Code Revision Commission et al v. Public.Resource.Org, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Code Revision Commission and State of Georgia
Defendant: Public.Resource.Org, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv02594
Filed: July 21, 2015
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Mark H. Cohen
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2017 59 Featured Case ORDER denying 55 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/06/2017. (dgr)
May 22, 2017 58 Detailed Specification and Itemization of Requested Attorney Fees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Askew, Anthony)
May 22, 2017 Submission of 55 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (bdb)
May 19, 2017 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Askew, Anthony)
May 5, 2017 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Other Costs filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Rader, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2017 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: 49 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 17-11589-HH. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (kac)
April 21, 2017 55 MOTION for Attorney Fees with Brief In Support by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support, # 2 Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts)(Askew, Anthony)
April 21, 2017 Set Electronic Certification due date deadline re: 54 Transcript Order Form. Electronic Certification due on 5/5/2017. (No transcript is required for appeal purposes.) (kac)
April 21, 2017 54 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re 49 Notice of Appeal,. (Rader, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2017 53 USCA Acknowledgment of 49 Notice of Appeal filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 17-11589-HH. (kac)
April 7, 2017 52 CLERK'S JUDGMENT ENTERED that this action be and the same hereby is dismissed. (bdb)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
April 7, 2017 51 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Orders and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 49 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
April 7, 2017 50 NOTICE Of Filing Appeal Transmission Letter by Public.Resource.Org, Inc., re: 49 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
April 7, 2017 49 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 44 Order, 52 Judgment and 46 Permanent Injunction Order by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. Filing fee $505, receipt number 113E-7076702. Transcript Order Form due on 4/21/2017 (Rader, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/7/2017 to include document relationship (kac). Modified to include judgment on 4/7/2017 (bdb).
April 7, 2017 48 RESPONSE in Support re 45 Joint MOTION for Order Entering Proposed Permanent Injunction filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Rader, Elizabeth)
April 7, 2017 47 AO 121 re 46 Order and Register of Copyrights mailed to Register of Copyrights Office. (Attachments: # 1 Permanent Injunction Order) (bdb)
April 7, 2017 Civil Case Terminated. (bdb)
April 7, 2017 46 Featured Case PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion for Permanent Injunction Order. (See order for details) The Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/7/2017. (bdb) Modified to add text on 4/7/2017 (bdb).
April 6, 2017 45 Joint MOTION for Order Entering Proposed Permanent Injunction by Code Revision Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Askew, Anthony)
March 23, 2017 44 Featured Case ORDER denying 29 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 30 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The parties are ORDERED to confer and to submit to the Court, within 14 days, a proposed briefing schedule to address the injunctive relief to which Plaintiffs are entitled as a result of the foregoing decision. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/23/2017. (bdb)
March 10, 2017 43 NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Authority by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Pavento, Lisa)
July 11, 2016 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to State of Mississippi Joint Legislative Committee, re 42 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Lawrence Arthur Schemmel. (bdb)
July 11, 2016 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Lawrence Arthur Schemmel for State of Mississippi Joint Legislative Committee. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/11/2016. (bdb)
July 7, 2016 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 35 APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence Arthur Schemmel Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Lawrence Arthur Schemmel added appearing on behalf of State of Mississippi Joint Legislative Committee, (pb)
July 6, 2016 Submission of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (bdb)
July 5, 2016 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Parker, Sarah)
July 5, 2016 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Pavento, Lisa)
June 27, 2016 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including July 5, 2016, to file replies to the pending Motions for Summary Judgement. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/27/16. (hfm)
June 27, 2016 38 Amicus Curiae Brief by Matthew Bender & Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(hfm)
June 27, 2016 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/27/16. (hfm)
June 27, 2016 Submission of 36 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Replies , submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (hfm)
June 24, 2016 36 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Replies by Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Parker, Sarah)
June 21, 2016 35 APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence Arthur Schemmel Pro Hac Vice by State of Mississippi Joint Legislative Committee,. (Hirsch, Michelle)
June 17, 2016 RETURN of 32 APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence Schemmel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6493289) to attorney for correction re: form. (pb)
June 10, 2016 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 5 Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Its Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Pavento, Lisa)
June 7, 2016 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts)(Parker, Sarah)
June 7, 2016 Submission of 28 First MOTION for Leave to File An Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (hfm)
June 6, 2016 32 APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence Schemmel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6493289)by State of Mississippi Joint Legislative Committee,. (Hirsch, Michelle)
May 23, 2016 31 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Mark H. Cohen recused. Case reassigned to Judge Richard W. Story for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:15-cv-2594-RWS. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/23/16. (jpa)
May 17, 2016 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Pavento, Lisa) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
May 17, 2016 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Brief Memorandum of Law In Support, # 3 Exhibit Ex. A, # 4 Exhibit Ex. B, # 5 Exhibit Ex. C, # 6 Exhibit Ex. D, # 7 Exhibit Ex. E, # 8 Exhibit Ex. F, # 9 Exhibit Ex. G, # 10 Exhibit Ex. H, # 11 Exhibit Ex. I, # 12 Exhibit Ex. J, # 13 Exhibit Ex. K, # 14 Exhibit Ex. L, # 15 Exhibit Ex. M, # 16 Exhibit Ex. N, # 17 Exhibit Ex. O)(Parker, Sarah) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
May 17, 2016 28 First MOTION for Leave to File An Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff with Brief In Support by Matthew Bender & Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bowler, John)
April 15, 2016 Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/17/2016. (bdb)
April 15, 2016 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order and parties shall comply with the following schedule: Summary Judgment motions due 5/17/2016; Responses to Summary Judgment motions due 21 days after service of the motion; Replies to such responses due 14 days after service of the response and if necessary, the Consolidated Pretrial Order shall be filed no later than 30 days after the entry of the Court's ruling on the parties' motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/15/2016. (bdb)
April 14, 2016 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Askew, Anthony)
February 18, 2016 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia.(Askew, Anthony)
February 18, 2016 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia.(Askew, Anthony)
February 17, 2016 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents by Public.Resource.Org, Inc..(Parker, Sarah)
February 17, 2016 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories by Public.Resource.Org, Inc..(Parker, Sarah)
February 16, 2016 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Public.Resource.Org, Inc..(Parker, Sarah)
February 16, 2016 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Public.Resource.Org, Inc..(Parker, Sarah)
February 12, 2016 19 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/12/16. (jpa)
February 10, 2016 18 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Askew, Anthony)
January 15, 2016 17 STIPULATION of Facts by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Askew, Anthony)
October 22, 2015 16 ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Rosenberg, Jason) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 20, 2015 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia.(Thomas, Warren)
October 19, 2015 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. (Rosenberg, Jason) Modified on 10/20/2015 to edit filing attorney (jpa).
October 15, 2015 13 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: re: 12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 3/18/2016. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/15/15. (jpa)
October 14, 2015 12 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Askew, Anthony)
October 8, 2015 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Public.Resource.Org, Inc., filed by State of Georgia, Code Revision Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Askew, Anthony) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 8, 2015 10 ANSWER to 6 Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia.(Askew, Anthony) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 29, 2015 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Parker on behalf of Public.Resource.Org, Inc. (Parker, Sarah)
September 28, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Rader by CRD by direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/28/15. (jgs)
September 25, 2015 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Rader Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6046489). Attorney Elizabeth Hannah Rader added appearing on behalf of Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc. (pb)
September 16, 2015 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Rader Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6046489)by Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Rosenberg, Jason)
September 16, 2015 Clerks Notation re 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by MHC. (jgs)
September 14, 2015 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. (Rosenberg, Jason) Modified on 9/15/2015 to edit text (jpa).
September 14, 2015 6 ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 2/11/2016.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand by Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Rosenberg, Jason) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 24, 2015 5 Return of Service Executed by State of Georgia, Code Revision Commission. Public.Resource.Org, Inc. served on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (Pavento, Lisa)
July 22, 2015 4 Featured Case STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION, Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/22/15. (jpa)
July 22, 2015 3 AO 121 Form mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (cem)
July 21, 2015 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Public.Resource.Org, Inc. (cem)
July 21, 2015 1 COMPLAINT filed by State of Georgia, Code Revision Commission. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-5942262.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(cem) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Code Revision Commission et al v. Public.Resource.Org, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Code Revision Commission
Represented By: Anthony B. Askew
Represented By: Lisa Pavento
Represented By: Warren James Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Georgia
Represented By: Anthony B. Askew
Represented By: Lisa Pavento
Represented By: Warren James Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public.Resource.Org, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?