Lott v. Estate of Laurraine Goreau et al
Plaintiff: |
Frank E. Lott-Johnson |
Defendant: |
Estate of Laurraine Goreau, Estate of Mary Ann G. (J. Lincoln) Devillier, Pelican Publishing Company and Anne Devillier |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv03104 |
Filed: |
September 26, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Atlanta Office |
County: |
Bulloch |
Presiding Judge: |
William S. Duffey |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1338 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 26, 2016 |
Filing
75
OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff Bishop Frank E. Lott-Johnsons Request to File Reconsideration with Reasons 69 ; Motion for Leave to File Newly Discovered Evidence 71 ; Amended Petition for Permanent Injunction/Temporary Restraining Order 72 ; and Amended Supplemental Motion for Reconsideration 74 . Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/26/16. (ddm) Modified on 8/26/2016 to edit docket text (ddm).
|
July 15, 2015 |
Filing
57
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING Pelican's 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and GRANTING the Devillier Defendants' 41 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings with respect to Plaintiff's copyright claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's state law claim for conversion is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Estate of Laurraine Goreau isDISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 7/15/2015. (adg)
|
November 7, 2014 |
Filing
23
OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiff shall properly serve the Defendants, as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or Georgia law, and shall, on or before January 26, 2015, serve each defendant with Plaintiff's summons and complaint an d file proof of service on each defendant served, as required by Rule 4(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to serve the Defendants and file the required proofs of service on or before January 26, 2015, will result in the dis missal of this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all motions pending in this action are DENIED AS MOOT, and this case is STAYED until the Plaintiff provides proof that he has properly served the Defendants. Plaintiff shall not file any additi onal motions or other pleadings in this action unless he files a Request to File Pleading in which he describes the pleading he seeks to file and the reason the Court should lift the stay to allowing the pleading to be filed. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 11/7/2014. (anc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?