Stewart et al v. National Football League et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Ryan E. Stewart and Javonne Stewart
Defendant: National Football League and NFL Properties, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv04449
Filed: December 21, 2011
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Pannell
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2011 4 NOTICE OF Potential Tag-Along Actions by National Football League (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(jtj)
December 30, 2011 3 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, MOTION Coordination and Consolidation Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 with Brief In Support by National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Schedule of Actions, # 3 Exhibit A)(jtj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2012: # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C) (jtj). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2012: # 6 Exhibit D) (jtj). Modified on 01/03/2012. (jtj)
December 22, 2011 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to NFL Properties, LLC and National Football League. (Attachments: # 1 Summons -NFL Properties)(eop)
December 21, 2011 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Javonne Stewart and Ryan E. Stewart. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113E-3682055.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan E. Stewart
Represented By: M. Gino Brogdon, Sr.
Represented By: Bruce A. Hagen
Represented By: Jay Forbes Hirsch
Represented By: Michael Lee McGlamry
Represented By: N. Kirkland Pope
Represented By: George W. Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javonne Stewart
Represented By: M. Gino Brogdon, Sr.
Represented By: Bruce A. Hagen
Represented By: Jay Forbes Hirsch
Represented By: Michael Lee McGlamry
Represented By: N. Kirkland Pope
Represented By: George W. Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?