Ricketts v. State Of Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Vicki Ricketts
Defendant: State of Georgia, County of Gwinnett, States Attorneys Office of Gwinnett County, Don Geary, State of Georgia Attorney General, Govenor of State of Georgia, Gwinnett County Detention Center, Gwinnett County Sheriffs Dept & Deputies, Extradition Buses, Trans Con & Trans Corp, Gwinnett County Courts & All Participating Judiciary, Judge Melodie Snell Connor, Judge Peavey, Unknow John Doe, Budget Group Inc. doing business as Budget Rent -A-Car, Cendant Corp, Spouses & Heirs, All Substitute Parties, All Detectives, All Investigators, Insurors, Secondary Insurors, Underwriters, State of Florida, States Attorneys Office of Vowsia County, John Tanner, Colusia County Detention Center, Vowsia County Sheriffs Dept. & All Deputies, Sanford Miller, Gwinnett Co. Probation Office, Unknown Jane Doe, Robin Stephens, Florida Arresting Officers Taking Persons from Condo, All Arresting Officers Within Jail, Managers of Medical Departments Within Jail, Florida Attorney General, All Participating Florida Judiciary, Ford Motor Company, Edmund Waller and Macklyn Smith
Case Number: 1:2010cv02622
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Vicki Ricketts re #15 Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Appeal. (cem)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Appeal, as requested in her Motion. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/16/11. (cem)
November 8, 2011 Submission of #14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Appeal re: #11 Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (kac)
November 3, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Amend Notice of Appeal re: #11 Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment by Vicki Ricketts. (Attachments: #1 Amended Notice of Appeal Part 1, #2 Amended Notice of Appeal Part 2, #3 Amended Notice of Appeal Part 3)(kac)
October 19, 2011 Filing 13 USCA Acknowledgment of COR re: #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Vicki Ricketts. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-13995-CC. (kac)
October 14, 2011 Filing 12 Certified copy of CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of Record on Appeal transmitted to USCA re: #5 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-13995-CC. (kac)
October 14, 2011 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of Record on Appeal re: #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Vicki Ricketts. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-13995-CC. (kac) Modified on 10/14/2011 to correct docket entry (kac).
October 14, 2011 Notification of Docket Correction re: Certificate of Readiness to correct USCA Case Number. (kac)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #4 Plaintiff's Rule 60 and 59 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/3/11. (cem)
October 4, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Vicki Ricketts re #11 Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment. (cem)
September 29, 2011 Filing 10 Appeal notice from USCA sent to Appellant re: #5 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-13995-C. (kac)
September 8, 2011 Submission of #4 Rule 60 & 59 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment/Order #2 dated 7/25/11, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (cem)
September 6, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Addenda & Errata by Vicki Ricketts re: #5 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
September 6, 2011 Filing 8 USCA Acknowledgment of #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Vicki Ricketts. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 11-13995-C. (kac)
August 26, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Replacement Pages re #4 MOTION to Set Aside Order/Judgment #2 Order to Dismiss by Vicki Ricketts. (rej)
August 26, 2011 Filing 6 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #5 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
August 24, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Clerk's Judgment and #2 Order to Dismiss by Vicki Ricketts. Filing fee $455.00; Receipt Number GAN100038392. Transcript Order Form due on 9/7/2011. (Attachments: #1 USCA Appeal Fees) (kac)
August 19, 2011 Filing 4 RULE 60 & 59 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment/Order #2 dated 7/25/11 by Vicki Ricketts. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Motion)(cem)
July 26, 2011 Filing 3 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action without prejudice, pursuant to LR 41.3(A)(3). (cem)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2011: #1 Corrected PDF of Judgment to correct case year.) (cem).
July 26, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Vicki Ricketts re #2 Order to Dismiss and #3 Clerk's Judgment. (cem)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Dismissing this action without prejudice, pursuant to LR 41.3(A)(3). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/25/11. (cem)
July 25, 2011 Civil Case Terminated. (cem)
August 19, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 27530.), filed by Vicki Ricketts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mlh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricketts v. State Of Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Gwinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: States Attorneys Office of Gwinnett County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Georgia Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Govenor of State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett County Sheriffs Dept & Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extradition Buses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Con & Trans Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett County Courts & All Participating Judiciary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Melodie Snell Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Peavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknow John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Group Inc. doing business as Budget Rent -A-Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cendant Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spouses & Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Substitute Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Detectives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Investigators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secondary Insurors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: States Attorneys Office of Vowsia County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colusia County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vowsia County Sheriffs Dept. & All Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett Co. Probation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Arresting Officers Taking Persons from Condo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Arresting Officers Within Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Managers of Medical Departments Within Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Participating Florida Judiciary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macklyn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?