Detemple v. Leica Geosystems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cliff Detemple
Defendant: Leica Geosystems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv03272
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Ward
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying Defendant's 74 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties are DIRECTED to file a proposed consolidated pretrial order within thirty (30) days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/9/2015. (cem)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 58 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavit is DENIED as Moot. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/5/2014. (cem)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting Defendant's 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/27/13. (cem)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Detemple v. Leica Geosystems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff Detemple
Represented By: Paul R. Hoefle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leica Geosystems, Inc.
Represented By: Karen E. Sandrik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?