Andrews et al v. Autoliv Japan, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Jamie Lee Andrews
Defendant: Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Autoliv, Inc., Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv AB, Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv LLC, Autoliv North America, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation, Robert Bosch Motor Systems Corporation, Bosch Corporation, John Does 1-5 and Robert Bosch GmbH
Petitioner: Ford Motor Company
Special Master: Michael A. Sullivan
Case Number: 1:2014cv03432
Filed: October 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Cherokee
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 627 USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal of Voluntary Dismissal: Pursuant to Appellee-Cross Appellant Jamie Lee Andrews' motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), #592 Notice of Appeal and #604 Notice of Appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 22-13713-DD. (pjm)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 626 USCA Order: State of Georgias motions for leave to intervene on the side of Plaintiff-Appellee, to file a response brief in this appeal, and to extend the time to file its brief are GRANTED. Intervenors response brief is due 30 days from the filing of Plaintiff-Appellee-Cross Appellant Andrewss principal and response brief. Defendant-Appellant-Cross Appellee Autolivs response and reply brief is due 30 days from the filing of Intervenors response brief. Plaintiff-Appellee-Cross Appellant Andrewss reply brief, if any, is due 21 days after the filing of Defendant-Appellant-Cross Appellee Autolivs response and reply brief re: #592 Notice of Appeal, filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd., and #604 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 22-13713-DD. (pjm)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 625 NOTICE of receipt of exhibits in re #624 Exhibit Disposition Notification. (ddm)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 624 NOTICE TO COURT regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D(2) filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. Exhibits to be Retrieved.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Deputy Clerk)(Repko, William)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 623 NOTICE TO COURT regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D(2) filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. Exhibits to be Destroyed.. (Cannella, Tedra)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Damages under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e). Doc. No. #567 . Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/29/2022. (ddm)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 621 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD for Jamie Lee Andrews regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. (lwb)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 620 PLAINTIFF EXHIBITS (Documents) admitted and retained at the Bench Trial held October 4, 2021, to October 13, 2021, have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P 1, #2 Exhibit P 2, #3 Exhibit P 3, #4 Exhibit P 4, #5 Exhibit P 7, #6 Exhibit P 9, #7 Exhibit P 11, #8 Exhibit P 20, #9 Exhibit P 22, #10 Exhibit P 23, #11 Exhibit P 27, #12 Exhibit P 28, #13 Exhibit P 29, #14 Exhibit P 33, #15 Exhibit P 35, #16 Exhibit P 36, #17 Exhibit P 39A, #18 Exhibit P 40, #19 Exhibit P 44, #20 Exhibit P 45 Text Only, #21 Exhibit P 46 Text Only, #22 Exhibit P 47 Text Only, #23 Exhibit P 49)(lwb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2022: #24 Exhibit P 52, #25 Exhibit P 54, #26 Exhibit P 55, #27 Exhibit 56, #28 Exhibit P 57A, #29 Exhibit P 58A, #30 Exhibit P 59 Text Only, #31 Exhibit P 61A, #32 Exhibit P 62, #33 Exhibit P 68, #34 Exhibit P 72, #35 Exhibit P 74, #36 Exhibit P 81, #37 Exhibit P 100 Text Only, #38 Exhibit P 102, #39 Exhibit P 108, #40 Exhibit P 117, #41 Exhibit P 120.2, #42 Exhibit P 126, #43 Exhibit P 128) (lwb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2022: #44 Exhibit P 142, #45 Exhibit P 156 Text Only, #46 Exhibit P 160, #47 Exhibit P 161, #48 Exhibit P 162, #49 Exhibit P 189A, #50 Exhibit P 190A, #51 Exhibit P 191A, #52 Exhibit P 192A, #53 Exhibit P 193A, #54 Exhibit P 194A, #55 Exhibit P 195A, #56 Exhibit P 196A, #57 Exhibit P 197A, #58 Exhibit P 198A, #59 Exhibit P 201A, #60 Exhibit P 202A, #61 Exhibit P 203A, #62 Exhibit P 209, #63 Exhibit P 212, #64 Exhibit P 214, #65 Exhibit P 242, #66 Exhibit P 262, #67 Exhibit P 264, #68 Exhibit P 300) (lwb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2022: #69 Exhibit P 302, #70 Exhibit P 339, #71 Exhibit P 372, #72 Exhibit P 398, #73 Exhibit P 399, #74 Exhibit P 400, #75 Exhibit P 401, #76 Exhibit P 428, #77 Exhibit P 449, #78 Exhibit P 456, #79 Exhibit P 477, #80 Exhibit P 479, #81 Exhibit P 481, #82 Exhibit P 499, #83 Exhibit P 501, #84 Exhibit P 503, #85 Exhibit P 504, #86 Exhibit P 507, #87 Exhibit P 513, #88 Exhibit P 526, #89 Exhibit P 529, #90 Exhibit P 536, #91 Exhibit P 547, #92 Exhibit P 610, #93 Exhibit P 611, #94 Exhibit P 637, #95 Exhibit P 645, #96 Exhibit P 659, #97 Exhibit P 659, #98 Exhibit P 677) (lwb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2022: #99 Exhibit P 669, #100 Exhibit P 707, #101 Exhibit P 708, #102 Exhibit P 740, #103 Exhibit P 745, #104 Exhibit p 756, #105 Exhibit p 781, #106 Exhibit p 782, #107 Exhibit p 785, #108 Exhibit p 786, #109 Exhibit p 787, #110 Exhibit p 788, #111 Exhibit p 794, #112 Exhibit p 824, #113 Exhibit p 837, #114 Exhibit p 867, #115 Exhibit p 887, #116 Exhibit p 888, #117 Exhibit p 894, #118 Exhibit p 898, #119 Exhibit p 903, #120 Exhibit p 908, #121 Exhibit p 943) (lwb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2022: #122 Exhibit p 1043, #123 Exhibit p 1074, #124 Exhibit p 1095, #125 Exhibit p 1099A, #126 Exhibit p 1101, #127 Exhibit P 1102, #128 Exhibit P 1104, #129 Exhibit p 1110, #130 Exhibit p 1124, #131 Exhibit p 1128A, #132 Exhibit P 1129A, #133 Exhibit P 1138, #134 Exhibit P 1139A, #135 Exhibit P 1141, #136 Exhibit P 1142, #137 Exhibit P 1149, #138 Exhibit P 1152, #139 Exhibit P 1159, #140 Exhibit P 1163, #141 Exhibit P 1172) (lwb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2023: #142 Exhibit plaintiff's exhibit 479) (bla). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2023: #143 Exhibit plaintiff's exhibit 199A) (bla). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2023: #144 Exhibit plaintiff's exhibit 200A) (bla).
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 619 EXHIBITS AUDIO/VIDEO (Two USB Drives) admitted and retained at the Bench Trial held on October 4, 2021, to October 13, 2021, have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Video Exhibit Two USB Drives)(lwb)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 618 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. (lwb)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 617 DEFENDANT EXHIBITS (Documents) admitted and retained at the Bench Trial - held October 4, 2021 to October 13, 2021, have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 Exhibit 42, #4 Exhibit 96, #5 Exhibit 98, #6 Exhibit 99, #7 Exhibit 100, #8 Exhibit 101, #9 Exhibit 104, #10 Exhibit 106, #11 Exhibit 206)(lwb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2022: #12 Exhibit D 1151 Part 1, #13 Exhibit D 1151 Part 2, #14 Exhibit D 115 Part 3, #15 Exhibit D 1151 Part 4, #16 Exhibit D 1234 Part 1, #17 Exhibit D 1234 Part Two) (lwb).
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 616 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (All necessary transcript(s) already on file) re: #592 Notice of Appeal and #604 Notice of Appeal. (Weeks, Rory) Modified on 12/8/2022 to update text (pjm).
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal, #592 Notice of Appeal and #604 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 22-13713-DD. The record on appeal is available electronically with the exception of: 1 thumb drive received re: #346 Notice of Manual Filing. (pjm)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 615 Defendant's Exhibit List and EXHIBITS (Documents) admitted and retained at the #401 Motion Hearing held on May 16, 2019, have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in the custody of the Records Clerks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(lwb)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 614 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL OF RECORD regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED Documentary EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D. (lwb)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 613 Plaintiff's Exhibit List and Exhibits by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) for the hearing held May 16, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 22, #6 Exhibit 23, #7 Exhibit 24, #8 Exhibit 25, #9 Exhibit 26, #10 Exhibit 40, #11 Exhibit 49, #12 Exhibit 53, #13 Exhibit 54, #14 Exhibit 74, #15 Exhibit 126, #16 Exhibit 320, #17 Exhibit 1074, #18 Exhibit 1101, #19 Exhibit 1102, #20 Exhibit 1107, #21 Exhibit 1108)(lwb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2022: #22 Receipt for Exhibits) (lwb).
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 612 Plaintiff's Exhibit List from bench trial held 10/4/2021 - 10/13/2021. (pdw)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 611 Defendant's Exhibit List from bench trial held 10/04/2021 - 10/13/2021. (pdw) (pdw)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 610 Defendant's Witness List from bench trial held 10/04/2021 - 10/13/2021. (pdw) (pdw)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 609 Plaintiff's Witness List from bench trial held 10/04/2021 - 10/13/2021. (pdw) Modified on 11/28/2022 to correctly identify filing(pdw).
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 608 USCA Acknowledgment of #604 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 22-13713-D (adg)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 607 Court Reporter Acknowledgment re #598 Transcript Order Form filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. Case Appealed to Eleventh Circuit Case Number 22-13713. Transcript is required. Court Reporter: Jana B. Colter, FAPR, RDR, CRR, CRC. Satisfactory financial arrangements completed., Notification of Transcript Filed in District Court re #598 Transcript Order Form filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. All transcripts for this request are now on file. Transcript due by 12/23/2022. (jbc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 606 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Orders and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #604 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 605 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #604 Notice of Appeal filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. (kac)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 604 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #586 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for New Trial,,,,, #534 Judgment,, #587 Clerk's Judgment by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-12192529. Transcript Order Form due on 11/25/2022 (Weeks, Rory)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 603 TRANSCRIPT of the Bench Trial Hearing Proceedings (Volume 5; Afternoon Session) held on October 12, 2021, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana B. Colter. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 602 TRANSCRIPT of the Bench Trial Hearing Proceedings (Volume 4; Afternoon Session) held on October 7, 2021, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana B. Colter. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 601 TRANSCRIPT of the Bench Trial Hearing Proceedings (Volume 3; Afternoon Session) held on October 6, 2021, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana B. Colter. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 600 TRANSCRIPT of the Bench Trial Hearing Proceedings (Volume 2; Afternoon Session) held on October 5, 2021, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana B. Colter. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 599 TRANSCRIPT of the Bench Trial Hearing Proceedings (Volume 1; Afternoon Session) held on October 4, 2021, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana B. Colter. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Financial Arrangements due date deadline re: #598 Transcript Order Form. Financial Arrangements due on 11/22/2022. (kac)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 598 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on October 4-7 & 12, 2021 before Judge Steve C. Jones, re #592 Notice of Appeal,. Court Reporter: Jana Colter. (Repko, William)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 597 USCA Acknowledgment of #592 Notice of Appeal, filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 22-13713-D. (pjm)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 596 NOTICE Of Filing Letter re PX 1206-c (Correcting estimated billing totals) by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #595 Notice of Filing, Amended Letter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Px 1206-c Corrected Estimated Billing Totals Using Lawyer-Estimated Hours)(Weeks, Rory)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 595 NOTICE Of Filing Letter re PX 1196-c (Correcting estimated billing totals) by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PX 1196-c Corrected Estimated Billing Totals)(Weeks, Rory)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 594 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Final Order and Judgment, Order, and Amended Clerk's Judgment, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #592 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 593 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to re: #592 Notice of Appeal filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd. (kac)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 592 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #534 Final Order and Judgment, #586 Order and #587 Amended Clerk's Judgment by Autoliv Japan, Ltd. Filing fee $505, receipt number AGANDC-12164192. Transcript Order Form due on 11/14/2022 (Repko, William) Modified on 11/1/2022 to include document relationships (kac).
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 591 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/7/2022, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/17/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/28/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing Transcript)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 590 RESPONSE re #589 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Weeks, Rory)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 589 RESPONSE in Opposition re #567 Amended MOTION for Damages under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(E) filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Hergenrother, Jenny)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 587 CLERK'S AMENDED JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Defendant, Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Modify the Court's Final Order and Judgment (Doc. No. #536 ). More specifically, the motion is denied as Plaintiff's request to amend the Judgment to include the amount of compensatory damages omitted because of apportionment of fault to Mazda. The motion is granted as to Plaintiff's request for prejudgment interest. The December 31, 2021 judgment (Doc. No. #534 ) is amended to include an award of prejudgment interest (compounded annually) in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $4,734,349.55. The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion to Amend the Judgment (Doc. No. #543 ). The alternative Motion for New Trial is also DENIED in the exercise of the Court's discretion. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter an amended judgment in favor of Plaintiff to reflect prejudgment interest in the following amount $4,734,349.55. The remaining Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e) (Doc. No. #567 ) will be addressed by separate order following the conclusion of the briefing schedule announced at the September 7, 2022 hearing. Lastly, the Court recognizes that there remains an outstanding discovery dispute issue concerning production of insurance policies. After review, the Court DEFERS ruling on this discovery matter until after resolution of the appeal or the post-judgment discovery context. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 09/30/2022. (ddm)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Damages Hearing held on 9/7/2022. Oral argument heard. Order to follow. Additional briefing to be provided as directed by the Court. (Court Reporter Viola Zborowski)(pdw)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 585 RESPONSE to #584 Plaintiff's Bench Brief on the Inadmissibility of Richard Robbins' Legal Opinions by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William) Modified on 9/7/2022 to edit docket entry (ddm).
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 584 Plaintiff's Bench Brief on the Inadmissibility of Richard Hobbins' Legal Opinions by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Robbins' Expert Report)(Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 9/6/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Submission of #543 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment,, MOTION for New Trial, #536 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment,, , #567 Amended MOTION for Damages under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(E), to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER allowing Counsel and Representatives for Defendant to bring electronic equipment into the Courthouse for a hearing to be held in Courtroom 1907 on September 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 08/30/2022. (ddm)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER allowing Counsel and Representatives for Plaintiff to bring electronic equipment and demonstrative evidence into the Courthouse for a hearing on September 7, 2022. This Order shall be info effect starting September 7, 2022 and will end when the hearing concludes. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 08/30/2022. (ddm)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 581 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 580 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannella, Tedra)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 579 REPLY BRIEF re #567 Amended MOTION for Damages under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(E) filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Weeks, Rory)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 578 RESPONSE re #567 Amended MOTION for Damages under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(E) filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Expenses Chart, #3 Exhibit C - Robbins Report, #4 Exhibit D - Butler Email, #5 Exhibit E - Hamilton Report)(Repko, William)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 577 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Postjudgment Discovery by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Repko, William)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 576 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Expert Disclosure by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Repko, William)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER granting #572 Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures and AMENDS its prior Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. #566 ) such that (i) Autoliv Japan must serve expert disclosures for each witness that will offer expert testimony in opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e) no later than June 28, 2022 and (ii) Plaintiff may conduct one Rule 30 deposition of each expert Autoliv Japan identifies no later than July 28, 2022. All other deadlines within the Scheduling Order shall remain the same. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 06/17/2022. (ddm)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 574 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 573 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 10-14, 2022, by Tedra L. Cannella. (Cannella, Tedra)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 572 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Plaintiff's Objections to Documents Listed in Exhibit A to Autoliv's Subpoena That Are To Be Produced at the Deposition of Alan Hamilton filed by Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Weeks, Rory) Modified on 5/31/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 570 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/6/2022, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/17/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing Transcript)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER directing Clerk to administratively term the pendency of the Motion for Damages at Doc. No. #535 as the future briefing and merits ruling shall all pertain to the amended motion at Doc. No. #567 . Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 05/16/2022. (ddm)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 568 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #566 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Amended MOTION for Damages under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(E), with Brief In Support, filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Px 89 - Death Certificate, #2 Exhibit Px 1141 - 5/8/20 Cannella Letter to Scribner, #3 Exhibit Px 1142 - 5/12/20 Repko Ltr to Cannella, #4 Exhibit Px 1144 - 8/28/20 Cannella Letter to Scribner, #5 Exhibit Px 1145 - 9/4/20 Scribner Letter to Cannella, #6 Exhibit Px 1186 - 8/15/17 Scribner Email to Cannella, #7 Exhibit Px 1188 - 6/21/12 Autoliv Plea Agreement, #8 Exhibit Px 1189 - Pl's Bench Brief on Attorney's Fees, #9 Exhibit Px 1190 - Cannella Affidavit, #10 Exhibit Px 1191 - Butler Affidavit, #11 Exhibit Px 1192 - Weeks Declaration, #12 Exhibit Px 1193 - TLC Letter to Autoliv, #13 Exhibit Px 1194 - Autoliv Response to Plaintiff's Proposed Stipulations, #14 Exhibit Px 1195 - Eric Swanson LinkedIn)(Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 5/12/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 566 SCHEDULING ORDER with respect to the resolution of Plaintiff's request for damages under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e). See Order for specific details and deadlines. A hearing on the Amended 68(e) Motion, as amended, will be held onSeptember 7, 2022 at 10:00 A.M. (ATL Courtroom 1907, RBR Bldg/United States Courthouse). Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 04/20/2022. (ddm)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 565 NOTICE Of Filing of Proposed Scheduling Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e) by Autoliv Japan, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Repko, William)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 564 PROPOSED ORDER Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order Regarding Plaintiff'sRule 68(e) Claims for Damages re: #535 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e). (Cannella, Tedra)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 563 AFFIDAVIT re #535 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e) Declaration of Rory A. Weeks by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Weeks, Rory)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 562 AFFIDAVIT re #535 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e) Affidavit of James E. Butler, Jr. by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Butler, James)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER granting #558 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on 4/6/22. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's counsel (Doug Scribner, Keith Blackwell, Jenny Hergenrother, and William Repko) and their paralegals and staff (Doug Cunningham and Ceirra Ransome) may bring the equipment referenced in Defendant's motion, including smartphones, laptop computers, hotspot internet connection devices, monitors, switching devices, cabling and wiring, power supplies, audio system components, a portable printer, printing supplies, a presentation table, presentation pointer, a portable hard-drive, wireless mouse, projector, and any other electronic devices they may need along with an easel and presentation boards into Courtroom 1907 for purposes of a hearing to be held on April 6, 2022. This Order shall be in effect for only April 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 04/05/2022. (rsg)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER granting #557 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on 4/6/22. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff (James E. Butler, Jr., Tedra L. Cannella, Rory A. Weeks, Alan Hamilton, and Caroline E. Walker), their paralegals (JaRhea Shumper, Beth Glen), and IT professionals (Jay Carbajal and Daniel Merck) may bring the equipment referenced in her motion, including smartphones, laptop computers, a hotspot internet connection device, monitors, switching devices, cabling and wiring, power supplies, audio system components, a portable printer, printing supplies, a presentation table, presentation pointer, a portable hard-drive, wireless mouse, projector, and any other electronic devices they need along with an easel, presentation boards, and various demonstrative seatbelt components into the courtroom for the trial of this case. This Order shall be in effect starting April 6, 2022 and will end when the hearing concludes. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 04/05/2022. (rsg)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 559 AFFIDAVIT re #535 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e) Affidavit of Tedra L. Cannella by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Cannella, Tedra)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 558 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom Plfs' Motion to Allow Counsel to Bring Electronic Equipment into the Courthouse by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plfs' Motion to Allow Counsel to Bring Equipment into the Courthouse)(Butler, James)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 556 Plaintiff's Bench Brief on O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(E) filed by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 3/31/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 555 REPLY BRIEF re #543 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment,, MOTION for New Trial filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Submission of #543 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment,, MOTION for New Trial, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 554 RESPONSE in Opposition re #543 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment,, MOTION for New Trial filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Weeks, Rory)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 553 TRANSCRIPT of Non-Jury Proceedings held on 10/13/2021, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 6. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 552 TRANSCRIPT of Non-Jury Proceedings held on 10/12/2021 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 5. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 551 TRANSCRIPT of Non-Jury Proceedings held on 10/7/2021 - P.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 4. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 550 TRANSCRIPT of Non-Jury Proceedings held on 10/6/2021 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 3. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 549 TRANSCRIPT of Non-Jury Proceedings held on 10/5/2021 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 2. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 548 TRANSCRIPT of Non-Jury Trial Proceedings held on 10/4/2021- A.M., before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER granting #546 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until February 21, 2022 to file a response to the Defendant's Motion to Amend the Judgment, or in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial (Doc. No. #543 ). Defendant shall have until March 11, 2022 to file a reply brief. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/09/2022. (rsg)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 546 First MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to a motion re: #543 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment,, MOTION for New Trial by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Cannella, Tedra)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 545 REPLY to Response to Motion re #536 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment,, filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Weeks, Rory)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motion #543 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment, MOTION for New Trial: Motion Hearing reset for 4/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/07/2022. (rsg)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Submission of #535 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e), to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Submission of #536 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment,, , to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 543 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment or, in the alternative, MOTION for New Trial, with Brief In Support, by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William) . Added MOTION for New Trial on 1/31/2022 (ddm).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 542 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Robert Blackwell on behalf of Autoliv Japan, Ltd. (Blackwell, Keith)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 541 RESPONSE in Opposition re #536 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment,, filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cert Petition)(Repko, William)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER granting #538 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limits for Defendant's forthcoming post-trial motion are extended by 10 pages (from 25 pages to 35 pages). The Court reciprocally GRANTS Plaintiff a similar 10-page extension for her response brief. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 01/24/2022. (rsg)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 539 RESPONSE re #538 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Weeks, Rory)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 538 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #535 Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e). Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2022 will commence at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 537 RESPONSE in Opposition re #535 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e) filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #535 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e). Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2022 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 536 MOTION to Alter #534 Judgment,, with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand Letter, #2 Exhibit Publication H. 15 (May 2015))(Weeks, Rory)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 535 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Under O.C.G.A. 9-11-68(e) by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 534 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT including findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Court enters judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant, Autoliv Japan, Ltd., and awards the following apportioned amounts to Plaintiff: $9,671.70 for funeral and medical expenses; $1,000,000.00 in general damages for the predeath fright, shock, terror, and pain and suffering that Micah Andrews endured; $12,500,000.00 for the full value of Micah Andrews's life; and $100,000,000.00 for punitive damages. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/31/2021. --Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--(ddm)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
November 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 533 TRIAL BRIEF on Full Value of Micah Andrews' Life - Supplemental by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Butler, James)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 531 Proposed Findings of Fact by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redline Comparison)(Repko, William)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 530 Proposed Findings of Fact by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Weeks, Rory)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Bench Trial concluded on 10/13/2021. Defendant's exhibits 101 and 1234 admitted. [Note: the minutes of 10/7/2021 #528 should reflect that P-108, not D-108, was tendered by Defendant and admitted.] Closing arguments heard. Matter taken under advisement by the Court. Hearing Concluded. Trial Completed-Submitted to Court. Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter V. Zborowski)(rsg)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 529 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Bench Trial continued on 10/12/2021. Arsdell sworn and testified as Defendant's expert. Defendant's exhibits 106 and 1151 admitted. Plaintiff's exhibits 140 and 10 tendered by Defendant and admitted. Plaintiff's exhibits 1099a, 302, 300, 1176 admitted. Dr. Elizabeth Raphael sworn and testified as expert. Plaintiff's exhibits 1163, 117, 56, 526, 547, 787, 788 admitted. Admission of Plaintiff's exhibits 141, 21 and 43 was denied. Defendant rested. Oral motions for directed verdict made by Defendant and Plaintiff. Oral argument heard; motions denied. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:00 AM on 10/13/2021. (Court Reporter V. Zborowski & J. Colter)(ddm)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 528 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Bench Trial continued on 10/7/2021. Plaintiff's case continued. Plaintiff's exhibits 1161 and 100 admitted. Gerald Andrews sworn and testified. Plaintiff's exhibits 669, 745, 1101, 1102, 781, 740, 637 admitted. Jamie Andrews sworn and testified. Plaintiff's exhibits 659, 677, 708, 707, 654, 102, 756, 1104, 1110, 1124 admitted. Plaintiff tendered exhibit 1163 (Kamei depo excerpts). Defendant to consider before offering objections - ruling reserved. Plaintiff rested. Defendant made an oral motion for directed verdict on strict liability and punitive damages. The Court heard argument and issued verbal order denying motion. Defendant's case began. William Rogers sworn and testified. Defendant's exhibits 108, 13, 14 admitted. Plaintiff's exhibit 1164 admitted. David Prentkowski recalled and testified. Defendant's exhibits 42 and 206 admitted. Plaintiff's exhibit 1165 admitted. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:00 AM on 10/12/2021. (Court Reporter V. Zborowski & J. Colter)(ddm)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 526 STIPULATION re #503 Stipulation of Additional Financial Facts by Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Weeks, Rory)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Bench Trial continued on 10/6/2021. Plaintiff's case continued. Chris Caruso sworn and testified as expert witness. Plaintiff's exhibits 1095, 1141, 1142, 1138, 11, 120, 27, 28, 29, 54, 128, 45, 142, 156, 59, 33, 22, 23, 82, 153 admitted. Defendant's exhibits 100 and 101 admitted. Steven Meyer sworn and testified as expert witness. Plaintiff's exhibits 903, 908, 1152, 898, 943, 339, 9, 867, 81, 162, 161, 160, 7, 1149, 68, 36, 372, 49, 72, 1159 admitted. Defendant's exhibits 96, 98, 99 admitted. Robert Eller sworn and testified. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:00 AM on 10/07/2021. (Court Reporter V. Zborowski & J. Colter)(ddm) Modified on 10/7/2021 to edit docket text (ddm).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 525 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Bench Trial continued on 10/5/2021. Plaintiff's case continued. Plaintiff's exhibits 189a-203a, 1128a, 1129a admitted. Presentation of video deposition of Yuji Kamei concluded. Brian Buchner sworn and testified as expert witness. Plaintiff's exhibits 46, 47, 479, 478, 499, 55, 262, 46, 47, 242, 785, 794, 786, 529, 481, 477, 264, 503, 536, 499, 478, 837, 501, 503, 504 admitted. Plaintiff's exhibit 1098 tendered - admission denied. Plaintiff's exhibits 1158, 398, 399, 401 admitted. Mariusz Ziejewski sworn and testified as expert witness. Plaintiff's exhibits 824, 449, 456, 209, 51, 57a, 58, 1074, 887, 888, 62 admitted. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:00 AMon 10/06/2021. (Court Reporter V. Zborowski & J. Colter)(ddm) (ddm)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Bench trial began. Court denied Plaintiff's #520 motion to amend pretrial order. Opening arguments heard. Plaintiff's case began. William Kemp sworn and testified. Plaintiff's exhibits 513, 45, 428, 507, 782 admitted. Dr. Brian Frist sworn and testified via Zoom. Plaintiff's exhibits 214, 2, 3, 209, 894, 44, 212, 611, 610 admitted. Plaintiff called David Pretkowski for purposes of cross-examination; witness sworn and testified. Plaintiff's exhibits 128, 39, 126, 1, 61a, 57a, 1043, 1138, 1139, 74, 40, 4, 35, 20, 52, 1138a. Video deposition of Yuji Kamei presented. Officer Aaron Porter sworn and testified via Zoom. Plaintiff's exhibit 400 admitted. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:00 AM on 10/05/2021.(Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office.) (Court Reporter V. Zborowski & J. Colter)(ddm) Modified on 10/6/2021 to edit entry (ddm).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 523 Proposed Findings of Fact by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Weeks, Rory)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 522 Proposed Findings of Fact by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
October 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 521 RESPONSE in Opposition re #520 MOTION for Order Allowing Plaintiff to Amend the Pretrial Order to Add Issues to Be Decided filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 520 MOTION for Order Allowing Plaintiff to Amend the Pretrial Order to Add Issues to Be Decided with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 519 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #518 Order on Motion for Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit List)(Weeks, Rory)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER granting #517 Motion to Amend the Pretrial Order to Add Exhibits to Her Exhibit List and Autoliv's lack of opposition to that motion. Plaintiff shall filed her Amended Exhibit List (Attachment G-1 to the Pretrial Order) on the docket of this case. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/30/21. (rsg)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Unopposed MOTION for Order Allowing Plaintiff to Amend Her Exhibit List with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit List, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weeks, Rory)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER granting #514 Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Plaintif's Expert Witnesses to Bring Electronic Equipment and Demonstrative Evidence into the Courthouse for the trial of this case beginning October 4, 2021. Plaintiff's expert witnesses (G. Bryant Buchner, Christopher Caruso, Steven Meyer, and Mariusz Ziejewski) may bring electronic devices, including smartphones, laptop computers, a "hotspot" internet connection device, and various demonstrative seatbelt components into the courtroom for the trial of this case. This Order shall be in effect starting October 1, 2021 and will end when the trial of this case concludes. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/29/2021. (ddm)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER advising that the pretrial order #485 is AMENDED pursuant to the Notice #501 identifying David Prentkowski as a witness at trial. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/29/2021. (ddm)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 514 MOTION for Order to allow Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses to Bring Electronic Equipment and Demonstrative Evidence into the Courthouse for Trial with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Weeks, Rory)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting #508 Motion to Allow Certain Witnesses to Appear at the Bench Trial via Video Conference. Officer Aaron Porter and Dr. Brian Frist may testify live via video conferencing (such as Zoom) at the bench trial of this case. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 09/28/2021. (rsg)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER granting #502 Defendant's Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on October 1, 2021 at 10:00 AM or later, and continuing day to day thereafter until the conclusion of the bench trial in this matter. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/28/2021. (pdw)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER granting #502 Plaintiffs' Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on October 1, 2021 at 10:00 AM or later, and continuing day to day thereafter until the conclusion of the bench trial in this matter. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/28/2021. (pdw)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER granting #509 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Permit Testimony At 5:30 PM on October 4, 2021. Plaintiff may call Officer Aaron Porter at 5:30 p.m. at the bench trial of this case and the witness will testify via video conferencing technology. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/28/2021. (ddm)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 509 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Permit Testimony at 5:30 PM on October 4, 2021 with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Weeks, Rory)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 508 Consent MOTION for Order to Allow Certain Witnesses to Appear via Video Conference with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weeks, Rory)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on SEPTEMBER 22, 2021 at 2:00 PM. Defendant's counsel, staff, and/or IT professionals may enter with electronic equipment for the purpose of trial preparation. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/21/2021. (pdw)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 506 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 505 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on SEPTEMBER 22, 2021 at 2:00 PM - Plaintiffs' counsel, staff, and/or IT professionals may enter with electronic equipment for the purpose of trial preparation. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/21/2021. (pdw)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendant's Notice of Filing of Amendment to Consolidated Pretrial Order (Doc. No. #501 ). As a pretrial order has already been entered, the Court respectfully cautions against future "notices" and encourages the parties to utilize motions to amend the pretrial order; however, as the proposed amendment is minor, in the interest of caution and efficiency, the Court will permit the Notice (at Doc. No. #501 ) to stand. If Plaintiff opposes/objects to said filing at Doc. No. #501 , Plaintiff shall file a written response/objection on or September 24, 2021. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/21/2021. (ddm)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 503 Facts Stipulated by the Parties by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Weeks, Rory) Modified on 9/17/2021 to edit docket text (ddm).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 502 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Counsel to Bring Electronic Equipment and Demonstrative Evidence into the Courthouse for the Trial with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Weeks, Rory)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 501 NOTICE Of Filing of Amendment to Consolidated Pretrial Order by Autoliv Japan, Ltd. (Repko, William)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE setting Trial: Bench Trial set for 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (ddm) (ADI)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDE: Plaintiff's #448 Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence about the "Severity" or "Rarity" of Frontal Collisions is GRANTED. Defendant is prohibited from offering any statistical evidence (e.g., graphs, charts, learned treatises, or testimony) about the alleged "severity" or "rarity" of Mr. Andrews's crash that is not based on substantially similar collisions involving substantially similar vehicles to the 2005 Mazda 3. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/2/2021. (rjs)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 497 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (rvb) (ADI)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER: The March 8, 2021 bench trial is CONTINUED. The parties are ORDERED to confer and agree on a trial date that falls after August 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/2021. (rjs)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Status conference held via Zoom regarding March 8, 2021 bench trial date. Court heard from counsel and will issue a decision by written order. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(rjs)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING: Status Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 11:00 AM via Zoom before Judge Steve C. Jones. Connection Instructions: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617307136 Meeting ID: 161 730 7136 Passcode: 130637 One tap mobile +16692545252,,1617307136#,,,,*130637# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1617307136#,,,,*130637# US (New York) Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) +1 551 285 1373 US +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) Meeting ID: 161 730 7136 Passcode: 130637 Find your local number: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/awJ5r8xmL Join by SIP 1617307136@sip.zoomgov.com Join by H.323 161.199.138.10 (US West) 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 161 730 7136 Passcode: 130637 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (pdw)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER: Defendant Autoliv Japan, LTD.'s #456 Motion in Limine to Exclude Turtle Evidence is DENIED. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/20/2021. (rjs)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER: Defendant Autoliv Japan, Inc.'s #455 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Autoliv, Inc.'s Financial Condition is DENIED. To be clear, it is the Court's preference to receive direct evidence of the named-defendant/Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s financial circumstances, however, the Court declines to exclude evidence of its parent company's financial condition for purposes of a punitive damages calculation (in the event that punitive damages are ultimately awarded at trial). Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/20/2021. (rjs)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER: Defendant Autoliv Japan, Inc.'s #454 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Arguments Regarding Discovery Issues is GRANTED IN PART and as follows: any evidence concerning discovery issues that have already been addressed in the context of the Court's ruling (Doc. No. #407 ) on Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions is excluded. All additional defense objections to Plaintiff's evidence concerning discovery issues should be raised in the context of trial. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/20/2021. (rjs)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER: Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s #453 Motion in Limine to Exclude Failure to Warn Evidence and Arguments is DENIED. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/20/2021. (rjs)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER: Plaintiff's #447 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Defense Argument, or Reference to Witnesses' Private Matters is GRANTED. The following categories of evidence are excluded and should not be presented at trial: (1) marriages, divorces, or other marital issues; (2) living arrangements before or after the wreck; (3) litigation in which the witness was a party; (4) evidence of domestic disputes or incidents; and (5) evidence of arrests, charges, or misdemeanor convictions. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/20/2021. (rjs)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER: Plaintiff's #446 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Defense Argument, or Reference to a Supposed Lack of Injury in Other Similar Collisions is DENIED without prejudice to reasserting by objection, appropriate motion, or closing argument at trial. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/20/2021. (rjs)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER: Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s #424 Motion to Permit Expert Testimony is GRANTED with instruction. Dr. Van Arsdell may offer Opinions 4 and 7 at trial. As to Opinion 7, Defense Counsel shall instruct Dr. Van Arsdell to not use the word "prototypical." Dr. Van Arsdell may only use the words "typical" or "typically" when testifying about Opinion 7. Upon motion and in the interest of caution, the Court will permit Plaintiff to schedule a meeting or conduct a second pretrial deposition of Dr. Van Arsdell at Defendant's expense. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/20/2021. (rjs)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 488 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE setting Trial: Bench Trial to begin 3/8/2021 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 487 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Status conference held via Zoom regarding the upcoming November 2, 2020 trial date. The Court heard from counsel. In light of ongoing Covid-19 pandemic, the Court ORDERED that trial in this matter is CONTINUED until a date in 2021, to be determined. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(rjs)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING : Status Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 09:30 AM via Zoom before Judge Steve C. Jones. Connection Instructions: Time: Oct 8, 2020 09:30 AM Eastern Time (US and Canada) Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619817909 Meeting ID: 161 981 7909 Passcode: 619448 One tap mobile +16692545252,,1619817909#,,,,,,0#,,619448# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1619817909#,,,,,,0#,,619448# US (New York) Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) Meeting ID: 161 981 7909 Passcode: 619448 Find your local number: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/aeEMXf4ui7 Join by SIP 1619817909@sip.zoomgov.com Join by H.323 161.199.138.10 (US West) 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 161 981 7909 Passcode: 619448 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (pdw)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER: Plaintiff's #437 Motion for Unified Trial is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/7/2020. (rjs)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 485 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment C (Plaintiff's Outline of the Case), #2 Attachment D (Defendant's Outline of the Case), #3 Attachment E (Stipulated Facts), #4 Attachment E at Doc No 477 (Additional Stipulations), #5 Attachment E at Doc No 481 (Additional Stipulations), #6 Attachment F-1 (Plaintiff's Witness List), #7 Attachment F-2 (Defendant's Witness List), #8 Attachment G-1 (Plaintiff's Exhibit List), #9 Attachment G-2 (R) (Defendant's Exhibit List), #10 Attachment H at Doc No 450 (Plaintiff's Trial Brief), #11 Attachment H at Doc No 466 (Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Trial Brief) (1), #12 Attachment H at Doc No 468 (Plaintiff's Corrected Trial Brief), #13 Attachment H at Doc No 472 (Plaintiff's Reply - Trial Brief), #14 Attachment H-1 (Plaintiff's Trial Briefs), #15 Attachment H-2 (Defendant's Trial Brief))(rjs)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER: Upon further review, the Court is reconsidering going forward with the November 2, 2020 bench trial. A Zoom call will be scheduled in the near future for the attorneys of record to discuss this matter with the Court. Ordered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/7/2020 and entered as directed by Chambers. (rjs)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER granting #483 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on 11/2/2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/6/2020. (rjs)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Weeks, Rory)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER re #444 Status Conference: As a follow up to the July 27, 2020 Status Conference, the parties are hereby notified the bench trial will proceed in Open Court on November 2, 2020 in Courtroom 1907. Pretrial Order to follow. Ordered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/6/2020 and entered as directed by Chambers. (rjs)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 482 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 481 STIPULATION Facts Stipulated by the Parties by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Butler, James)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 480 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting #478 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for trial stipulations shall be Monday, September 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/1/2020. (rjs)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 478 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Trial Stipulations with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 477 STIPULATION Facts Stipulated by the Parties by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Butler, James)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Submission of #447 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Defense Argument, or Reference to Witnesses' Private Matters, #455 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Autoliv, Inc.'s Financial Condition, #456 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Turtle Evidence, #448 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence about the "Severity" or "Rarity" of Frontal Collisions, #454 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Arguments Regarding Discovery Issues, #446 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Defense Argument, or Reference to a Supposed Lack of Injury in Other Similar Collisions, #453 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Failure to Warn Evidence and Arguments, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 476 REPLY BRIEF re #456 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Turtle Evidence filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 475 REPLY BRIEF re #455 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Autoliv, Inc.'s Financial Condition filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 474 REPLY BRIEF re #454 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Arguments Regarding Discovery Issues filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 473 REPLY BRIEF re #453 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Failure to Warn Evidence and Arguments filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 472 RESPONSE re #449 Trial Brief, #466 Response (Non-Motion) on the Full Value of Micah Andrews' Life filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 471 REPLY to Response to Motion re #448 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence about the "Severity" or "Rarity" of Frontal Collisions filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 470 REPLY to Response to Motion re #447 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Defense Argument, or Reference to Witnesses' Private Matters filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 469 REPLY to Response to Motion re #446 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Defense Argument, or Reference to a Supposed Lack of Injury in Other Similar Collisions filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 468 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Trial Brief on the Full Value of Micah Andrews' Life re #449 Trial Brief by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Corrected Trial Brief on the Full Value of Micah Andrews' Life)(Butler, James) Modified on 8/31/2020 (rjs).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting #445 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for trial stipulations shall be Monday, August 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/20/2020. (rjs)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Submission of #445 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Trial Stipulations to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 466 RESPONSE re #449 Trial Brief, on the Full Value of Micah Andrews' Life filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 465 RESPONSE re #448 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence about the "Severity" or "Rarity" of Frontal Collisions filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Caruso Deposition)(Repko, William)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 464 RESPONSE re #447 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Defense Argument, or Reference to Witnesses' Private Matters filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 463 RESPONSE re #446 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Defense Argument, or Reference to a Supposed Lack of Injury in Other Similar Collisions filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mazda Interrogatory Response)(Repko, William)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 462 RESPONSE re #456 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Turtle Evidence filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PX 46 - Cobb County 911 Call Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - PX 96 - Cobb County PD Report - Excerpt, #3 Exhibit C - PX 92 - Kennestone Hospital Records - Excerpt, #4 Exhibit D - PX 258 - Buchner - Scene Diagram)(Butler, James)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 461 RESPONSE re #453 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Failure to Warn Evidence and Arguments filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 460 RESPONSE re #454 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Arguments Regarding Discovery Issues filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 459 RESPONSE re #455 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Autoliv, Inc.'s Financial Condition filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 458 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER granting #452 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/3/2020. (rjs)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 456 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Turtle Evidence with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lyons Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rogers Deposition)(Repko, William)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 455 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Autoliv, Inc.'s Financial Condition with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Arguments Regarding Discovery Issues with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Failure to Warn Evidence and Arguments with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #451 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Butler, James)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 451 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #450 Trial Brief, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit E - PX 72-74 - Design Drawings, #3 Exhibit F - DX 7 - Design Drawing)(Butler, James) Modified on 8/3/2020 (rjs).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 TRIAL BRIEF on the Admissibility of Wealth of Autoliv, Inc. by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Autoliv.jp website, #2 Exhibit B - Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Autoliv 2017 Annual Report, #4 Exhibit D - Autoliv 10-K, #5 Exhibit E - PX 72-74 - Design Drawings, #6 Exhibit F - DX 7 - Design Drawing)(Butler, James)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Corrected Trial Brief found at Doc. #468 TRIAL BRIEF on the Full Value of Micah Andrews' Life by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Madere v Schnitzer Southeast - Verdict, #2 Exhibit B - Walden v Chrylser - Verdict, #3 Exhibit C - Holland v Cypress - Judgment, #4 Exhibit D - Blackwell v Classic Millwork - Amend Final Judgment)(Butler, James) Modified on 9/28/2020 (rjs).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence about the "Severity" or "Rarity" of Frontal Collisions with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Front Cumulative Delta-V, #2 Exhibit B - Collective Orders)(Butler, James)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 447 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Defense Argument, or Reference to Witnesses' Private Matters with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 446 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Defense Argument, or Reference to a Supposed Lack of Injury in Other Similar Collisions with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015-10-21 Autoliv's 2nd Supp Resp to Plf's Rogs - Excerpt)(Butler, James)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Trial Stipulations with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Butler, James)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Status conference held at direction of the Court regarding pending November trial date in light of the ongoing Covid-19 crisis. The Court will make a final decision in late September as to whether or not the trial can proceed. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(rjs)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING : Status Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 03:30 PM in No Courtroom before Judge Steve C. Jones. Connection Instructions: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1602627588 Meeting ID: 160 262 7588 Password: 445072 One tap mobile +16692545252,,1602627588#,,,,0#,,445072# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1602627588#,,,,0#,,445072# US (New York) Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) Meeting ID: 160 262 7588 Password: 445072 Find your local number: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/abTNBGaMF0 Join by SIP 1602627588@sip.zoomgov.com Join by H.323 161.199.138.10 (US West) 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 160 262 7588 Password: 445072 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (pdw)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 443 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (rvb) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Submission of #437 MOTION for a Unified Trial to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 441 REPLY BRIEF re #437 MOTION for a Unified Trial filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cooper - DE 181, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cooper - DE 172, #3 Exhibit 3 - Elzubier - DE 82, #4 Exhibit 4 - McSweeney - DE 395-1, #5 Exhibit 5 - McSweeney - DE 395, #6 Exhibit 6 - Long - DE 212)(Weeks, Rory)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 RESPONSE re #437 MOTION for a Unified Trial filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to terminate the following individuals/entities as named defendants: Autoliv LLC and John Does 15. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to terminate Ford Motor Company as a Movant and Michael Sullivan as a Special Master. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/14/2020. (rjs)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 MOTION for a Unified Trial with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Weeks, Rory) Modified on 5/14/2020 (rjs).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Pretrial Conference held on 5/13/2020 via Zoom. This matter will proceed to bench trial on November 2, 2020. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(rjs)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 NOTICE Of Filing Second Amendment to Consolidated Pretrial Order by Autoliv Japan, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Attachment G-2 (R))(Repko, William)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Repko, William)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 433 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Twelfth Supplemental Response to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and Plaintiff's Thirteenth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan,Ltd.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Weeks, Rory)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Submission of #424 MOTION to Permit Expert Testimony to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 REPLY BRIEF re #424 MOTION to Permit Expert Testimony filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Repko, William)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER re #429 Plaintiff's Counsel's May 6, 2020 letter to the Court. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/7/2020. (rjs)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Twelfth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan,Ltd.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 429 NOTICE of Letter regarding Pretrial Hearing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #421 Order (Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 5/7/2020 (rjs).
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Court's NOTICE re #421 Order: the pretrial conference set in this matter for 5/13/2020 at 10:00 AM will be conducted via Zoom videoconference. The Court's staff will issue an invitation with login directions directly to counsel. (pdw)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 RESPONSE re #424 MOTION to Permit Expert Testimony filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Van Arsdell Invoices)(Cannella, Tedra)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting #410 Motion for Clarification. To the extent that Plaintiff's motion is also a request for additional time to file evidence of attorney's fees in response to the Court's September 10, 2019 order, the #410 motion is GRANTED for good cause shown. Plaintiff, through Counsel, shall comply with the Court's order to file evidence within THIRTY DAYS of the final day/adjournment of the bench trial. To the extent that Plaintiff's motion is actually a motion for reconsideration, said request is DENIED as nothing persuades the Court to retreat from its prior decision to impose the sanction of an award of attorney's fees against Defendant for its discovery conduct. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/4/2020. (rjs)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Repko, William)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MOTION to Permit Expert Testimony with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Van Arsdell Supplemental Report)(Repko, William)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (mmc) (ADI)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/16/2020. (rvb)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 3/12/2020. (rjs)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER: The Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of William Van Arsdell under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and Daubert (Doc. No. #360 ) is DENIED IN PART (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) AND GRANTED IN PART in accordance with the rulings herein. Certain rulings are also DEFERRED until trial. The Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Elizabeth Raphael under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and Daubert (Doc. No. #362 ) is DENIED IN PART, GRANTED IN PART, AND DEEMED MOOT IN PART in accordance with the rulings herein. Certain rulings are also DEFERRED until trial. The Motion to Exclude the Alternative Design Opinion of Steven Meyer (Doc. No. #363 ) is DENIED. The Motion to Exclude the Supplemental Opinions of Steven Meyer (Doc. No. [ 364]) is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART in accordance with the rulings herein. The Motion to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Chris Caruso (Doc. No. #365 ) is DENIED in accordance with the rulings herein. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 3/11/2020. (rjs)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 14-21, 2020 and June 1-12, 2020, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 NOTICE by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #416 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Notice of Filing Letter Regarding Prior Request for Leave of Absence by Plaintiff (Butler, James)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 NOTICE Of Filing Letter Regarding Prior Request for Leave of Absence by Autoliv Japan, Ltd. (Repko, William)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting James Edward Butler, Jr.'s #408 Petition for Leave of Absence for January 20, 2020 through February 21, 2020, and February 24, 2020 through April 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/30/20. (jkl)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 415 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 6-24, 2020, by Douglas G. Scribner. (Scribner, Douglas)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #410 MOTION for Clarification to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 414 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Compliance with Court Order by Autoliv Japan, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Kishimoto Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Prentkowski Declaration)(Repko, William)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 413 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Repko, William)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 412 REPLY to Response to Motion re #410 MOTION for Clarification filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Cannella, Tedra)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 411 RESPONSE re #410 MOTION for Clarification filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 410 MOTION for Clarification by Jamie Lee Andrews. (rjs)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 RESPONSE re #407 Order filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James) Modified on 9/23/2019 (rjs).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): January 20, 2020 through February 21, 2020, and February 24, 2020 through April 3, 2020, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Butler, James) Modified on 9/16/2019 to change event type to MOTION (rjs).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER: Plaintiff's #343 Motion for Sanctions is GRANTED. The Court imposes upon Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd., the sanction of payment of Plaintiff's reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, caused by the Defendant's failure to timely produce the discovery documents at issue. Plaintiff shall file evidence of her attorney's fees expended (to include the fees incurred in seeking sanctions, the summary judgment briefing, and the Eleventh Circuit appeal) within TEN DAYS of the issuance of this Order. Defendant Autoliv is ORDERED to perform a thorough search for the 80 documents referenced in Plaintiff's Hearing Exhibit 1107 as not produced by Defendant. It is further ORDERED that within THIRTY DAYS of the entry of this Order, Defendant shall provide an affidavit of a corporate representative averring to the results of said search. In addition, any found documents shall be immediately produced to Plaintiff's Counsel.23 Lastly, to address Plaintiff's concerns regarding the difference in production in the Stegall and this case, the Court ORDERS that all production in Stegall (post-November 2018) shall also be produced to Plaintiff in the case sub judice within THIRTY DAYS of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/10/2019. (rjs)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Telephone Conference held on 8/30/2019. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(rjs)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's May 17, 2019 Letter to the Court, #2 Autoliv's May 20, 2019 Letter to the Court)(Weeks, Rory)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER: The Court ORDERS the parties to immediately file Plaintiff's May 17, 2019 letter correspondence to the Court (without exhibits) and Defendant's May 20, 2019 responsive letter correspondence via CM/ECF entry/category, "Notice of Filing." Ordered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/2/2019 and entered as directed by Chambers. (rjs)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 404 TRANSCRIPT of the Motions Hearing Proceedings held on May 16, 2019, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber David A. Ritchie. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re #402 Exhibit List - entry modified to add corrected Plaintiff's Exhibit List. (pdw)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Defendants' Exhibit List from Motion Hearing #401 hearing 5/16/2019. (pdw)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 402 Plaintiff's Exhibit List from Motion Hearing #401 held 5/16/2019. (pdw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: #1 Corrected Plaintiff's Exhibit LIst) (pdw).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 4-22, 2019, by Douglas G. Scribner. (Scribner, Douglas)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2019 re #362 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Elizabeth Raphael, #364 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Steven Meyer, #343 MOTION for Sanctions, #365 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Chris Caruso, #363 MOTION to Exclude Alternative Design Opinion of Steven Meyer, #360 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of William Van Arsdell. Oral argument heard. Plaintiffs' exhibits 1108, 320, 2, 1, 1074, 74, 40, 7, 53, 24, 22, 23, 25, 26, 10, 49, 126, 54, 1102, 1107, and 1101 admitted. Defendants' exhibits 1, 2, and 3 admitted. Matter taken under advisement by the Court, with order to follow. Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(pdw) Modified on 5/31/2019 to correct hearing date(pdw).
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER granting #398 Motion to allow Plaintiffs' counsel (James Butler, Tedra L. Cannella, Rory Weeks, Gregory Feagle, and William Ballard) to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment into Courtroom 1907 on 5/16/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/15/2019. (pdw)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weeks, Rory) Modified on 5/15/2019 to change MOTION type (rjs).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER re #371 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion in part as to Exhibits 3 and 5 to Plaintiff's Response. The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain Doc. No. [370-2] and [370-4] under seal. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to lift the seal as to Doc. Nos. #370 , [370-1], [370-3], and [370-5]. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/9/2019. (rjs)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER re #382 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Plaintiff's motion is DENIED as Defendant states in its response brief (Doc. No. #395 ) that it does not request for the exhibit at issue to be sealed. To this regard, the Clerk is DIRECTED to lift the provisional seal on Doc. No. #381 . Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/9/2019. (rjs)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #382 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #381 Reply Brief to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 RESPONSE re #382 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #381 Reply Brief filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 RESPONSE re #371 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #370 Response to Motion, filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Court's Notice of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 NOTICE Of Public Filing Consistent with Order On Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal by Jamie Lee Andrews re #391 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,, #373 Response to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unsealed portions of Doc. 373-4)(Cannella, Tedra)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER granting in part #374 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain Doc. No. [373-2] and [373-3] under seal. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to lift the seal as to Doc. Nos. #373 and [373-1]. As Defendant does not request that certain portions of Exhibit 4 be sealed (Doc. No. #386 , p. 3, n.1), Plaintiff is ORDERED to re-file the following portions of Exhibit 4 on the public docket: Bates numbers AUTOLIV3330-32, 3502-05, 3506-09, and ALIV3601. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/8/2019. (rjs)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER: The Court's March 27, 2019 order at (Doc. No. #377 ) granting the motion to seal (at Doc. No. #371 is VACATED to allow Defendant an opportunity to respond and provide good cause for the sealing of the document at issue. Defendant shall file a response to the motion at Doc. No. #371 within FOURTEEN DAYS of the issuance of the Court. The Clerk shall reopen the motion at Doc. No. #371 . The Clerk is further DIRECTED to maintain the documents at issue (in Doc. No. #370 ) under a provisional seal under further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/8/2019. (rjs)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting in part #352 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain Doc. No. [351-2] under seal. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to lift the seal as to Doc. Nos. #351 , [351-1]. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/8/2019. (rjs)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER granting in part #345 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain Doc. Nos. [344-1], [344-2], and [344-6] under seal. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to lift the seal as to Doc. Nos. #344 , [344-3], [344-4], [344-5], [344-7], [344-8], [344-9]. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/8/2019. (rjs)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting in part #342 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain Doc. Nos. [341-3], [341-4], and [341-5] under seal. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to lift the seal as to Doc. Nos. #341 , [341--1], and [341-2]. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/8/2019. (rjs)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #364 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Steven Meyer, #365 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Chris Caruso, #362 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Elizabeth Raphael, #360 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of William Van Arsdell, #363 MOTION to Exclude Alternative Design Opinion of Steven Meyer to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 RESPONSE re #374 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #373 Response to Motion, filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 385 REPLY BRIEF re #365 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Chris Caruso filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 384 REPLY BRIEF re #364 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Steven Meyer filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 383 REPLY BRIEF re #363 MOTION to Exclude Alternative Design Opinion of Steven Meyer filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Meyer CV, #2 Exhibit 2- Ziejewski CV)(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #381 Reply Brief with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannella, Tedra)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Notice of Filing re #360 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of William Van Arsdell filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 5/9/2019 to unseal per Order on 5/9/2019 (rjs). Modified on 3/5/2020 (rjs).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 REPLY BRIEF re #360 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of William Van Arsdell filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cannella, Tedra)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 REPLY BRIEF re #362 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Elizabeth Raphael filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cannella, Tedra)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 1-7, 2019, by Douglas G. Scribner. (Scribner, Douglas)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 VACATED PER ORDER AT #90 ORDER granting #371 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 3/27/2019. (rjs) Modified on 4/8/2019 (rjs).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 RESPONSE in Opposition re #362 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Elizabeth Raphael filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Repko, William)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 RESPONSE in Opposition re #360 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of William Van Arsdell filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Repko, William)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #373 Response to Motion, with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannella, Tedra)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits in Support of #372 Response filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2SEALED Exhibit 3, #3 SEALED Exhibit 4)(Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 4/8/2019 (rjs). Modified on 3/4/2020 (rjs).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 RESPONSE re #365 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Chris Caruso filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Cannella, Tedra)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 371 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #370 Response to Motion, with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannella, Tedra)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Notice of Filing Exhibits re #364 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Steven Meyer filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 SEALED Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 SEALED Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6)(Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 3/27/2019 (rjs). Modified on 4/8/2019 (rjs). Modified on 5/9/2019 (rjs). Modified on 3/5/2020 (rjs).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 RESPONSE re #364 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Steven Meyer filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Cannella, Tedra)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 RESPONSE re #363 MOTION to Exclude Alternative Design Opinion of Steven Meyer filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Cannella, Tedra)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the foregoing Consent Amendment to the Consolidated Pretrial Order is authorized by the Court. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 3/15/2019. (rjs)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 NOTICE Of Filing of Consent Amendment to Consolidated Pretrial Order by Autoliv Japan, Ltd. re #358 Proposed Pretrial Order,, (Repko, William)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #354 Motion for Hearing. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 3/14/2019. (pdw)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #364 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Steven Meyer, #343 MOTION for Sanctions , #365 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Chris Caruso, #362 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Elizabeth Raphael, #360 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of William Van Arsdell, and #363 MOTION to Exclude Alternative Design Opinion of Steven Meyer. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Chris Caruso with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Repko, William)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Opinions of Steven Meyer with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Repko, William)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MOTION to Exclude Alternative Design Opinion of Steven Meyer with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Repko, William)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Elizabeth Raphael with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Butler, James)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 DEPOSITION of Elizabeth Raphael by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Elizabeth Raphael, M.D. taken November 15, 2018)(Butler, James) Modified on 3/11/2019 to edit text (rjs).
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of William Van Arsdell with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Butler, James)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 DEPOSITION of Maruisz Ziejewski taken on October 12, 2018 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Proposed Pretrial Order by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment C, #3 Attachment D, #4 Attachment E, #5 Attachment E-1, #6 Attachment E-2, #7 Attachment F-1, #8 Attachment F-2, #9 Attachment G-1, #10 Attachment G-2, #11 Attachment H-1, #12 Attachment H-2, #13 Attachment I-1, #14 Attachment I-2)(Butler, James)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #354 MOTION for Hearing re #343 MOTION for Sanctions to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #352 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #351 Notice of Filing to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE regarding Plaintiffs Eleventh Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and Plaintiffs Eleventh Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Weeks, Rory)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 RESPONSE re #352 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #351 Notice of Filing, filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 RESPONSE in Opposition re #354 MOTION for Hearing re #343 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Repko, William)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MOTION for Hearing re #343 MOTION for Sanctions with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Butler, James)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 17 through March 24, 2019, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #345 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #344 Notice of Filing , #343 MOTION for Sanctions , #342 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #341 Deposition to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #351 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, James)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #350 Reply Brief, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 SEALED Exhibit 7)(Butler, James) Modified on 4/8/2019 (rjs).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 REPLY BRIEF re #343 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit List)(Butler, James)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 RESPONSE in Opposition re #343 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Repko, William)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 RESPONSE re #345 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #344 Notice of Filing,, filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 RESPONSE re #342 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #341 Deposition, Yuji Kamei filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Remark: 1 thumb drive received re #346 Notice of Manual Filing. (rjs)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE Of Manual Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (rjs)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #344 Notice of Filing,, with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Butler, James)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #343 MOTION for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 SEALED Exhibit Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #6SEALED Exhibit Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Butler, James) Modified on 4/8/2019 (rjs).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MOTION for Sanctions with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit List)(Butler, James)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #341 Deposition, Yuji Kamei with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Butler, James)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 DEPOSITION of Yuji Kamei taken on December 20, 2018 by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 5, #3 SEALED Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 20, #4SEALED Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 35, #5SEALED Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 141)(Butler, James) Modified on 4/8/2019 (rjs).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 DEPOSITION of Yuji Kamei taken on December 20, 2018 by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 20, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 35, #9 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 43, #10 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 57, #11 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 58, #12 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 61, #13 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 117, #14 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 141, #15 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 209)(Butler, James)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting in part #333 Motion to Stay. The Court declines to impose an indefinite stay; however, the Court will extend the pretrial order filing deadline. To this regard, the Court's #322 scheduling order is AMENDED to provide that the deadline for filing the consolidated pretrial order is extended to March 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/14/2018. (rjs)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 338 REPLY BRIEF re #333 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pretrial Order Deadlines filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Cannella, Tedra)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 RESPONSE in Opposition re #333 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pretrial Order Deadlines filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Correspondence, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 336 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Repko, William)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Second Initial Disclosures by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Repko, William)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yuji Kamei filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pretrial Order Deadlines with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Cannella, Tedra)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 332 OBJECTION to Documents Requested in Plaintiff's #331 Amended Notice of Deposition of Elizabeth Raphael by Autoliv Japan, Ltd. (Repko, William) Modified on 11/14/2018 to edit text and add hyperlink (rjs).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Elizabeth Raphael filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Elizabeth Raphael filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting #327 Motion for Extension of Time and EXTENDS the deadline for Plaintiff to make her biomechanics expert available for a deposition to October12, 2018. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/10/18. (jpa)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 NOTICE by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Plaintiff's Objections to Documents Listed in Exhibit A to Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s Subpoena That Are to Be Produced At The Deposition of Dr. Mariusz Ziejewski (Cannella, Tedra)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Deposition of Plaintiff's Biomechanics Expert by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Repko, William)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 11-23, 2019, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 10, 2019 through March 17, 2019, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE regarding Plaintiffs Tenth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and Plaintiffs Tenth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Weeks, Rory)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Second Initial Disclosures by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment B: Expert List)(Weeks, Rory)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting #316 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (the Court has elected to adopted the dates as proposed by Defendant, except as herein modified). The deadline for dispositive motions has passed. The pretrial order shall be filed no later than January 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/28/2018. (rjs)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #317 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Deadline for the Parties' Proposed Pretrial Order. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/28/2018. (pdw)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 NOTICE of Appearance by William Joseph Repko, III on behalf of Autoliv Japan, Ltd. (Repko, William)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 RESPONSE re #316 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit 2- E-Mail Correspondence Between Parties Related to Pre-Trial Issues, #3 Exhibit 3- Letter from J. Butler dated August 2, 2018, #4 Exhibit 4- Letter from D. Scribner dated August 10, 2018, #5 Exhibit 5- Letter from J. Butler dated August 15, 2018, #6 Exhibit 6- Order in Hill v. Ford, #7 Exhibit 7- February 1, 2016 Report of W. Van Arsdell, #8 Exhibit 8- E-mail Correspondence Regarding Airbag Testing)(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 REPLY BRIEF re #317 Emergency MOTION to Stay Deadline for the Parties' Proposed Pretrial Order with proposed Order filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cannella, Tedra)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 RESPONSE re #317 Emergency MOTION to Stay Deadline for the Parties' Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Emergency MOTION to Stay Deadline for the Parties' Proposed Pretrial Order with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Cannella, Tedra)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER re Plaintiffs' #317 Emergency MOTION to Stay Deadline for the Parties' Proposed Pretrial Order and Plaintiffs' #316 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. Defendant is directed to file its response(s) to Plaintiffs' motions no later than Tuesday, August 28, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/22/2018. (pdw)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Cannella, Tedra)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Clerk's Remittitur Notice re #314 USCA Mandate to parties. (ddm)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER making the USCA mandate the judgment of this Court re #285 Notice of Appeal, USCA Appeal Number 17-10622-EE. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/1/18. (ddm)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER: The parties shall file a consolidated proposed pretrial order within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/1/2018. (pdw)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Orinda D. Evans no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:14-cv-03432-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 7/31/18. (bnw)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Submission of #312 USCA Mandate to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (bnw)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 312 JUDGMENT of USCA affirming in part, reversing part and remanding to the District Court for further action re: #285 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 17-10622-EE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Mandate Order)(ddm)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Submission of #1 Notice of Removal to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bnw)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Orinda D. Evans. Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:14-cv-3432-ODE. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (ddm)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Submission of #312 USCA Judgment and Proposed Mandate Order, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ddm)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 16, 2018 through July 30, 2018, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 2, 2018 to April 6, 2018, May 23, 2018 to June 6, 2018, June 15, 2018 to June 25, 2018, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 309 USCA Opinion received (AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART AND REMANDED) re: #285 Notice of Appeal filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. In accordance with FRAP 41(b), the USCA mandate will issue at a later date. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 17-10622-EE. (kac)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 308 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered awarding defendant Autoliv attorneys' fees in the amount of $16,895.88. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 307 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses of Litigation #276 . Autoliv's Motion is GRANTED with respect to the fees it seeks for legal services provided from June 24, 2016 through January 10, 2017. Autoliv's Motion is DENIED with respect to the fees it seeks for legal services provided from May 25, 2016 through June 24, 2016. Autoliv is thus awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $16,895.88. Plaintiff Jamie Lee Andrews' Motion for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Autolivs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses of Litigation #295 is granted. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 7/28/17. (ddm)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re: #306 Appeal Record Returned. (kac)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT of the Attorney's Fee Hearing Proceedings held on July 26, 2017, before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Nicholas A. Marrone, Telephone number 404-215-1486. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERRORAppeal Record Returned re: #285 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 16-10490-DD. (1 Envelope of Exhibits w/ pldg no. 76) (kac) Modified on 7/27/2017 (kac).
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Hearing held on Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses of Litigation #276 . Defendant presented witness: Douglas Scribner. Defendant's Exhibits A, B, C, and D ( #301 ) were discussed. Defendant's Exhibits A, B, C, and D ( #301 ) and Plaintiff's Exhibits A, B, C, D, E, F, G, H, and I ( #303 ) were admitted into evidence. The exhibits were not tendered at the hearing and the Court relies on the copies filed on the docket. The Court took the Motion under consideration and a written order is to follow. (Court Reporter Nicholas A. Marrone)(ddm)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Plaintiff's Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Cannella, Tedra)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Plaintiff's Witness List (Cannella, Tedra)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Exhibit List For Hearing on Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Autoliv Japan, Ltd... (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Witness List by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff Jamie Lee Andrews' Motion to Review Clerks Taxation of Costs against Jamie Andrews #288 . The following costs, in the aggregate amount of $1,512.85, are disallowed: (1) $572.35 in realtime and equipment rental costs in the November 23, 2015, invoice; (2) $378.00 for the rough draft of Dr. Van Arsdell's deposition; and (3) $562.50 in technical services performed by Ricoh. Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED AS MOOT with respect to costs associated with transcripts of deposition other than Dr. Van Arsdell's. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 6/29/17. (ddm)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF HEARING (by docket entry only). A Hearing is set on Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s #276 Motion for Attorney Fees for 7/26/2017 at 2:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. (bgt)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 CORRECTED Certified copy of ORDER of USCA GRANTING Defendant-Appellee's, Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Unopposed Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal re: #285 Notice of Appeal filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. The record as supplemented, together with the second amended complaint and the notice of removal, establish that the district court had diversity-based subject matter jurisdiction over this case in the first instance. The record is deemed so supplemented. Therefore, the appeal MAY PROCEED. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 17-10622-EE. (kac)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Certified copy of ORDER of USCA GRANTING Defendant-Appellee's, Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Unopposed Motion to Supplement the Record re: #285 Notice of Appeal filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 17-10622-EE. (kac)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Submission of #295 MOTION to file a surreply in Opposition to #276 MOTION for Attorney Fees, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #285 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 17-10622-EE. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (kac)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Submission of #284 MOTION for Hearing re #282 Response in Opposition to Motion, #288 MOTION Review Taxation of Costs #277 Bill of Costs, #280 Costs Taxed , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 REPLY to Response to Motion re #288 MOTION Review Taxation of Costs #277 Bill of Costs, #280 Costs Taxed filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Cannella, Tedra)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MOTION to file a surreply #282 Response in Opposition to Motion, #276 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #290 Reply Brief by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Surreply)(Cannella, Tedra)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #285 Notice of Appeal,. (Cannella, Tedra)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Submission of #276 MOTION for Attorney Fees , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Electronic Certification of the Record on Appeal due date deadline re: #294 Transcript Order Form. Electronic Certification due on 3/8/2017. (All necessary transcript(s) on file.)(kac)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Declaration of Jenny Mendelsohn re #288 MOTION Review Taxation of Costs #277 Bill of Costs, #280 Costs Taxed filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letter from Ricoh)(Mendelsohn, Jenny) Modified on 2/21/2017 to edit event text (rjs).
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 RESPONSE in Opposition re #288 MOTION Review Taxation of Costs #277 Bill of Costs, #280 Costs Taxed filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 RESPONSE re #284 MOTION for Hearing re #282 Response in Opposition to Motion, Motion for a Hearing on Autoliv's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses of Litigation filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 REPLY BRIEF re #276 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 USCA Acknowledgment of #285 Notice of Appeal filed by Jamie Lee Andrews. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 17-10622-E. (kac)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MOTION Review Taxation of Costs #277 Bill of Costs, #280 Costs Taxed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Cannella, Tedra)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Clerk's Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #285 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE Of Filing Appeal Transmission Letter by Jamie Lee Andrews (as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews (as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re: #285 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #275 Clerk's Judgment, #274 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-6962621. Transcript Order Form due on 2/22/2017 (Cannella, Tedra)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MOTION for Hearing re #282 Response in Opposition to Motion, Motion for a Hearing on Autoliv's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses of Litigation by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Cannella, Tedra)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE Of Filing the affidavit of Jamie Andrews filed by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jamie Andrews)(Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 2/8/2017 to edit docket text (ddm).
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Daily Report Article, #2 Exhibit B - May 25 - Jun 25 Billing, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Jamie Andrews)(Cannella, Tedra)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Deposition of Michael Daniels, Ph.D. taken on November 23, 2015 (Attachments: #1 11-23-2015 Depo Trans of M. Daniels)(Cannella, Tedra)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 18,196.64 against Plaintiff, Jamie Lee Andrews. (ddm)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #276 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Doug Scribner filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Bills for Services Rendered)(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting Plaintiff's #278 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to Autoliv's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses of Litigation #276 . Plaintiff shall respond to Autoliv's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses of Litigation #276 within fourteen (14) days after the date on which Autotliv serves its detailed supporting documentation. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/24/2017. (bgt)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Autoliv's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses of Litigation re: #276 MOTION for Attorney Fees with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Cannella, Tedra)
January 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 BILL OF COSTS by Autoliv ASP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of D. Scribner, #2 Exhibit A to Scribner Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Scribner Declaration)(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
January 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MOTION for Attorney Fees with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A- Offer of Settlement, #3 Exhibit B- Rejection of Offer)(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd. against Plaintiff for costs. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment #224 and dismissing Defendants John Does 1-5. This action is dismissed. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/10/17. (ddm)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 17, 2017 to May 8, 2017, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting the #271 Consent Motion to Dismiss Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc. With Prejudice. Plaintiffs claims against Autoliv Japan, Ltd., and John Does 1-5 remain to be tried. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 7/7/06. (ddm)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc. With Prejudice by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broach, Ashley)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting Plaintiff's #270 Motion to Withdraw Robert D. Cheeley as Attorney. Attorney Robert David Cheeley terminated from the case. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 6/17/2016. (bgt)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION to Withdraw Robert David Cheeley as Attorneyby Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Cheeley, Robert)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #261 Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to modify the provisionally sealed docket entry for the Appendix of Excerpts to Autoliv Japan Ltd.'s Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment to reflect its permanently sealed status. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/12/2016. (bdb)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE of Settlement with Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc. by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Cannella, Tedra)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #245 Notice to Take Deposition (Weeks, Rory)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER/COMMISSION FOR DEPOSITIONS TO BE TAKEN IN JAPAN Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 6/1/2016. (anc)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #261 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #260 Notice of Filing , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (anc)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 STIPULATION Amended Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order/Commission for Depositions to be Taken in Japan by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Cannella, Tedra)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 FILED UNDER SEAL ORDER granting #255 Motion for Continued Protection. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 5/18/2016. (anc) (anc). Modified on 5/19/2016 (anc).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #221 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages and Damages Resulting from Conscious Pain and Suffering, #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (anc)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 CORRECTED RESPONSE re #248 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #247 Response in Opposition to Motion, #246 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny) Modified on 5/13/2016 in order to update docket text (anc).
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 REPLY BRIEF re #221 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages and Damages Resulting from Conscious Pain and Suffering Defendant Mazda Motor Corp. and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mazda Motor Corp. of America's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Facts, #2 Exhibit Mazda Motor Corp. of America's Supporting Excerpts to Their Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Facts, #3 Exhibit Part 1 of 3 to Supporting Excerpts etc., #4 Exhibit Part 2 of 3 to Supporting Excerpts etc., #5 Exhibit Part 3 of 3 to Supporting Excerpts)(Johnson, Myrece)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #260 Notice of Filing with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Appendix of Records Excerpts for Reply Brief by Autoliv Japan, Ltd. re #259 Reply Brief, (Mendelsohn, Jenny) Modified on 5/13/2016 - Documents received and forwarded to chambers (anc). Modified to permanently seal on 6/13/2016 (bdb).
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 REPLY BRIEF re #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1- Walden Complaint, #2 Statement of Material Facts Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Facts)(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 RESPONSE re #248 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #247 Response in Opposition to Motion, #246 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting #248 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 5/9/2016. (anc)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 FILED UNDER SEAL MOTION to Continue Protection of Information Submitted to the Court in Support of Plaintiff's Responses in Opposition To Motions for Summary Judgment with Incorporated Brief by Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation. (anc) (anc).
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE Of Manual Filing Under Seal of Motion to Continue Protection under Consent Protective Order in Support of Plaintiff's Responses in Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment with Incorporated Brief re #248 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #247 Response in Opposition to Motion, #246 Response in Opposition to Motion, , #247 Response in Opposition to Motion, #249 Notice of Filing,, #253 Notice of Filing, #252 Notice of Filing, #246 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation(Benjamin, Vonnetta) Modified on 5/6/2016 in order to update docket text (anc).
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #247 Response in Opposition to Motion, CORRECTED Appendix (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1, #2 Appendix Part 2)(Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 9/18/2016 (bgt).
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 252 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #246 Response in Opposition to Motion, CORRECTED Appendix (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1, #2 Appendix Part 2, #3 Appendix Part 3)(Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 9/18/2016 (bgt).
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 251 CD of Evidence received and placed in file re #250 Notice of Filing Electronic Media. (anc)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE Of Filing Electronic Media by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #247 Response in Opposition to Motion, #246 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 4/26/2016 in order to update docket text (anc).
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 249 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) re #248 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #247 Response in Opposition to Motion, #246 Response in Opposition to Motion, , #247 Response in Opposition to Motion, #246 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 9/18/2016 (bgt).
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #247 Response in Opposition to Motion, #246 Response in Opposition to Motion, with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannella, Tedra)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix Part 1, #4 Appendix Part 2)(Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 5/10/2016 in order to remove the word provisionally (anc).
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #221 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages and Damages Resulting from Conscious Pain and Suffering filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix Part 1, #4 Appendix Part 2, #5 Appendix Part 3)(Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 5/10/2016 in order to remove the word provisionally (anc).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) to Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc. filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR DEPOSITIONS TO BE TAKEN IN JAPAN Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 4/6/2016. (anc)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order/Commission for Depositions to be Taken in Japan by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Cannella, Tedra)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER. This action was referred to the undersigned for resolution of all pretrial discovery matters. The discovery period has now closed, and the Defendants have filed motions for summary judgment. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 4/1/2016. (dfb)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. (dfb)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 DEPOSITION of Lisa Gwin, M.D. taken on February 29, 2016 by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Kingsley, Daniel)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 DEPOSITION of Aaron J. Porter taken on June 26, 2015 by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Kingsley, Daniel)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 239 DEPOSITION of Neil Hanneman taken on 02/17/15 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 238 DEPOSITION of Steven Meyer taken on 12/03/15 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 DEPOSITION of David Prentkowski taken on 04/08/16 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 DEPOSITION of Eric Van Iderstine taken on 02/18/16 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 235 DEPOSITION of Gregory Stephens taken on 12-11-2015 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 DEPOSITION of Joseph Burton taken on 01/27/16 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 DEPOSITION of John Hinger taken on 02/24/16 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 DEPOSITION of William Van Arsdell taken on 02/11/16 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 DEPOSITION of Chris Caruso taken on 11/25/15 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 DEPOSITION of G. Bryant Buchner taken on 11/03/2015 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 DEPOSITION of William Kemp, II taken on 06-24-2015 by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 228 AFFIDAVIT of Hirokazu Hirabayashi by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 AFFIDAVIT of Osamu Yamashina by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE Of Filing Discovery Related to Motion for Summary Judgment by Autoliv Japan, Ltd. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Request to File Original Discovery Material by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Autoliv Japan, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Appendix Part 1 of 6 (Tabs 1 - 6B), #4 Appendix Part 2 of 6 (Tab 7A), #5 Appendix Part 3 of 6 (Tab 7B), #6 Appendix Part 4 of 6 (Tab 7C), #7 Appendix Part 5 of 6 (Tab 7D), #8 Appendix Part 6 of 6 (Tabs 7E-36))(Mendelsohn, Jenny) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Request to File Original Discovery Material by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE Of Filing Original Discovery Material by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Broach, Ashley)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages and Damages Resulting from Conscious Pain and Suffering with Brief In Support by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Appendix)(Broach, Ashley) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Douglas A. Nunan filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) to Autoliv Japan, Ltd. filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Amended Initial Disclosures by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Ninth Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Ninth Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Ninth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and Plaintiff's Ninth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Weeks, Rory)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Sixth Requests for Admission to Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc. by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
February 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Third NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Lisa Gwin filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Second NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Lisa Gwin filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Hinger filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Amended NOTICE to Take 30(b)(6) Deposition of Autoliv Japan, Ltd. filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Cannella, Tedra)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Will Van Arsdell filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 201 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER denying as moot #185 Motion for Protective Order. The hearing on the motion scheduled for January 26, 2016, is CANCELED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order on counsel for Ford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 12/28/2015. (anc)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Submission of #185 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash, submitted to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. (anc)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Michael R. Boorman and David A. Terry re #199 Order (anc)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #189 Certificate of Service, for Amended Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action [to Dr. Lisa Gwin] by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 RESPONSE re #185 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to Ford Motor Co. filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Weeks, Rory)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews (Cannella, Tedra)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Eighth Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Eighth Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Eighth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and Plaintiff's Eighth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Amended Initial Disclosures by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 13 through 30, 2016, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Dr. Lisa Gwin by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 7, 2015, before Judge Justin S. Anand. Court Reporter/Transcriber D Bull, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (dxj)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ford Motor Company (Counsel David Terry) re #186 Order. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (kdw)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER: The above-captioned action is before the Court on the #185 Motion for a Protective Order and/or to Quash (Motion for Protective Order) filed by non-party Ford Motor Company (Ford). The parties, including Ford, are ORDERED to appear before the undersigned for oral argument on the Motion for Protective Order on January 26, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1875, 18th Floor, United States Courthouse, Richard B. Russell Federal Building, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order on counsel for Ford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 12/11/15. (kdw)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION for Protective Order and/or MOTION to Quash with Brief In Support by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Terry, David) . Added MOTION to Quash on 12/11/2015 (anc).
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Rory Allen Weeks on behalf of Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Weeks, Rory)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand: Telephone Conference held on 12/7/2015. The Court held a telephone conference to discuss certain discovery disputes. The Court extended discovery through February 29, 2016, for the limited purpose of resolving the issues presented by Plaintiff at the conference, and explained on the record during the conference, relating to certain recently produced engineering specifications. (Court Reporter Debra Bull)(anc)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Responses to Plaintiff's Fifth (sic) Requests for Admission by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER for parties to participate in a teleconference with the Magistrate Judge Anand on Monday, December 7, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. The Court will notify all counsel by email of the call-in number before the teleconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 12/2/2015. (anc)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
November 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ford Motor Company Non Party Ford Motor Company's Objections to Plaintiffs' Subpoena to Ford Motor Company (Terry, David)
November 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ashcraft Terry on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Terry, David)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Fifth Requests for Admission to Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc. by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Amended Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action [to Will Van Arsdale] by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan DeAnn Bomar on behalf of Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Bomar, Susan)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): January 21, 2016-January 23, 2016, February 3, 2016-February 5, 2016, February 19, 2016-February 25, 2016, March 4, 2016-March 14, 2016, April 6, 2016-April 9, 2016, June 19, 2016-July 8, 2016, by C. Bradford Marsh. (Marsh, C.)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd. (Cannella, Tedra)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Michael Daniels by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Proof of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents on Volvo Cars of North America, LLC (Cannella, Tedra)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Proof of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents on Ford Motor Company (Cannella, Tedra)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition to Jim Bready, John Hinger and Will Van Arsdale by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Subpoena to Produce Documents to Ford Motor Company and Subpoena to Produce Documents to Volvo Cars of North America, LLC by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER that the Court DENIES Plaintiff's request for discovery as to internationally-marketed analogs of the Mazda3, such as the Axela; and GRANTS, in part, Plaintiff's request for additional limited discovery from Mazda and Autoliv, as to the 2004-2009 Ford Focus and Volvo S40. Because of the likelihood, based on Mazda's previous representations, that it lacks any new documents to produce, and because the documents that Autoliv is ordered to produce (if it has them) are very limited in volume and scope, and because of the December 31, 2015 discovery cut-off date, the Court sees no reason to allow more than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order for compliance with these orders. To the extent any Defendant has no documents to produce in response to this Order, that Defendant should inform Plaintiff forthwith and not wait until the end of the thirty-day period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 11/12/2015. (anc)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action to Gregory Stephens by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Plaintiff's Seventh Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Seventh Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Seventh Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and Plaintiff's Seventh Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Cannella, Tedra)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Kingsley on behalf of Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Kingsley, Daniel)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Sixth Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Sixth Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Sixth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, and Plaintiff's Sixth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Fifth Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Fifth Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Fifth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, and Plaintiff's Fifth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Third Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Autoliv Japan, Ltd..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service regarding Plaintiff's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and Plaintiff's Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Cannella, Tedra) Modified on 10/20/2015 (anc).
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference Proceedings held on October 15, 2015, before Judge Justin S. Anand. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judith M. Wolff, Telephone number 404-215-1317. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2015: #2 Corrected Transcript) (kac). Modified on 10/19/2015 (kac).
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re: #150 Transcript. Filed corrected transcript. (kac)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand: Telephone Conference held on 10/15/2015. The Court held a telephone conference to hear oral argument from the parties regarding discovery disputes. With respect to the dispute over the Yamashina Affidavit, the Court permitted Plaintiff to file a brief by October 16, 2015, with a response from the Mazda defendants due by October 30, and a reply from Plaintiff due November 6. With respect to the dispute over the Autoliv documents, the Court permitted Plaintiff to file a brief by October 20, 2015, with a response from the Autoliv defendants due October 30, 2015, and a reply from Plaintiff due November 6. (Court Reporter Judith Wolff)(anc)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 1) Plaintiffs Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.s First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff; 2) Plaintiffs Third Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff; 3) Plaintiffs Third Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and 4) Plaintiffs Third Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Cannella, Tedra)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 13, 2015 through March 4, 2016, by Myrece Rebecca Johnson. (Johnson, Myrece)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/26/15 (Motions Hrg), before Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number 404-215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (pjm)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): Sept. 28-30, Oct. 1-12, 2015, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James) Modified on 9/2/2015 in order to update docket text (anc).
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 16-26, 2015, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James) Modified on 8/27/2015 in order to update docket text (anc).
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #108 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc., Autoliv AB and Autoliv ASP, Inc. Autoliv, Inc., Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv AB, and Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc. are dismissed from this action without prejudice. The statutes of limitation and repose for claims against Autoliv, Inc., Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv AB, and Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc. will be tolled beginning from the date that Plaintiff initiated this action on September 18, 2014, and will remain tolled until the claims against Autoliv Japan, Ltd are resolved. The rights and claims of Plaintiff against any other Defendant in the above-captioned case will not be affected by the Court's Order. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/26/2015. (anc)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand: Discovery Hearing held on 8/26/2015 on #122 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART both (a) Plaintiff's requests for relief regarding alleged deficiencies in discovery and (b) the Motion for Extension. For reasons explained on the record, the Court granted the parties an extension of the discovery cut-off deadline until December 31, 2015, to allow for outstanding document and deposition discovery that has not been completed. As to the specific deficiencies in Defendants' document responses discussed in the hearing, the Court allowed for production of those materials to Plaintiff by no later than October 14, 2015. As the Court expressed at the hearing, this is a lengthy extension of already significantly extended dates. Therefore, no further extensions will be granted absent a significant showing of good cause and necessity. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(anc)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 AFFIDAVIT re #122 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Affidavit of Ann Mickow by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased). (Cannella, Tedra)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Amended Initial Disclosures by Mazda Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Broach, Ashley)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #131 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation, and Robert Bosch GmbH With Prejudice. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/25/2015. (anc)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation and Robert Bosch GmbH with Prejudice with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hobson, Tedra)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on August 7, 2015, before Judge Justin S. Anand. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth G. Cohn, Telephone number (404) 215-1573. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (egc)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Submission of #110 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, submitted to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. (anc)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand: taking under advisement #122 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Telephone Conference held on 8/7/2015 to discuss the issues raised in Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The parties agreed to continue to work on resolving discovery disputes, and the Court set a hearing on the motion for AUGUST 26, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1875, U.S. Courthouse, 75 Spring St., Atlanta, Georgia. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Cohn)(kdw)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Submission of #122 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , submitted to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. (adg)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Coporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Request for Productin of Documents to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER that counsel for all parties, and the Special Master Michael Anthony Sullivan, participate in a teleconference with Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 8/4/2015 at 1:30 PM. The Court will notify all counsel by emailof the call-in number before the teleconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 7/29/2015. (adg)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): Plaintiffs shall have until 8/14/15 to file a response re #110 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 7/27/15. (hfm)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jan. 5, 2015, 10:21 a.m. Mendelsohn Email, #2 Exhibit B - Mar. 25, 2015, 10:55 a.m. Mendelsohn Email, #3 Proposed Order)(Hobson, Tedra)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery of Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery of Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Fourth Requests for Admission to Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc. by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #118 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including July 30, 2015, to respond re #110 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 6/30/15. (hfm)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Motion to Dismiss re: #110 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Hobson, Tedra)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Submission of #110 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, submitted to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. (adg)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley) Modified on 6/15/2015 to remove all caps text (adg).
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CERTIFICATE of Counsel /Special Master Michael A. Sullivan Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 53(b)(3)(A) by Michael Anthony Sullivan on behalf of Michael A. Sullivan (Sullivan, Michael)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2)(Hobson, Tedra)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #113 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including June 9, 2015 to file a response re #110 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 5/28/15. (hfm)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Submission of #109 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #90 Amended Complaint,, , #108 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Without Prejudice of Autoliv, Inc., Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv AB, & Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (adg) Modified on 5/27/2015 (adg). Modified on 5/28/2015 (adg).
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Submission of #109 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #90 Amended Complaint,, , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. (adg) Modified on 5/28/2015 to correct judge information (hfm).
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Bosch Motion to Dismiss re: #110 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Hobson, Tedra)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc. of Discovery (Broach, Ashley)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff; Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Robert Bosch GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law)(Sullivan, Michael)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #90 Amended Complaint,, by Robert Bosch GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Benjamin, Vonnetta)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Without Prejudice of Autoliv, Inc., Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv AB, & Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc. with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Hobson, Tedra)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 2015, by Ashley Webber Broach. (Broach, Ashley)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 OPINION AND ORDER that Bosch Corporation's #27 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Bosch Corporation is DISMISSED from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's #38 Motion for Discovery Regarding Personal Jurisdiction is DENIED. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 4/22/2015. (anc)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 4/9/2015. (anc)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Consent MOTION for Order for Appointment of a Special Master with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews, Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc., Bosch Corporation, Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Hobson, Tedra)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ANSWER to #90 Amended Complaint by Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation.(Benjamin, Vonnetta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ANSWER to #90 Amended Complaint by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER that the parties are advised that, if a discovery dispute arises between the parties, counsel are required to contact the chambers of the undersigned by telephone jointly, with their adversary on the line, before filing a motion. If successive attempts to contact the adversary are unsuccessful, if the adversary refuses to contact the Court jointly, or if there is some other good cause for why a joint call could not be accomplished, the initiating party may send a letter, not to exceed two (2) pages, describing the discovery issue for which relief is sought and the reasons why no joint call was made. This letter must be copied on all adversaries. Motions to compel, motions for protective order, motions for sanctions or any other motion arising out of a dispute over any discovery matter should ordinarily not be filed without a prior conference with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand on 3/31/2015. (anc)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand for resolution of all pretrial discovery matters. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/30/2015. (anc)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Mazda Motor of America d/b/a Mazda North America Operations ANSWER to #90 Amended Complaint for Damages by Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Johnson, Myrece) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Mazda Motor Corporation's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #90 Amended Complaint for Damages by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Johnson, Myrece) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Myrece Rebecca Johnson on behalf of Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Johnson, Myrece)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Verification by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc., Bosch Corporation, John Does 1-5, Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation, filed by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery of Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery of Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #84 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/10/2015. (anc)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Consent MOTION for Protective Order with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews, Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc., Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Protective Order)(Hobson, Tedra)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery of Responses to Plaintiff's Second Requests for Admission by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE responses to Plaintiff's Second Requests for Admission by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE: (set by docket entry only) Teleconference set for 3/6/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. (hfm)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE For Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Robert Bosch LLC and Robert Bosch North America Corporation's Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Requests for Admission to Robert Bosch LLC and Robert Bosch North America Corporation by Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation.(Sullivan, Michael)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Robert Bosch LLC and Robert Bosch North America Corporation's Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admission to Robert Bosch LLC and Robert Bosch North America Corporation by Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation.(Sullivan, Michael)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Robert Bosch LLC and Robert Bosch North America Corporation's Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Robert Bosch LLC and Robert Bosch North America Corporation by Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation.(Sullivan, Michael)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Robert Bosch LLC and Robert Bosch North America Corporation's Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Robert Bosch LLC and Robert Bosch North America Corporation by Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation.(Sullivan, Michael)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION Setting Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Broach, Ashley)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery of Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admission by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Telephone Conference held held regarding discovery issues on 2/9/2015. (Court Reporter Nick Marrone)(anc)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT of the Teleconference Proceedings held on February 9, 2015, before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Nicholas A. Marrone, Telephone number 404-215-1486. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE (by docket entry only): Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. (hfm)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE Of Filing CD: Professional Seminar: Innovation for Profit: Realizing Invented for Life by Jamie Lee Andrews (CD placed in file) (anc)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 26, 2015 through June 9, 2015 and withdrawal of leave of absence for January 26-February 6, 2015 by Tedra Cannella Hobson. (Hobson, Tedra) Modified on 1/30/2015 in order to update docket text (anc).
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Second Requests for Admission to Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc.; Plaintiff's Second Requests for Admission to Defendants Autoliv, Inc., Autoliv, ASP, Inc., Autoliv AB, Autoliv Japan, Ltd., and Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc.; and Plaintiff's Second Requests for Admission to Robert Bosch LLC and Robert Bosch North America Corporation by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE (by docket entry only): Scheduling Hearing set for 2/9/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. (hfm)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) International Registered Mail Service on Robert Bosch GmbH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - International Registered Mail Service on Robert Bosch GmbH)(Hobson, Tedra)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Service on Bosch Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service Documents on Defendant Bosch Corporation)(Hobson, Tedra)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STATUS REPORT to the Court by Counsel for the Parties Regarding Scheduling Conference Held January 21, 2015 by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv LLC, Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc., Bosch Corporation, Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Butler, James)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Manual Filing re #64 Reply to Response to Motion by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Hobson, Tedra) Modified on 1/27/2015 in order to update docket text (anc).
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPLY to Response to #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction MOTION for Discovery Regarding Personal Jurisdiction and Response to #38 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - Corporate Strategy in Times of Globalization, #3 Exhibit B - "About Bosch in Japan", #4 Exhibit C - Professional Seminar: Innovation for Profit, #5 Exhibit D - Bosch Japan Facebook Page, #6 Exhibit E - "History" of Bosch Corporation)(Hobson, Tedra) Modified on 1/27/2015 in order to update docket text (anc).
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 23, 2015, through and including August 3, 2015 by Michael Joseph Sullivan. (Sullivan, Michael) Modified on 1/26/2015 in order to update docket text (anc).
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery -Subpoena to Woodstock Fire Department by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Cross NOTICE to Take Deposition filed by Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation (Sullivan, Michael)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING the parties request for an extension of time, through and including Monday, January 26, 2015, to file the status report regarding the detailed discovery plan. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/22/15. (hfm)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, and Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.'s First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE For Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, Request for Production and Requests for Admission to Autoliv, Inc., Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv AB, Autoliv Japan, Ltd., and Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc. by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE For Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, Request for Production and Requests for Admission to Robert Bosch LLC and Robert Bosch North America Corporation by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE For Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, Request for Production and Requests for Admission to Mazda Motor Corporation and Mazda Motor of America, Inc. by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 3, 2015 thur April 13, 2015, by William L. Ballard. (Ballard, William)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2/4/15 thru 2/6/15, 3/9/15 thru 3/16/15, 4/7/15 thru 4/10/15, 4/16/15 thru 4/17/15, 7/2/15 thru 7/17/15, by C. Bradford Marsh. (Marsh, C.)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Submission of #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (anc)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response to #27 Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; MOTION for Discovery Regarding Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bosch Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(hfm)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPLY to Response re #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Bosch Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Benjamin, Vonnetta) Modified on 1/12/2015 to edit document relationship and docket text to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (hfm).
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re #51 Filing. Multi-Part pleading, Reply and Response to separate motion events filed as one pleading. #51 edited to reflect reply to response re #27 Motion to Dismiss. Re-docketed at #52 to reflect Response re #38 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion for Discovery. (hfm)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 20, 2015 - August 5, 2015, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 23, 2015-April 10, 2015, by James Edward Butler, Jr. (Butler, James)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Submission of #38 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response to Motion to Dismiss re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction MOTION for Discovery Regarding Personal Jurisdiction, #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (anc)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 5, 2015, before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Nicholas A. Marrone, Telephone number 404-215-1486. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 1/5/2015. The parties are to provide a status report on the progress of a detailed discovery plan by January 23, 2015. (Court Reporter Nick Marrone)(anc)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Certificate of Service on Autoliv Japan, Ltd. by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service Documents on Defendant Autoliv Japan, Ltd.)(Hobson, Tedra) Modified on 12/30/2014 in order to update docket text (anc).
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. (hfm)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File a Response re: #38 MOTION for Extension of Time re #27 MOTION to Dismiss; MOTION for Discovery Regarding Personal Jurisdiction, by Bosch Corporation. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) Modified on 12/23/2014 to remove document relationship selected in error (hfm).
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including January 12, 2015 to file a response re #38 MOTION for Extension of Time; MOTION for Discovery Regarding Personal Jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 12/23/14. (hfm)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bosch Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Robert Bosch Investment Nederland B.V. for Bosch Corporation. (Sullivan, Michael)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery of First Requests for Production to Plaintiff by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery of First Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE Of Filing Service on Mazda Motor Corporation - Japan by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service Documents on Defendant Mazda Motor Corporation - Japan)(Hobson, Tedra)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Consent Joint Detailed Discovery Plan by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - 12/15/14 Emails, #3 Exhibit B - 10/10/14 Email, #4 Exhibit C - CARFAX Report, #5 Exhibit D - Bosch in Atlanta, #6 Exhibit E - About Bosch in Japan Automotive Aftermarket, #7 Exhibit F - About Bosch in Japan, #8 Exhibit G - Sixteen Days to Visit Six Bosch Projects on Three Continents, #9 Exhibit H - USDOT Calls for National Recall of Defective Takata Driver Side Air Bags, #10 Exhibit I - HAMACO Industries Corporation)(Hobson, Tedra)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response to Motion to Dismiss re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction , MOTION for Discovery Regarding Personal Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - 12/15/14 Emails, #3 Exhibit B - 10/10/14 Email, #4 Exhibit C - CARFAX Report, #5 Exhibit D - Bosch in Atlanta, #6 Exhibit E - About Bosch in Japan Automotive Aftermarket, #7 Exhibit F - About Bosch in Japan, #8 Exhibit G - Sixteen Days to Visit Six Bosch Projects on Three Continents, #9 Exhibit H - USDOT Calls for National Recall of Defective Takata Driver Side Air Bags, #10 Exhibit I - HAMACO Industries Corporation)(Hobson, Tedra)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE Of Filing Service on Autoliv AB, Sweden by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service Documents on Defendant Autoliv AB, Sweden)(Hobson, Tedra)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that Civil Action Group, d/b/a APS International, Ltd., including its designated agents, is appointed and authorized to effect service of process on the defendant, Robert Bosch GmbH in Germany. Service shall be effected according to any internationally agreed means, the laws of the foreign country, or as directed by the foreign authority or the originating court if not otherwise prohibited by international agreement or the laws of the foreign country, and in a manner reasonably calculated to give notice. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 12/5/2014. (anc)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER re #26 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The parties, having requested an extension of discovery beyond that designated by the Court's local rules, the Court extends the period for discovery, and discovery thus shall be completed on or before July 30, 2015. To assure that discovery will be completed within this extended period, the Court requires the parties to submit, on or before December 16, 2014, a detailed discovery plan in the form prescribed by paragraph 14 of the Court's Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation, which provides for the completion of all discovery, fact and expert, on or before July 30, 2015. The detailed discovery plan should include the date on which written discovery will be served, the persons and entities to be deposed and the date on which each deposition is scheduled to be conducted, the date on which experts will be designated and counter-designated and the dates on which each expert will be deposed. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 12/4/2014. (anc)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation.(Sullivan, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Order for Appointment of Special Process Server with Brief In Support by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hobson, Tedra)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
November 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Bosch Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A to the Brief)(Sullivan, Michael)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jamie Lee Andrews, Jamie Lee Andrews, Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc., John Does 1-5, Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation. (Hobson, Tedra)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Initial Disclosures by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Initial Disclosures by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Amended Initial Disclosures by Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation.(Benjamin, Vonnetta)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Initial Disclosures by Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation.(Benjamin, Vonnetta)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Initial Disclosures by Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Initial Disclosures by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert Bosch GmbH. (anc)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Summons - Bosch GmbH (Hobson, Tedra)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased).(Hobson, Tedra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): January 26, 2015 - February 6, 2015, by Tedra Cannella Hobson, Robert David Cheeley. (anc)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE Of Filing by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) Affidavit of Service of Process (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service of Process on Defendant Bosch Corporation)(Hobson, Tedra)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 22, 2014, through January 5, 2015 by Michael Joseph Sullivan. (Sullivan, Michael) Modified on 11/19/2014 in order to update docket text (anc).
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) for Leave of Absence for Robert D. Cheeley and Tedra C. Hobson for the following dates: January 26, 2015-February 6, 2015 (Hobson, Tedra)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit of Service of Process by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service of Process on Defendant Mazda Motor Corporation)(Hobson, Tedra)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit of Service of Process by Jamie Lee Andrews(as Administrator of the Estate of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased), Jamie Lee Andrews(as surviving spouse of Micah Lee Andrews, Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service of Process on Defendant Autoliv AB)(Hobson, Tedra) Modified text of exhibits on 11/3/2014 (dr).
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation.(Sullivan, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Robert Bosch North America Corporation, Corporate Parent Robert Bosch GmbH for Robert Bosch LLC, Robert Bosch North America Corporation. (Sullivan, Michael)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv LLC, Autoliv North America, Inc., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv LLC, Autoliv North America, Inc., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc..(Mendelsohn, Jenny) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM THE COURT (by docket entry only): Parties are advised to go to the district courts website at www.gand.uscourts.gov. On the home page, locate the Attorney Information link which will direct you to Preparation for a Civil and/or Criminal Trial Before Judge Duffey. Here, the Court has provided its Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigants. The Parties shall abide by this Standing Order throughout the processing of this case. Parties are instructed to pay particular attention to the requirements for Motions for Summary Judgment. (hfm)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mazda Motor of America, Inc. by Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Complaint for Damages by Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Broach, Ashley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mazda Motor Corporation by Mazda Motor Corporation.(Broach, Ashley)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Complaint for Damages by Mazda Motor Corporation. Discovery ends on 3/30/2015.(Broach, Ashley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Consent to Removal by Autoliv AB, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Autoliv LLC, Autoliv North America, Inc., Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc., Autoliv, Inc. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Autoliv AB, Autoliv Japan, Ltd., Robert Bosch LLC, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Autoliv LLC, Autoliv North America, Inc., Robert Bosch North America Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Autoliv, Inc., Mazda Motor Corporation, Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-5464552). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews et al v. Autoliv Japan, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Michael A. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Lee Andrews
Represented By: Tedra L. Cannella
Represented By: Gregory Robert Feagle
Represented By: James Edward Butler, Jr.
Represented By: William L. Ballard
Represented By: Robert David Cheeley
Represented By: Rory Allen Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor Corporation
Represented By: Ashley C Webber
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Kingsley
Represented By: DeAnn Bomar
Represented By: Myrece Rebecca Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor of America, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley C Webber
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Kingsley
Represented By: DeAnn Bomar
Represented By: Myrece Rebecca Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoliv, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas G. Scribner
Represented By: Jenny Ann Hergenrother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoliv ASP, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas G. Scribner
Represented By: Jenny Ann Hergenrother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoliv AB
Represented By: Douglas G. Scribner
Represented By: Jenny Ann Hergenrother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoliv Japan, Ltd.
Represented By: Douglas G. Scribner
Represented By: Jenny Ann Hergenrother
Represented By: Keith Robert Blackwell
Represented By: William Joseph Repko, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoliv Safety Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas G. Scribner
Represented By: Jenny Ann Hergenrother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoliv LLC
Represented By: Douglas G. Scribner
Represented By: Jenny Ann Hergenrother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoliv North America, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas G. Scribner
Represented By: Jenny Ann Hergenrother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Sullivan
Represented By: Vonnetta Leatrice Benjamin
Represented By: Tedra L. Cannella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch North America Corporation
Represented By: Michael Joseph Sullivan
Represented By: Vonnetta Leatrice Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch Motor Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bosch Corporation
Represented By: Vonnetta Leatrice Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch GmbH
Represented By: Michael Joseph Sullivan
Represented By: Vonnetta Leatrice Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: David Ashcraft Terry
Represented By: Michael R. Boorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?