United States of America v. One 2013 Ducati Superbike Motorcycle, VIN ZDM1XBMV5DB023385

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 2013 Ducati Superbike Motorcycle, VIN ZDM1XBMV5DB023385
Claimant: Alberto Lomeli
Case Number: 1:2017cv00998
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Gwinnett
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed (Disposal) on 9/24/2018 for One 2013 Ducati Superbike Motorcycle, VIN ZDMV5DB023385. (cmd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 23 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America. (cmd)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
August 21, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (cmd)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE BY DEFAULT: The Court GRANTS the Plaintiff's #20 Motion for Default Judgment against all potential claimants to the Defendant Motorcycle. The Clerk shall enter a default judgment in favor of the United States and against the Defendant Motorcycle more particularly described as one 2013 Ducati Superbike Motorcycle, VIN ZDM1XBMV5DB023385. The interest of Alberto Lomeli in the aforementioned Defendant Motorcycle is hereby extinguished. All right, title, and interest in the Defendant Motorcycle is forfeited and vested in the United States, and shall be disposed of according to law. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/21/2018. (cmd)
June 27, 2018 Clerks Notation re #21 Leave of Absence. Attorney Michael J. Brown is relieved from personally having to attend any proceedings or trials in this matter on the following dates: July 9-20, 2018. This leave of absence will not affect the processing of this case including the scheduling of motions, hearings, trials or other events before this Court. (mlb)
June 27, 2018 Filing 21 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 9, 2018 through July 20, 2018, by Michael John Brown. (Brown, Michael)
February 28, 2018 Submission of #20 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Potential Claimants Including Alberto Lomeli, Romeo Gonzalez-Chapa, and Guillermo Roy Mejia to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd)
February 9, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Potential Claimants Including Alberto Lomeli, Romeo Gonzalez-Chapa, and Guillermo Roy Mejia with Brief In Support by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Michael)
February 8, 2018 Clerks Entry of Default as to Alberto Lomeli and all Potential Claimants to Defendant Motorcycle. (adg)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Judgment as to All Potential Claimants Including Alberto Lomeli, Romeo Gonzalez-Chapa, and Guillermo Roy Mejia. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter default as to All Potential Claimants to Defendant Motorcycle. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/8/2018. (adg) Modified on 2/9/2018 to correct file date of order.(adg)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER STAYING CIVIL PROCEEDINGS IN LIGHT OF LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/22/2018. (cmd)
October 13, 2017 Submission of the #17 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default All Potential Calimants Including Alberto Lomeli, Romeo Gonzalez-Chapa, and Guillermo Roy Mejia to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (aaq)
September 25, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default All Potential Calimants Including Alberto Lomeli, Romeo Gonzalez-Chapa, and Guillermo Roy Mejia by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael J. Brown)(Brown, Michael)
September 24, 2017 Filing 16 WITHDRAWAL of Claim by Alberto Lomeli. (Drake, Scott)
August 26, 2017 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alberto Lomeli.(Drake, Scott)
August 21, 2017 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents to Claimant Alberto Lomeli by United States of America.(Brown, Michael)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER re: #12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 5/26/2017. (cmd)
May 26, 2017 Filing 12 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by United States of America. (Brown, Michael)
May 8, 2017 Filing 11 Declaration of Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date May 5, 2017. (Brown, Michael) Modified on 5/9/2017 to edit event text. (cmd)
April 28, 2017 Filing 10 First ANSWER to Complaint for Forfeiture by Alberto Lomeli. Discovery ends on 9/25/2017.(Drake, Scott) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/1/2017 to edit filer information (cmd).
April 28, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Andrew Drake on behalf of Claimant Alberto Lomeli (Drake, Scott) Modified on 5/1/2017 to edit filer information (cmd).
April 4, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent To Guillermo Roy Mejia (Brown, Michael)
April 4, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Alberto Lomeli (Brown, Michael)
April 4, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent To Romeo Gonzalez-Chapa (Brown, Michael)
April 4, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Alberto Lomeli via Attorney Scott A. Drake (Brown, Michael)
March 30, 2017 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed on 3/29/2017 as to One 2013 Ducati Superbike Motorcycle, VIN ZDM1XBMV5DB023385.(dfb)
March 29, 2017 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM as to One 2013 Ducati Superbike Motorcycle, VIN ZDM1XBMV5DB023385. (dfb)
March 22, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
March 20, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 2013 Ducati Superbike Motorcycle, VIN ZDM1XBMV5DB023385
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2013 Ducati Superbike Motorcycle, VIN ZDM1XBMV5DB023385
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael John Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alberto Lomeli
Represented By: Scott Andrew Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?