Exhibit 12, # 44 Exhibit 13, # 45 Exhibit 14, # 46 Exhibit 15A, # 47 Exhibit 15B) (ank). Modified on 10/7/2008 (ank) (Verified by fmm on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 42 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order and accompanying attachments by Google, Inc.. (ank)
October 7, 2008 41 MOTION for Protective Order with Brief In Support by Google, Inc.. (Schroeder, Eric)
October 7, 2008 40 Featured Case ORDER extending time to file Response to 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Response time extended through and including 10/15/2008. Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 10/6/2008. (ank)
October 2, 2008 Notification of Docket Correction re 37 Proposed Consent Order. Modified in order to correct filer information and remove duplicative text. (ank)
October 1, 2008 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Supplement to Attachment C of Defendant Google Inc.s Initial Disclosures by Google, Inc..(Bush, John)
October 1, 2008 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Supplemental Witness List in Support of Google Inc.s Initial Disclosure No. 5 by Google, Inc..(Bush, John)
October 1, 2008 37 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER for Extension of Time re: 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Google, Inc. (Bush, John) Modified on 10/2/2008 to correct filer information and remove duplicative text (ank).
September 23, 2008 36 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Consent to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Google by John C. Bush on behalf of Google, Inc. (Bush, John)
September 19, 2008 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 9/18/2008. (ank)
September 19, 2008 34 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jonathan Cobb. (Dailey, Michael)
September 18, 2008 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Google, Inc. with Brief In Support by Jonathan Cobb. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit)(Dailey, Michael)
June 23, 2008 32 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 6/23/08. (vs)
June 23, 2008 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Workforcelogic USA Deft's Responses to Production of Documents (Fish, John)
June 23, 2008 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Workforcelogic USA for Deft's Responses to Pltf's Interrogatories (Fish, John)
June 21, 2008 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Google, Inc. (1) Defendant Google Inc.s Responses to Plaintiffs First Continuing Interrogatories to Defendants and (2) Defendant Googles Incs Responses to Plaintiffs First Continuing Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendants (Schroeder, Eric)
June 20, 2008 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Discovery Responses And Initial Disclosures by Jonathan Cobb.(Dailey, Michael)
June 20, 2008 27 PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order Limiting the Use and Dissemination of Confidential Material. (Schroeder, Eric)
May 15, 2008 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant Google Inc.s First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff Jonathan Cobb by Google, Inc..(Schroeder, Eric)
May 15, 2008 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant Google Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Jonathan Cobb by Google, Inc..(Schroeder, Eric)
May 6, 2008 24 Featured Case ORDER re 23 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 5/6/08. (vs)
May 5, 2008 23 Joint PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jonathan Cobb, Google, Inc., Workforcelogic USA. (Schroeder, Eric)
April 29, 2008 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time through and including Monday, May 5, 2008, for the parties to file a Joint Preliminary Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 4/29/08. (vs)
April 28, 2008 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schroeder, Eric)
April 4, 2008 20 Featured Case ORDER approving 18 Application of John C. Fish, Jr., for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Courtroom Deputy Clerk for Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 4/4/08. (vs)
April 4, 2008 19 Featured Case ORDER approving 17 Application of Ronald Arena for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Courtroom Deputy Clerk for Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 4/4/08. (vs)
April 3, 2008 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 18 APPLICATION for Admission of John C. Fish, Jr., Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John C. Fish, Jr for Workforcelogic USA added. (cdg)
April 3, 2008 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Ronald Arena Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ronald Arena for Workforcelogic USA added. (cdg)
April 1, 2008 18 APPLICATION for Admission of John C. Fish, Jr., Pro Hac Viceby Workforcelogic USA.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #575932. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vs)
April 1, 2008 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Ronald Arena Pro Hac Viceby Workforcelogic USA.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #575934. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vs)
March 31, 2008 Clerks Notation re 14 and 16 Certificates of Interested Persons: approved by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 3/31/08. (jsr)
March 28, 2008 16 Certificate of Interested Persons by Google, Inc.. (Schroeder, Eric)
March 28, 2008 15 Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint by Google, Inc..(Schroeder, Eric) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 28, 2008 14 Certificate of Interested Persons by Workforcelogic USA. (McClusky, Charlotte)
March 28, 2008 13 ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Workforcelogic USA. Discovery ends on 8/25/2008.(McClusky, Charlotte) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 25, 2008 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Kaye McClusky on behalf of Workforcelogic USA (McClusky, Charlotte)
March 14, 2008 11 Featured Case ORDER approving 6 Application of David Ziff for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD for Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 3/14/08. (vs)
March 14, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER approving 5 Application of Micahel A. Zwibelman for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD for Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 3/14/08. (vs) Modified on 3/14/2008 (vs)
March 14, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER approving 4 Application of Laurie Edelstein for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD for Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 3/14/08. (vs) Modified on 3/14/2008 (vs).
March 13, 2008 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Google, Inc. Answer due 3/28/2008; Workforcelogic USA Answer due 3/28/2008. Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 3/13/08. (vs)
March 13, 2008 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 6 APPLICATION for Admission of David Ziff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001565131). Attorney David Ziff for Google, Inc. added. (cdg)
March 13, 2008 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael A. Zwibelman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001565115). Attorney Michael A. Zwibelman for Google, Inc. added. (cdg)
March 13, 2008 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Laurie Edelstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001565089). Attorney Laurie Edelstein for Google, Inc. added. (cdg)
March 12, 2008 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, 2 Amended Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schroeder, Eric)
March 12, 2008 6 APPLICATION for Admission of David Ziff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001565131)by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schroeder, Eric)
March 12, 2008 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael A. Zwibelman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001565115)by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schroeder, Eric)
March 12, 2008 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Laurie Edelstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001565089)by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schroeder, Eric)
March 12, 2008 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Schroeder on behalf of Google, Inc. (Schroeder, Eric)
February 19, 2008 2 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Jonathan Cobb.(Dailey, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 13, 2008 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jonathan Cobb; and Summon(s) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 574384.) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(epm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cobb
Represented By: Michael A. Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workforcelogic USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?