Fastcase, Inc. v. Lawriter LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff: Fastcase, Inc.
Defendant: Lawriter LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00327
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Timothy C. Batten
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2017 Civil Case Terminated. (jlm)
January 26, 2017 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered DISMISSING action without prejudice. (jlm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
January 26, 2017 28 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment and DISMISSING action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 1/26/17. (jlm)
November 29, 2016 27 DECLARATION of Satish Sheth filed by Lawriter LLC in response to Court's 26 Order.(Rozelsky, Kurt) Modified on 11/30/2016 (jlm).
November 17, 2016 26 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING Lawriter to file, by 12/1/16, a declaration of one of its members that identifies the state(s) of citizenship of each of Lawriter's members. Once that jurisdictional declaration is filed, the Court will take the 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fastcase, Inc., under advisement. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 11/17/16. (jlm)
July 6, 2016 Submission of 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment , submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (jlm)
July 5, 2016 25 REPLY BRIEF re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fastcase, Inc.. (Tropper, Joshua)
June 24, 2016 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion for 7 Day Extension of Time through 7/5/16 for Plaintiff to file reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 6/24/16. (rsh)
June 23, 2016 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Fastcase, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brazier, Robert)
June 9, 2016 22 Statement of Material Facts re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lawriter LLC. (Rozelsky, Kurt)
June 9, 2016 21 Response to Statement of Material Facts re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lawriter LLC. (Rozelsky, Kurt)
June 9, 2016 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lawriter LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of David Harriman)(Rozelsky, Kurt)
June 2, 2016 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING defendant's 18 Consent Motion for an Extension of 7 days to respond to plaintiff's 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 6/2/16. (jlm)
June 1, 2016 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lawriter LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Extending Time)(Rozelsky, Kurt)
May 12, 2016 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Fastcase, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Edward J. Walters, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment)(Brazier, Robert) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- Modified on 5/13/2016 to edit exhibit text. (aaq).
April 18, 2016 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to file any initial dispositive motion, if it wishes, is May 12, 2016; and all pre-trial deadlines that would have otherwise run from the March 23, 2016 filing date of Defendant's Answer, including the deadlines to file the Parties' Joint Preliminary Planning and Discovery Report and Initial Disclosures, as well as the start of discovery, are EXTENDED until 30 days after the Court rules on Plaintiff's initial dispositive motion, or in the alternative, if Plaintiff does not file its initial dispositive motion, by May 12, 2016, without waiver of Plaintiffs right to file a dispositive motion within30 days after the close of discovery, per the Court's local rules, if Plaintiff does not file, or the Court denies, Plaintiffs initial dis positivemotion. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 4/18/16. (rsh)
April 18, 2016 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines by Fastcase, Inc., Fastcase, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to Exend Pre-Trial Deadlines)(Brazier, Robert)
April 12, 2016 14 AMENDED ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, by Lawriter LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rozelsky, Kurt)
March 23, 2016 13 ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Discovery ends on 8/22/2016.), COUNTERCLAIM against Fastcase, Inc. by Lawriter LLC.(Rozelsky, Kurt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 10, 2016 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 4 Amended Complaint,, Lawriter LLC Answer due 3/23/2016. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 3/10/16. (jlm)
March 10, 2016 Clerks Notation re 8 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
March 9, 2016 11 INSTRUCTIONS to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 3/9/16. (jlm)
March 9, 2016 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint, by Lawriter LLC. (Rohe, Joseph)
March 9, 2016 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph William Rohe on behalf of Lawriter LLC (Rohe, Joseph)
March 9, 2016 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Lawriter LLC. (Rozelsky, Kurt)
March 9, 2016 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Matthew Rozelsky on behalf of Lawriter LLC (Rozelsky, Kurt)
February 29, 2016 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service , as to Fastcase, Inc.. (Brazier, Robert)
February 19, 2016 Clerks Notation re 5 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
February 19, 2016 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Fastcase, Inc.. (Brazier, Robert)
February 16, 2016 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Lawriter LLC, filed by Fastcase, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Brazier, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 9, 2016 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with attached Exhibits , as to Dave Harriman, CEO of Lawriter, LLC. (Brazier, Robert)
February 4, 2016 Submission of 1 Complaint (preliminary and permanent injunctiverelief sought), submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (tcc)
February 4, 2016 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lawriter LLC. (tcc)
February 3, 2016 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fastcase, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6270704.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fastcase, Inc. v. Lawriter LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fastcase, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. Brazier
Represented By: Steven G. Hall
Represented By: Joshua Tropper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawriter LLC
Represented By: Joseph William Rohe
Represented By: Kurt Matthew Rozelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?