Knight-McDowell v. Rival Group, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Gladys Knight-McDowell
Defendant: Rival Group, LLC, Cascade Foods, LLC, Granite Foods, LLC and Shanga Hankerson
Case Number: 1:2016cv03160
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2016 18 NOTICE by Gladys Knight-McDowell of Denial of the Receiver's Motion for Contempt in the Clayton County Superior Court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order)(Jett, John)
October 11, 2016 17 RESPONSE re 15 Objection filed by Gladys Knight-McDowell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bussert, Christopher)
September 29, 2016 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Gladys Knight-McDowell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John P. Jett, # 2 Exhibit B - Email chain, # 3 Exhibit C - AJC article, # 4 Exhibit D - 11 Alive News, # 5 Exhibit GA Secretary of State listing for Rival Group LLC, # 6 Exhibit F - GA Secretary of State listing for Granite Foods LLC, # 7 Exhibit G - GA Secretary of State listing for Cascade Foods LLC, # 8 Exhibit H - Rescission of statement, # 9 Exhibit I - Email acknowledging receipt of First Amended Complaint)(Jett, John)
September 26, 2016 Clerks Notation re 13 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
September 22, 2016 15 OBJECTION re Clerks Entry of Default by Cascade Foods, LLC, Granite Foods, LLC, Rival Group, LLC. (hfm)
September 22, 2016 14 MOTION to Set Aside Default with Brief In Support by Shanga Hankerson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Davis, Dana)
September 22, 2016 13 Certificate of Interested Persons by Shanga Hankerson. (Davis, Dana)
September 22, 2016 12 ANSWER to 1 , 4 COMPLAINT ( Discovery ends on 2/21/2017.), ANSWER to 1 , 4 Amended Complaint by Shanga Hankerson.(Davis, Dana) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 22, 2016 Clerks Entry of Default as to Cascade Foods, LLC, Granite Foods, LLC, Shanga Hankerson, Rival Group, LLC. (hfm)
September 21, 2016 11 NOTICE Of Filing by Gladys Knight-McDowell re 10 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Amended Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Amended Certificate of Service)(Bussert, Christopher)
September 21, 2016 10 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Gladys Knight-McDowell. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher P. Bussert)(Bussert, Christopher)
September 13, 2016 9 Return of Service Executed by Gladys Knight-McDowell. Shanga Hankerson served on 8/30/2016, answer due 9/20/2016. (Bussert, Christopher)
September 13, 2016 8 Return of Service Executed by Gladys Knight-McDowell. Granite Foods, LLC served on 8/30/2016, answer due 9/20/2016. (Bussert, Christopher)
September 13, 2016 7 Return of Service Executed by Gladys Knight-McDowell. Cascade Foods, LLC served on 8/30/2016, answer due 9/20/2016. (Bussert, Christopher)
September 13, 2016 6 Return of Service Executed by Gladys Knight-McDowell. Rival Group, LLC served on 8/30/2016, answer due 9/20/2016. (Bussert, Christopher)
August 30, 2016 5 Featured Case STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/30/16. (hfm)
August 29, 2016 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Gladys Knight-McDowell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bussert, Christopher) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 29, 2016 Clerks Notation re 2 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
August 29, 2016 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cascade Foods, LLC, Granite Foods, LLC, Shanga Hankerson and Rival Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Cascade Foods, # 2 Granite Foods, # 3 Shanga Hankerson)(eop)
August 26, 2016 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Gladys Knight-McDowell. (eop)
August 26, 2016 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Gladys Knight-McDowell; and Summon(s) issued. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-6659597.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -A, # 2 Exhibit - B, # 3 Exhibit -C, # 4 Exhibit -D, # 5 Exhibit -E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight-McDowell v. Rival Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Knight-McDowell
Represented By: Christopher Prine Bussert
Represented By: Ava Conger
Represented By: John P. Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rival Group, LLC
Represented By: Boniface G. Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Foods, LLC
Represented By: Boniface G. Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Foods, LLC
Represented By: Boniface G. Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanga Hankerson
Represented By: Dana M. Tucker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?