HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. v. Flowers et al
Plaintiff: HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Valda Flowers, Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC and Michael Remeika
Petitioner: Houston International Insurance Group, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2015cv03262
Filed: September 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William S Duffey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses #124 . Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 11/6/17. (ddm)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE Of Filing Defendants' Statement of Attorneys Fees and Expenses in support of their Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #124 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit B-3, #7 Exhibit C-1, #8 Exhibit C-2, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G)(Winkler, Kenneth)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Submission of #124 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REPLY BRIEF re #124 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Winkler, Kenneth)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 BILL OF COSTS by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment in Support of Bill of Costs)(Goranson, Mark)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stuhldreher, Peter)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Attachments: #1 Defendants Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion, #2 Exhibit A)(Winkler, Kenneth)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff for costs. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendants Valda Flowers, Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, and Michael Remeikas Motion for Summary Judgment #87 and dismissing this action with prejudice. The parties motions for leave to file matters under seal [95,106,111] are granted. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 2/22/17. (ddm)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 OPINION AND ORDER denying HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.s Motion for Spoliation Sanctions #85 . Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/30/17. (ddm)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Leave of Absence for the following date(s) for Mark Temple: February 16-17, 2017, March 24, 2017 and June 14-29, 2017; for Peter Sthuldreher: March 16-17, 2017 and August 5-13, 2017 (Stuhldreher, Peter)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 26, 2017, June 27, 2017, June 28, 2017, June 29, 2017, June 30, 2017, July 1, 2017, July 2, 2017, July 3, 2017, July 4, 2017, July 5, 2017, July 6, 2017, July 7, 2017, July 8, 2017, July 9, 2017, July 10, 2017, by Mark Douglas Goranson. (Goranson, Mark)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 3, 2017, June 4, 2017, June 5, 2017, June 6, 2017, June 7, 2017, June 8, 2017, June 9, 2017, June 10, 2017, June 11, 2017, June 12, 2017, June 30, 2017, July 1, 2017, July 2, 2017, July 3, 2017, July 4, 2017, July 5, 2017, July 6, 2017, July 7, 2017, by Kenneth N. Winkler. (Winkler, Kenneth)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE Of Filing Reply in Support of Notice of Objection by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #108 Notice (Other), Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of the Declaration of David Roose (Winkler, Kenneth)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE Of Filing Reply in Support of Notice of Objection by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #107 Notice (Other), Defendants' Reply in Support of their Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of the Declaration of Dean Kelemecz (Winkler, Kenneth)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #111 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #110 Response (Non-Motion), to Defendants' Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of Declaration of Luana Davis, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #104 Notice (Other), Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of the Declaration of Tim Swoger (Winkler, Kenneth)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #105 Notice of Filing, Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of the Declaration of Luana Davis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Answers to Defendant Valda Flowers' First Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Second Amended First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents)(Winkler, Kenneth)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RESPONSE re #107 Notice (Other), HCC's Response to Defendants' Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of the Declaration of Dean Kelemecz filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Roose Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 Hatchett Deposition, #3 Exhibit 3 Kelemecz Deposition)(Stuhldreher, Peter)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 RESPONSE re #108 Notice (Other), HCC's Response to Defendants' Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of the Declaration of David Roose filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Roose Dep., #2 Exhibit 2 Hatchett Dep, #3 Exhibit 3 Roose Declaration)(Stuhldreher, Peter)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #106 MOTION for Order to Seal Notice of Objection to Declaration of Luana Davis, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (bgt)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #110 Response (Non-Motion), to Defendants' Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of Declaration of Luana Davis by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stuhldreher, Peter)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 SEALED RESPONSE re #105 Notice of Filing, to Defendants' Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of the Declaration of Luana Davis filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Stuhldreher, Peter) Modified on 2/22/2017 to remove the word Provisionally from the entry (ddm).
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE re #104 Notice (Other), Defendants' Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of the Declaration of Tim Swoger filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Stuhldreher, Peter)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #99 Reply to Response to Motion, Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of the Declaration of David Roose (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Jerry Hatchett)(Winkler, Kenneth)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #99 Reply to Response to Motion, Notice of Objection to the Admissibility of the Declaration of Dean Kelemecz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Dean Curtis Kelemecz Deposition Transcript)(Winkler, Kenneth)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #95 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Order to Seal Notice of Objection to Declaration of Luana Davis by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Winkler, Kenneth)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Filing under seal by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #93 Response to Motion,,,,,,,, Notice of Objection to Declaration of Luana Davis (Attachments: #1 Brief Notice of Objection to Declaration of Luana Davis)(Winkler, Kenneth) Modified on 2/22/2017 to remove the word Provisionally from the entry (ddm).
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #93 Response to Motion,,,,,,,, of Objection to the Admissibility of the Declaration of Tim Swoger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Swoger Deposition Excerpts)(Winkler, Kenneth)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Response to Statement of Material Facts re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Bractic Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B-Flowers Deposition Excerpts)(Winkler, Kenneth)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Hearing Transcript)(Winkler, Kenneth)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #91 Defendants' Motion to Seal Documents. The Motion is GRANTED with respect to Exhibit 10 to Plaintiffs Motion for Spoliation Sanctions #86 and is DENIED AS MOOT with respect to Exhibits S and R to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment #88 . Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/30/16. (ddm)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Filing Exhibit Pursuant to Court Order by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "S"-11 Hot Sheets-Redacted)(Winkler, Kenneth)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only). This matter is before the Court on Defendants' Motion for Clarification of Order Regarding Defendants' Motion to Seal Exhibits #98 . The information that is required to be redacted in Exhibit S is the information contained under the case name column, the producer column, and the name of the underwriter. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/30/2016. (bgt)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #85 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (bgt)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re #85 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Stuhldreher, Peter)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION for Clarification of #96 Order Regarding Defendants' Motion to Seal Exhibits by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Winkler, Kenneth) Modified on 8/29/2016 to edit docket text (ddm).
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Filing Exhibits Pursuant to Court Order by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "P" with redactions, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "R" with redactions)(Winkler, Kenneth)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants Motion to Seal ExhibitsFiled in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment #89 . The Motion is granted with respect to Exhibit P for the Group Names, Exhibit S with respect to the Case Name and Underwriter entries, and Exhibit R with respect to the producers and clients listed on pages 29, 30, 31, 33, 34, 35, 44, and 45. The Motion is denied with respect to Exhibits O and U. The Clerk is directed toremove the sealed restriction on Docket Nos. 88-1 and 88-5. Defendants are directed to file, no later than August 26, 2016, redacted versions of Exhibits P, R, and S, consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/24/16. (ddm)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #91 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #86 Notice of Filing of Exhibit to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION for leave to file Matters Under Seal In Support of #94 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stuhldreher, Peter) Modified on 8/22/2016 to edit event text and document link (rjs).
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. re #93 Response to Motion,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Michael Remeika, May 5, 2016, #2 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Valda Flowers, March 29, 2016, #3 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Bruce Shaver, June 2, 2016, #4 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Richard Ritchie, June 3, 2016, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Luana Davis, August 18, 2016, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Bryan Luebke, August 17, 2016, #7 Exhibit Updated Supplemental Expert Report of Walter Bratic)(Stuhldreher, Peter) Modified on 2/22/2017 to remove the word Provisionally from the entry (ddm).
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Plaintiff's Additional Statement of Material Facts as to which there is a Genuine Dispute to be Tried, #3 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Michael Remeika, October 2, 2015, #4 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Michael Remeika, May 5, 2016, #5 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Valda Flowers, October 2, 2015, #6 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Valda Flowers, March 29, 2016, #7 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Bruce Shaver, October 1, 2015, #8 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Luana Davis, March 29, 2016, #9 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Shalla Miguez, June 1, 2016, #10 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Richard Ritchie, June 3, 2016, #11 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Jeff Flowers, March 28, 2016, #12 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Jerry Hatchett, June 21, 2016, #13 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of David Roose, March 24, 2016, #14 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Daniel Strusz, March 30, 2016, #15 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Bryan Luebke, October 1, 2015, #16 Exhibit Excerpts from the Depo of Steve Harrison, May 6, 2016, #17 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel Strusz, August 17, 2016, #18 Exhibit Declaration of Tim Swoger, August 17, 2016, #19 Exhibit Declaration of Ravi Ranjan, July 28, 2016, #20 Exhibit Declaration of David Roose, July 27, 2016, #21 Exhibit Declaration of David Roose, August 15, 2016, #22 Exhibit Declaration of J. Wayne Kempton, Jr., July 26, 2016, #23 Exhibit Declaration of Marilynn Schafer, July 27, 2016, #24 Exhibit Plaintiffs First Supplemental Answers to Defendant Flowers First Interrogatories, #25 Exhibit Plaintiffs Objections and Answers to Defendant Flowers First Interrogatories, #26 Exhibit Plaintiffs Third Supplemental Answers to Defendant CRUs First Interrogatories, #27 Exhibit Revised Second Amended Complaint)(Stuhldreher, Peter)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #89 MOTION for Order to Seal Exhibits Filed In Support Of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #85 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation filed by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Neutral party analysis, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-Roose Report-, #3 Exhibit Ex. C-Hatchett Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. D-Roose Depo Excerpts, #5 Exhibit Ex. E-Strusz Depo Excerpts, #6 Exhibit Ex. F-Luebke Depo Excerpts, #7 Exhibit Ex. G-Val Flowers Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex. H-Miguez Depo Excerpts, #9 Exhibit Ex. I-Flowers Oct. Depo Excerpts, #10 Exhibit Ex. J-Shaver Oct Depo Excerpts, #11 Exhibit Ex. K-Davis Depo Excerpts, #12 Exhibit Ex. L-Hatchett Report, #13 Exhibit Ex. M-HCC Supp to Interrog Resp, #14 Exhibit Ex. N-Hatchett Depo Excerpts, #15 Exhibit Ex. O-Harrison Depo Excerpts, #16 Exhibit Ex. P-Flowers March Depo Excerpts, #17 Exhibit Ex. Q-HCC Counsel Letter, #18 Exhibit Ex. R-Jeff Flowers Declaration, #19 Exhibit Ex. S-Remeika Oct Depo Excerpts, #20 Exhibit Ex. T-Remeika Declaration)(Winkler, Kenneth)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #86 Notice of Filing of Exhibit to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions with Brief In Support by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Wymer, John)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #86 Notice of Filing of Exhibit to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions with Brief In Support by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Wymer, John) Modified on 8/2/2016 (jpa).
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Order to Seal Exhibits Filed In Support Of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winkler, Kenneth)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Filing Under Seal by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit O- Excerpts of AEO portion of Depo of Michael Remeika, May 5, 2016, #2 Exhibit Exhibit P-Exhibit 17 to Remeikas May Depo.-List of CRU Accounts, #3 Exhibit Exhibit R-Excerpts of Depo. of Bruce Shaver, June 2, 2016, #4 Exhibit Exhibit S-Exhibit 8 to Shavers June Depo.-11 Hot sheets HCC alleges Flowers misappropriated, #5 Exhibit Exhibit U-Excerpts of Depo. of David Roose, March 24, 2016)(Winkler, Kenneth) Modified on 8/24/2016 to remove the word provisionally and to unseal 88-1 and 88-5 per #96 Order (ddm).
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of MSJ, #2 Statement of Material Facts Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A- Declaration of Valda Flowers, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-Declaration of Michael Remeika, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C-Declaration of J. Wayne Kempton, Jr., #6 Exhibit Exhibit D-Declaration of Marilynn E. Schafer, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E-Excerpts of Deposition of Valda Flowers, Oct. 2, 2015, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F-Exhibit 2 to Flowers Oct. Depo.-HCCs Confidentiality Policy, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G-Exhibit 3 to Flowers Oct Depo.- Signed Acknowledgment, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H-Excerpts of Depo. of Michael Remeika, Oct. 2, 2015, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I-Excerpts of Depo. of Daniel Strusz, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J-Excerpts of Depo. of Bruce Shaver Oct. 1, 2015, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K-Excerpts of Depo. of Luana Davis, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L-Excerpts of Depo. of Shalla Miguez, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M-Excerpts of Depo. of Valda Flowers-March 29, 2016, #16 Exhibit Exhibit N-Excerpts of Non-Redacted Portions of Depo. Michael Remeika, May 5, 2016, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q-Excerpts of Depo. of Richard Ritchie, #18 Exhibit Exhibit T-Excerpts of Depo. of Brian Luebke, #19 Exhibit Exhibit V-Excerpts of Deposition of Steve Harrison, #20 Exhibit Exhibit W-Excerpts of Depo. of Timothy Swoger, #21 Exhibit Exhibit X-Excerpts of Depo. of Grant Reece, #22 Exhibit Exhibit Y-Excerpts of Depo. of Aziz Jiwani, #23 Exhibit Exhibit Z-Excerpts of Depo. of Jeff Flowers, #24 Exhibit Exhibit AA-Exhibit 3 to Ms. Flowers Depo.-Letter from Plaintiffs counsel, #25 Exhibit Exhibit BB-Excerpts of Plaintiffs First Supplemental Answers to Defendant Valda Flowers First Interrogatories, #26 Exhibit Exhibit CC-Plaintiffs Third Supplemental Answers to CRUs First Interrogatories, #27 Exhibit Exhibit DD- News Am. Mktg. In-Store, LLC v. Robert T. Emmel, #28 Exhibit Exhibit EE-Handbook excerpt, #29 Exhibit Exhibit FF-Letter and Supplemental to Interrogatories Response)(Winkler, Kenneth) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. re #85 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation Exhibit 10 (Wymer, John) Modified on 8/30/2016 to remove the word provisionally (ddm).
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation with Brief In Support by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Wymer, John)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Defendant Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika and Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC's ANSWER to #83 Amended Complaint by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika.(Winkler, Kenneth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT (Revised) and Application for Preliminary Injunction against Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika, filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc..(Stuhldreher, Peter) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 6/27/2016. Discussion had regarding several discovery disputes. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court made the following rulings: (1) Defendants subpoena on Plaintiffs consulting expert, the Norcross Group, is QUASHED. (2) Defendants shall PRODUCE, on or before July 8, 2016, the two hard drives in the possession of Jeff Flowers. (3) Plaintiff shall, on or before July 8, 2016, SUPPLEMENT its answer to CRU Interrogatory No. 3 and, on or before July 15, 2016, make available for deposition Mr. Kelemeez and Mr. Ranjan. (4) Houston International Insurance Group, Ltd.s Motion to Quash, Modify, and Receive Protection from Subpoena to Produce Documents #62 is DENIED, subject to limitations to be agreed upon by the parties on or before July 6, 2016. If the parties cannot agree on limitations on or before July 6, 2016, they shall notify the Court of their areas of disagreement for the Court to resolve. HIIG shall make its production of documents on or before July 30, 2016. (Court Reporter Nicholas A. Marrone) (bgt)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE (by docket entry only): The Teleconference set for 6/27/2016 at 9:30 AM will instead take place at 04:00 PM before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. This is a time change only. (bgt)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE (by docket entry only) : The Teleconference set for 6/22/2016 is VACATED and RESET for 6/27/2016 at 9:30 AM before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. (bgt)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #75 Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of #69 Amended Complaint and Application for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that HCC shall file, on or before June 30, 2016, a revised Second Amended Complaint consolidating the claims in the Remeika Action and the Flowers Action. The revised Second Amended Complaint shall not contain any allegations or claims not already raised in the complaints filed in the Actions prior to the Court's Consolidation Order. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/14/2016. (bdb)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE (by docket entry only): A Teleconference is set for 6/22/2016 at 2:30 PM before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. (bgt)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 MOTION to Strike #69 Amended Complaint, and Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Plaintiffs Objections and Answers to Defendant Valda Flowers First Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Defendants Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika and Creative Risk Underwriters, LLCs First Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Deposition of Timothy Swoger Transcript, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-Employee Handbook, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E-Order, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F- Letter to Mark Goranson, Esq. and Kenneth Winkler, Esq. from Mark Temple, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G-Plaintiff's First Supplemental Responses to Defendant Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC's Second Request for Production of Documents, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H-Email to Peter Stuhldreher from Kenneth Winkler)(Winkler, Kenneth)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. John F. Wymer, III replacing attorney Douglas Michael Towns. (Wymer, John)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika.(Winkler, Kenneth)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE re #75 MOTION to Strike #69 Amended Complaint, and Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 5)(Stuhldreher, Peter)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery for the Notice of Deposition and Notice of Subpoena to Bruce Shaver, Jr. by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika.(Winkler, Kenneth)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION to Strike #69 Amended Complaint, and Application for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Winkler, Kenneth)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Defendants' ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika.(Winkler, Kenneth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #70 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (anc)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE Of Filing Subpoena to Produce Documents to Lenovo Inc. by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (Towns, Douglas)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Service for Plaintiff's Fourth Requests for Production and Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Valda Flowers by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (Towns, Douglas)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Notice of Subpoena to Plaintiff HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika.(Winkler, Kenneth) Modified on 5/12/2016 in order to add text (anc).
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (anc)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Application for Preliminary Injunction against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc..(Stuhldreher, Peter) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that the Court amends the Attorneys' Eyes Only designation of the hot sheets to allow Defendants Flowers and Remeika to review them in accordance with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide, on or before April 15, 2016, Mr. Bratic's complete supplemental report containing all of his opinions. Defendants shall file, on or before May 6, 2016, their counter-designated damages expert's report. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are required to inform the Court, on or before April 4, 2016, of their views on whether a continuance of the April 18, 2016, hearing is appropriate and, if the parties agree to a continuance, propose dates for the hearing after the close of all discovery. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/30/2016. (anc)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 05/16, 05/17, 06/23, 06/24, 06/25, 06/26, 06/27, 06/28, 06/29, 06/30, 07/01, 07/02, 07/03, 07/04, 07/05, by Kenneth N. Winkler. (Winkler, Kenneth)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Consolidate Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to consolidate Civil Action No. 1:15-cv-4106 with Civil Action No. 1:15-cv-3262. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE Civil Action No. 1:15-cv-4106. The parties in the Consolidated Action shall file any pleadings, motions, or other papers only in the Consolidated Action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff HCC Holdings, Inc. must file, on or before April 15, 2016, a Second Amended Complaint in the Consolidated Action which shall identify all claims asserted against Defendant Remeika. Any defendants named in the Second Amended Complaint shall have thirty (30) days from the date the Second Amended Complaint is filed to file an answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/21/2016. (anc)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #62 MOTION to Quash, Modify, and Receive Protection from Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (anc)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #62 MOTION to Quash, Modify, and Receive Protection from Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects filed by Houston International Insurance Group, Ltd.. (Culpepper, Sterling)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents , as to Lenovo Inc.. (Towns, Douglas)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Submission of #61 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (anc)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE re #62 MOTION to Quash, Modify, and Receive Protection from Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Response to Motion to Quash)(Towns, Douglas)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Quash, Modify, and Receive Protection from Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects with Brief In Support by Houston International Insurance Group, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Culpepper, Sterling)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Unopposed Motion to Consolidate)(Winkler, Kenneth)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE Of Filing Proof of Service of Subpoena on Non-Party Houston International Insurance Group, Ltd. by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (Towns, Douglas)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Answers to Interrogatories and Objections and Responses to Production of Documents by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika.(Winkler, Kenneth) Modified on 2/10/2016 in order remove capitalization (anc).
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC.(Winkler, Kenneth)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC.(Winkler, Kenneth) Modified on 1/29/2016 (pjm).
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AGREED ORDER CONSENTING TO GOOGLE'S PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS/INFORMATION Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/20/2016. (anc)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AGREED ORDER CONSENTING TO CITRIX'S PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS/INFORMATION Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/20/2016. (anc)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AGREED ORDER CONSENTING TO MICROSOFT'S PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS/INFORMATION Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/20/2016. (anc)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Initial Disclosures by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc..(Towns, Douglas)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Valda Flowers.(Winkler, Kenneth)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Initial Disclosures by Valda Flowers.(Winkler, Kenneth)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Filing Subpoena on Microsoft by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. re #47 Proposed Consent Order (Towns, Douglas)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Filing Subpoena on Google by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. re #46 Proposed Consent Order (Towns, Douglas)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Filing Subpoena to Citirx by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. re #45 Proposed Consent Order (Towns, Douglas)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Consenting to Microsoft's Production of Documents/Information. (Towns, Douglas)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Consenting to Google's Production of Documents/Information. (Towns, Douglas)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Consenting to Citrix's Production of Documents/Information. (Towns, Douglas)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing (by docket entry only):Injunction Hearing set for 4/18/2016 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. (hfm)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that the #43 Joint Detailed Discovery Plan is entered as an Order of the Court. No further extensions of discovery will be granted. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 12/18/2015. (anc)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Joint Detailed Discovery Plan by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc..(Towns, Douglas)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #39 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 12/8/2015. (anc)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that (1) Defendants are prohibited from using any information obtained from, or owned by, HCC. This prohibition does not apply to HCC Information which can be rightfully obtained by Defendants from other sources and which is not a trade secret (in whole or in part) of HCC; (2) All Parties must retain, and not destroy, all relevant evidence including but not limited to evidence on devices that Defendants used to conduct business on behalf of HCC and/or Creative Risk Underwriters, in whatever format it is maintained, including but not limited to all business and personal computers, servers, hard drives, and electronic storage devices, including without limitation, all usb flash or thumb drives and external hard drives and all e-mail, cloud storage, and remote access accounts, in Defendants' and HCC's possession,custody, or control, as well as all information maintained on those Devices and Accounts or regarding the use of such devices; and (3) This Order shall remain in effect until further order from the Court. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 12/8/2015. (anc)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Joint Consent Order. (Stuhldreher, Peter)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order)(Stuhldreher, Peter)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers, Michael Remeika.(Winkler, Kenneth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference Proceedings held on December 2, 2015, before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Nicholas A. Marrone, Telephone number 404-215-1486. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 12/2/2015. #2 Motion to Expedite, #2 Motion for Hearing, #31 Motion to Dismiss DENIED AS MOOT. #34 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief WITHDRAWN. During the telephone status conference on December 2, 2015, with counsel for the parties, the Court, with the consent of counsel, (i) denied as moot HCC's Motion for Expedited Hearing and Motion to Expedite Discovery #2 , and (ii) denied as moot Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #31 HCCs original Complaint. HCC agreed to withdraw its Motion to Disqualify Greg Freemyer #34 , but without prejudice to moving to exclude Freemyers expert testimony if Defendant seeks to relyupon it to support a motion or at a hearing in or trial of this matter. The Court also ordered the parties to submit, on or before December 7, 2015, (1) a Proposed Protective Order to protect confidential and proprietary information, and (ii) a consent order enjoining Defendants, including Michael Rameika, from using any information obtained from, or owned by, HCC. On or before December 14, 2015, the parties shall submit a detailed discovery plan in accordance with Paragraph 14 of this Courts Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. (Court Reporter Nick Marrone)(anc)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE Of Filing Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Disqualify Expert by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. re #34 MOTION Motion to Disqualify Expert Greg Freemyer (Towns, Douglas)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION Motion to Disqualify Expert Greg Freemyer with Brief In Support by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Memo in Support, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Memo in Support, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Memo in Support, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Towns, Douglas)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Towns, Douglas)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Application for Preliminary Injunction against All Defendants, filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc..(Towns, Douglas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Winkler, Kenneth)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers. Discovery ends on 4/7/2016.(Winkler, Kenneth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM THE COURT (by docket entry only): Parties are advised to go to the district courts website at #www.gand.uscourts.gov/case-prep-judge-duffey. Here, the Court has provided its Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigants. The Parties shall abide by this Standing Order throughout the processing of this case. Parties are instructed to pay particular attention to the requirements for Motions for Summary Judgment. (hfm)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) re #29 Status Report. Defendants are allowed, through and including November 9, 2015, to file answers or otherwise respond re #1 Complaint. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 11/2/15. (hfm)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STATUS REPORT by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Towns, Douglas)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 10/20/2015 denying as moot #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Injunction Hearing scheduled for October 27, 2015, is cancelled. The parties are directed to file a joint Status Report with the Court on or before October 28, 2015. The parties will advise in the status report a proposed answer date. (Court Reporter Nick Marrone)(kdw)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winkler, Kenneth) Modified on 10/20/2015 in order to correct motion type (anc).
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Douglas Goranson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6055957). Attorney Mark Douglas Goranson added appearing on behalf of Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers (pb)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Petitioner Mark Douglas Goranson. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 9/30/15. (hfm)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE to Take Deposition of B. Shaver & B. Luebke filed by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers (Attachments: #1 Notice to take depo of Bruce Shaver)(Winkler, Kenneth)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Petitioner Mark Temple. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 9/29/15. (hfm)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Petitioner Peter J. Stuhldreher. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 9/29/15. (hfm) Modified on 10/1/2015 to terminate notification (cdg). phv filed
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Towns, Douglas)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC served on 9/25/2015, answer due 10/16/2015. (Towns, Douglas)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. Valda Flowers served on 9/25/2015, answer due 10/16/2015. (Towns, Douglas)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT ORDER entered solely to preserve the status quo until the Court can hold a preliminary injunction hearing and hear evidence and argument from all parties. See Order for additional information. The parties will appear at a hearing before this Court regarding Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction on October 27, 2015 AT 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 9/23/2015. (anc)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Temple Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6050474). Attorney Mark Douglas Temple added appearing on behalf of HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (pb)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter J. Stuhldreher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6050501). Attorney Peter Justin Stuhldreher added appearing on behalf of HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (pb)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Joint Consent Order. (Towns, Douglas)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATUS REPORT Joint by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Towns, Douglas)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Douglas Goranson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6055957) with Brief In Support by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers. (Winkler, Kenneth)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2015. Hearing on request for Temporary Restraining Order. The parties are to file a consent order as outlined by the Court. (Court Reporter Nick Marrone)(anc)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT of the Temporary Restraining Order Hearing Proceedings held on September 21, 2015, before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Nicholas A. Marrone, Telephone number 404-215-1486. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Permanent Injunction filed by Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Flowers- Declaration, #2 Exhibit Remeika- Declaration)(Winkler, Kenneth) Modified on 9/21/2015 to correct document relationship per telephone call from filing attorney (hfm).
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE Of Filing additional evidence in support of Emergency Application for TRO by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Towns, Douglas)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion. Docket entry edited to reflect e-filed pleading as Response to #1 Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining order and Permanent Injunction. (hfm)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(anc)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on Monday, September 21, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. as to Defendant's representative Mark Goranson. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 9/18/2015. (anc)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth N. Winkler on behalf of Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC, Valda Flowers (Winkler, Kenneth)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter J. Stuhldreher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6050501)by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Towns, Douglas)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Temple Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6050474)by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Towns, Douglas)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing (by docket entry only): Evidentiary Hearing (TRO) set for 9/21/2015 at 02:30 PM, ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. (hfm)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. for the Registered Agent of Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC (Towns, Douglas)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC (Towns, Douglas)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Valda Flowers (Towns, Douglas)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing (by docket entry only): Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/18/2015 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. (hfm)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Submission of the #1 Complaint and EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, EXPEDITED HEARING AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and #2 MOTION for Expedited Hearing and MOTION to Expedite Discovery to District Judge William S. Duffey. (aaq)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (aaq)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED Temporary Restraining Order and Order Granting Expedited Discovery and an Expedited Hearing. (aaq)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of the application for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction within the #1 Complaint filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (aaq)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Expedited Hearing and MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (aaq)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, EXPEDITED HEARING AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION with Jury Demand filed by HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6047217.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. v. Flowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Douglas Temple
Represented By: Peter Justin Stuhldreher
Represented By: Douglas Michael Towns
Represented By: John F. Wymer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valda Flowers
Represented By: Mark Douglas Goranson
Represented By: Kenneth N. Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Risk Underwriters, LLC
Represented By: Mark Douglas Goranson
Represented By: Kenneth N. Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Remeika
Represented By: Kenneth N. Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Houston International Insurance Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Sterling Gardner Culpepper, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?