Stevenson et al v. The Great American Dream, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Martisha Stevenson and Elisha Hunter
Defendant: The Great American Dream, Inc. and James W. Lee, Sr.
Case Number: 1:2012cv03359
Filed: September 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
County: Clayton
Presiding Judge: Thomas W. Thrash
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying 127 Motion to Decertify or Amend Conditional Class; denying 130 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 132 Motion to Strike. Opt-In Plaintiffs have 30 day to provide verified discovery responses or they will be dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 6/11/2015. (ss)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 OPINION AND ORDER granting 126 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/14/15. (dr)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 OPINION AND ORDER denying 89 Motion to Dismiss, granting 91 Motion to Compel, granting 91 Motion to Dismiss; the Court will not dismiss the claims of the opt-in Plaintiffs referenced in the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Untimeliness. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 9/30/14. (dr)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER denying 109 Motion for Reconsideration re: 99 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Appeal under 1292(b). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 7/15/2014. (ss)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION and ORDER granting Defendants' 59 Motion to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiff Kwanza Edwards. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/16/2014. (dfb)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION and ORDER granting 53 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/31/2013. (bdb)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/13/2013. (ss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson et al v. The Great American Dream, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martisha Stevenson
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisha Hunter
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Great American Dream, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Lee, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?