Keaton & Associates v. Phoenix Trading Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Keaton & Associates |
Defendant: |
Robert D. Golub, The Perimeter Group International, Inc., Allens, Inc., Phoenix Trading Company, LLC, Robert J. Fang, Karen P. Golub and Susan Fang |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv02627 |
Filed: |
August 15, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Atlanta Office |
County: |
Cook |
Presiding Judge: |
Ward |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 31, 2010 |
Filing
74
ORDER denying 52 Motion for Sanctions and Contempt, Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED, and Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Writ is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to reimburse Defendants in the amount of � 36;23,802.97. As a result of the rulings in this Order, all issues in the case are resolved except Count VI. Plaintiff may either voluntarily dismiss the Count VI claim, or the Parties are ORDERED to submit a proposed consolidated pretrial order within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/31/2010. (gar)
|
July 10, 2009 |
Filing
61
ORDER granting Defendants' 15 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment such that the damages which Plaintiff is entitled to recover pursuant to Count I are limited to the sum determined pursuant to the Court's formula as stated in the Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/10/09. (ekb)
|
May 14, 2009 |
Filing
53
ORDER granting Defendant Allens, Inc.'s 35 Motion for Declaratory Judgment on its Duties Pursuant to its Interpleader in this Matter and as to its Application for Fees and Costs. The Court finds that Allens has met its burden of establishing entitlement of attorneys' fees in the amount of $6940.71. Allens shall deduct this amount from the remaining corpus of the funds it is holding. The balance of $35,294.82 shall be placed in the registry of the Court. At this time, the Court makes no determination as to the allocation of the remaining funds. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/13/09. (ekb)
|
March 11, 2009 |
Filing
33
ORDER denying 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The Court further finds that expedited discovery is appropriate in this case. The parties are DIRECTED to confer in an effort to agree upon an expedited discovery schedule. If the parties are not able to submit a stipulated schedule to the Court within five (5) days, each party shall submit a proposed schedule to the Court, and the Court will set the schedule. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/10/09. (ekb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?