Warshaw et al v. National Video Monitoring Co., LLC
Plaintiff: Warshaw, Scott Warshaw and National Video Monitoring Corporation
Defendant: National Video Monitoring Co., LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv01958
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Henry
Presiding Judge: William S Duffey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE Of Filing Filing redacted exhibits pursuant to this Court's February 2, 2017 Order. by National Video Monitoring Co., LLC Notice of Filing Redacted Exhibits Pursuant to February 2, 2017 Opinion and Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit D - Redacted Plaintiff's First Amendment to Complaint)(Owen, Lisa)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER granting #20 Motion to Seal exhibits attached to the #5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 2/6/17. (jpa)
November 4, 2016 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #24 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). The parties agree that they shall bear their own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. (ddm)
November 3, 2016 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by National Video Monitoring Co., LLC. (Owen, Lisa)
November 3, 2016 Filing 23 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Seal Document Nos. 5-1 and 5-4 by National Video Monitoring Co., LLC. (Owen, Lisa)
October 27, 2016 Submission of #20 MOTION to Seal Document, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER removing this case from the Court's calendar and directing the Clerk to close the case administratively with the right of any party to reopen the case if the settlement is not concluded. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal on or before November 30, 2016. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 10/19/16. (ddm)
October 19, 2016 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
October 6, 2016 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Amended Disclosures by National Video Monitoring Corporation, Scott Warshaw.(Kertscher, Douglas)
October 6, 2016 Filing 20 First MOTION to Seal Exhibits to #5 Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by National Video Monitoring Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant's Emergency Motion to Seal, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Thomas Allison in Support of Emergency Motion to Seal)(Cauthorn, Thomas) Modified on 10/6/2016 - corrected docket language (bgt).
October 3, 2016 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 A Certificate of Service of Discovery by National Video Monitoring Co., LLC.(Cauthorn, Thomas)
September 28, 2016 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 9/28/2016 regarding discovery dispute. The parties are to submit to Chambers, on or before 5:00 p.m. on Friday, September 30, 2016, an agreed-upon resolution to the discovery dispute. (Court Reporter Nicholas A. Marrone)(ddm)
September 22, 2016 Filing 17 Initial Disclosures by National Video Monitoring Co., LLC.(Cauthorn, Thomas)
September 21, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Cauthorn, III on behalf of National Video Monitoring Co., LLC (Cauthorn, Thomas)
September 8, 2016 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Deposition of Markus Scott, Gayla Nichols and Scott Peterson by National Video Monitoring Corporation, Scott Warshaw.(Kertscher, Douglas)
September 7, 2016 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Tangible Things to Defendant by Scott Warshaw.(Kertscher, Douglas)
September 2, 2016 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by National Video Monitoring Corporation, Scott Warshaw.(Kertscher, Douglas)
August 30, 2016 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Scott Warshaw.(Kertscher, Douglas)
August 24, 2016 Submission of #5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: The time limits for adding parties, amending pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, re: #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 8/17/16. (jkl)
August 15, 2016 Filing 10 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by National Video Monitoring Corporation, Scott Warshaw. (Kertscher, Douglas)
August 4, 2016 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by National Video Monitoring Corporation, Scott Warshaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Stay)(Kertscher, Douglas) Modified on 8/4/2016 (bgt).
July 28, 2016 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiff's to File Response Brief re: #5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by National Video Monitoring Corporation, Scott Warshaw. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kertscher, Douglas)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting the parties' #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 8/4/2016 in which Plaintiffs must file their response brief in opposition to Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 7/28/2016. (bgt)
July 15, 2016 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Video Monitoring Corporation, Scott Warshaw by National Video Monitoring Corporation, Scott Warshaw.(Kertscher, Douglas)
July 14, 2016 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Video Monitoring Co., LLC identifying Corporate Parent NVM Holdings, LLC for National Video Monitoring Co., LLC. (Cauthorn, James)
July 14, 2016 Filing 5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by National Video Monitoring Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #2 SEALED Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss, #3 SEALED Exhibit C to Motion to Dismiss, #4 SEALED Exhibit D to Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit E to Motion to Dismiss) (Cauthorn, James) Modified on 10/6/2016 (bgt). Modified on 2/7/2017 (jpa).
June 24, 2016 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Scott Warshaw, National Video Monitoring Corporation. Answer owed by National Video Monitoring Co., LLC on 7/14/2016 (Kertscher, Douglas) Modified on 6/27/2016 in order to add answer deadline to docket text (anc).
June 22, 2016 Filing 3 CORRECTED COMPLAINT against National Video Monitoring Co., LLCwith Jury Demand, filed by Scott Warshaw, National Video Monitoring Corporation.(Kertscher, Douglas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/22/2016 (fap).
June 14, 2016 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to National Video Monitoring Co., LLC. (bnw)
June 13, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Scott Warshaw and National Video Monitoring Corporation. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6507265.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warshaw et al v. National Video Monitoring Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Video Monitoring Co., LLC
Represented By: James Wickliffe Cauthorn
Represented By: Thomas E. Cauthorn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Warshaw
Represented By: Blakely Holloway Frye
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Video Monitoring Corporation
Represented By: Blakely Holloway Frye
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?