Fisch et al v. SunTrust Banks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William B. Fisch and Sunil Kapilashrimi
Defendant: SunTrust Banks, Inc., Robert M. Beall, II, J. Hyatt Brown, Alston D. Correll, Jeffrey C. Crowe, Thomas C. Farnsworth, Jr., Patricia C. First, Blake P. Garrett, Jr., David H. Hughes, L. Phillip Humann, E. Neville Isdell, M. Douglas Ivester, J. Hicks Lanier, G. Gilmer Minor, III, Larry I. Prince, Frank S. Royal, James M. Wells, III, Karen Hastie Williams, Phail Wynn, Jr., SunTrust Banks, Inc. Benefits Plan Commitee, Ingrid Emmons, Donna D. Lange and SunTrust Bank
Consol Plaintiff: Paul J. Hellman, Betty L. Pickens and Phyllis Reagan
Case Number: 1:2008cv03384
Filed: October 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Martin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 OPINION granting 219 Movant's Motion to Certify Class. The class will be defined as: All persons, other than Defendants and members of their immediate families, who were participants in or beneficiaries of the SunTrust Banks, Inc. 401(k) Savi ngs Plan (the "Plan") at any time between May 15, 2007 and March 30, 2011, inclusive (the "Class Period") and whose accounts included investments in SunTrust common stock ("SunTrust Stock") during that time period and wh o sustained a loss to their account as a result of the investment in SunTrust Stock. Plaintiffs Erwin, Fish, Trau, and Smothermon are hereby appointed as class representatives. The Court appoints the law firms of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP , Stull, Stull & Brody and Squitieri & Fearon, LLP as Co-lead Class Counsel and the law firm of Holzer & Holzer, LLC as Liason Class Counsel. denying 225 Motion to Strike or exclude the Allen Report and granting 240 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The claims brought by Plaintiffs Danielle Clay, Paul Hellman, Betty Pickens, Phyllis Reagan, and Demetria Whisby are accordingly DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/17/2016. (bdb)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting Defendants' 158 Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' sole remaining claim (Count I), is hereby DISMISSED and this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/26/2013. (cem)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 107 Defendants' Motion to Certify; granting 111 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify. Therefore, the Court CERTIFIES the Investment Issue for immediate appeal. The Courts Order 106 is AMENDED to state that the Investment Issue presents a controlling question of law as to which there is substantial ground for difference of opinion and that an immediate appeal from the order may materially advance the ultimate termination of the litigation. This case is STAYED until the Eleventh Circuit either denies leave to appeal on both the Investment Issue and Disclosure Issue or hears the appeal on one or both questions and issues a ruling. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/3/11. (cem)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER denying plaintiffs' 102 Motion for Oral Argument and granting in part and denying in part defendants' 78 Motion to Dismiss. The following claims are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim as a matter of law: Plaintiffs' Inve stment Claim, stated as part of Count I; Plaintiffs' False Information Claim, stated as part of Count I; and Plaintiffs' Monitoring Claim, stated as part of Count II. Plaintiffs' Participant Disclosure Claim, stated as part of Count I, is properly alleged against the Director Defendants, the Compensation Committee Defendants, and the Benefits Plan and Investment Sub-Committee Defendants. Plaintiffs' Benefits Plan Committee Disclosure Claim, stated as part of Count II, is prop erly alleged against the Director Defendants, the Compensation Committee Chairman, and Defendant Chancy. Plaintiffs have sufficiently alleged co-fiduciary liability against all Defendants other than SunTrust. The remaining parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/25/2010. (pdw)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRANSFER ORDER granting (15) Motion to Change Venue in case 9:08-cv-80759-KAM and 11 Motion to Change Venue in case 08-80960. The Clerk is directed to transmit the case file and certified copies of this Order and the docket sheet to the United Stat es District Court for the Northern District of Georga, Atlanta Division. Upon acknowledgement of receipt of those materials by the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia the Clerk is directed to deny all pending motions as moot and to administratively close this case.. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/24/2008. Associated Cases: 9:08-cv-80759-KAM, 9:08-cv-80960-KAM(tp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 11/3/2008.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisch et al v. SunTrust Banks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William B. Fisch
Represented By: Alan J. Statman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunil Kapilashrimi
Represented By: Alan J. Statman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Banks, Inc.
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Beall, II
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hyatt Brown
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alston D. Correll
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey C. Crowe
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. Farnsworth, Jr.
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia C. First
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake P. Garrett, Jr.
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Hughes
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Phillip Humann
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Neville Isdell
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Douglas Ivester
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hicks Lanier
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Gilmer Minor, III
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry I. Prince
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank S. Royal
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Wells, III
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Hastie Williams
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phail Wynn, Jr.
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Banks, Inc. Benefits Plan Commitee
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingrid Emmons
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna D. Lange
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: David Tetrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Paul J. Hellman
Represented By: Robert J. Dyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Betty L. Pickens
Represented By: Robert J. Dyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Phyllis Reagan
Represented By: Robert J. Dyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?