Partridge et al v. Equifax et al
Plaintiff: Diane Platts, Julia Mendoza, Milo Gene Kartchner, Sr., Chelsea Arnell, Chiaquitta Purnell-Reid, Justin Edison Manco, Theresa Stonebraker, Joseph Raynor, Michelle Nielson, Julia Lindsey, David Weloth, Emil Budilov, Nathan P. Hirst, Douglas C. Evans, Geogory Michael Metzgar, Alan B. Bassett, John MacInnis, Donald R. Hensley, Dana Oleson, Kimbra Flanders, Deborah Hendricks, Tamara Ann Kartchner, Zane L. Christensen, Indra C. Madsen, Cheminant M. Flitton, Gene Tabish, Matthew Koehler, Fernando Vera, Sean Parrott, Michelle Phillips, Debra Bigler, Sharon Normoyle, Dana Olson, Janet Evans, Pamela Sue Ogden, Angela Colchin, Shenna Gifford, Aura Crespo, Brooke Zaugg, Jennifer J. Christensen, Kara Vera, Nicci Mendoza, Brent Hughes, Leo Michael Coombs, Kimberly Joy C. Metzgar, Jerry Nielson, Mathew Patterson Coe, Justin Poarch, James Walters, Jan Tabish, Steven Stonebraker, Christine Coombs, Russell A. Noster, Gloria Noster, Mitchell Wyatt, Dana James Normoyle, Christopher Enslow, Emil Bigler, William L. Wright, Brian M. Owens, Cameron Christensen, Michael C. Clough, Jared Zaugg, Clara Carlson, Bristol Ward, Amanda Knudson, Mike Madsen, Zachary A. Christensen, Layne A. K. Hill, Alison Moellmer, Julia Lindsay, Nosheen T. Hamid, Michael S. Keenan, Ethan Chrisman, Atir Edwin, Valencia Vee Bradley, Charles Carlson, Christopher Agnew, Tyler Chrisman, John Morgan, Tom Partridge, Pamela R. Bassett and Julie Morgan
Defendant: Equifax and Equifax Information Services
Case Number: 1:2017cv05419
Filed: December 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.) (EQACtrk) (sap)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING all the individual civil actions linked to this MDL action, EXCLUDING City of Chicago (1:18cv1470) and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico (1:18cv5611) vs. Equifax. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.) (EQACtrk) (sap)
July 19, 2018 NOTICE The Status Conference scheduled for Friday 7/20/2018 at 11:00 a.m. has been cancelled at request of counsel. A date for the next status conference will be determined and notice entered on docket for a date in late August or September. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(ss)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 3. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/20/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(ddm)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Scheduling Hearing on Applications for Leadership Appointments for 2/9/2018 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 2108. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(ss)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A Consumer Case and Counsel Table, #2 Exhibit 1B Small Business Cases and Counsel Table, #3 Exhibit 2 Financial Cases and Counsel Table)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(ss)
January 2, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of e-mailing #26 Case Management Order to attorney Steven A. Christensen ONLY. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY, any attorney not listed on the transferring court's docket sheet must file a Notice of Appearance by mail if they wish to receive notice of filings from this court. Please include this member case number and the MDL case number on the filing. (jkl)
December 27, 2017 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:17-cv-01017. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 26, 2017 Filing 24 CLERKS ORDER of Conditional Transfer re IN RE: EQUIFAX, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION MDL 2800 signed by Marjorie O. Rendell, Acting Chair MDL Panel (jwt) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Jill N. Parrish recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/17/17. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
November 9, 2017 Filing 22 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
November 9, 2017 Filing 21 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Christopher Agnew, Chelsea Arnell, Alan B. Bassett, Pamela R. Bassett, Debra Bigler, Emil Bigler, Valencia Vee Bradley, Emil Budilov, Charles Carlson, Clara Carlson, Ethan Chrisman, Tyler Chrisman, Cameron Christensen, Jennifer J. Christensen, Zachary A. Christensen, Zane L. Christensen, Michael C. Clough, Mathew Patterson Coe, Angela Colchin, Christine Coombs, Leo Michael Coombs, Aura Crespo, Atir Edwin, Christopher Enslow, Douglas C. Evans, Janet Evans, Kimbra Flanders, Cheminant M. Flitton, Shenna Gifford, Nosheen T. Hamid, Deborah Hendricks, Donald R. Hensley, Layne A. K. Hill, Nathan P. Hirst, Brent Hughes, Milo Gene Kartchner, Sr, Tamara Ann Kartchner, Michael S. Keenan, Amanda Knudson, Matthew Koehler, Julia Lindsay, Julia Lindsey, John MacInnis, Indra C. Madsen, Mike Madsen, Justin Edison Manco, Julia Mendoza, Nicci Mendoza, Geogory Michael Metzgar, Kimberly Joy C. Metzgar, Alison Moellmer, John Morgan, Julie Morgan, Jerry Nielson, Michelle Nielson, Dana James Normoyle, Sharon Normoyle, Gloria Noster, Russell A. Noster, Pamela Sue Ogden, Dana Oleson, Dana Olson, Brian M. Owens, Sean Parrott, Tom Partridge, Michelle Phillips, Diane Platts, Justin Poarch, Chiaquitta Purnell-Reid, Joseph Raynor, Steven Stonebraker, Theresa Stonebraker, Gene Tabish, Jan Tabish, Fernando Vera, Kara Vera, James Walters, Bristol Ward, David Weloth, William L. Wright, Mitchell Wyatt, Brooke Zaugg, Jared Zaugg. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
November 8, 2017 Filing 20 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Equifax, Equifax Information Services. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #14 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,,,,,,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
November 2, 2017 NOTICE VACATING Initial Pretrial Conference set for December 13, 2017 at 11:00 am before Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Notice generated by clerks office) (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay or, alternatively, for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/2/2017. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by IPT Clerk)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at # http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms, should be prepared 21 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to #ipt@utd.uscourts.gov21 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at # http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/attorney-planning-meeting-and-reportIf counsel or the parties would like to participate by phone they must contact the IPT Clerk at least two days in advance at #ipt@utd.uscourts.gov to make arrangements. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 11:00 AM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (jds) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Christopher Agnew, Chelsea Arnell, Alan B. Bassett, Pamela R. Bassett, Debra Bigler, Emil Bigler, Valencia Vee Bradley, Emil Budilov, Charles Carlson, Clara Carlson, Ethan Chrisman, Tyler Chrisman, Cameron Christensen, Jennifer J. Christensen, Zachary A. Christensen, Zane L. Christensen, Michael C. Clough, Mathew Patterson Coe, Angela Colchin, Christine Coombs, Leo Michael Coombs, Aura Crespo, Atir Edwin, Christopher Enslow, Douglas C. Evans, Janet Evans, Kimbra Flanders, Cheminant M. Flitton, Shenna Gifford, Nosheen T. Hamid, Deborah Hendricks, Donald R. Hensley, Layne A. K. Hill, Nathan P. Hirst, Brent Hughes, Milo Gene Kartchner, Sr, Tamara Ann Kartchner, Michael S. Keenan, Amanda Knudson, Matthew Koehler, Julia Lindsay, Julia Lindsey, John MacInnis, Indra C. Madsen, Mike Madsen, Justin Edison Manco, Julia Mendoza, Nicci Mendoza, Geogory Michael Metzgar, Kimberly Joy C. Metzgar, Alison Moellmer, John Morgan, Julie Morgan, Jerry Nielson, Michelle Nielson, Dana James Normoyle, Sharon Normoyle, Gloria Noster, Russell A. Noster, Pamela Sue Ogden, Dana Oleson, Dana Olson, Brian M. Owens, Sean Parrott, Tom Partridge, Michelle Phillips, Diane Platts, Justin Poarch, Chiaquitta Purnell-Reid, Joseph Raynor, Steven Stonebraker, Theresa Stonebraker, Gene Tabish, Jan Tabish, Fernando Vera, Kara Vera, James Walters, Bristol Ward, David Weloth, William L. Wright, Mitchell Wyatt, Brooke Zaugg, Jared Zaugg, Defendants Equifax, Equifax Information Services. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Christopher Agnew, Chelsea Arnell, Alan B. Bassett, Pamela R. Bassett, Debra Bigler, Emil Bigler, Valencia Vee Bradley, Emil Budilov, Charles Carlson, Clara Carlson, Ethan Chrisman, Tyler Chrisman, Cameron Christensen, Jennifer J. Christensen, Zachary A. Christensen, Zane L. Christensen, Michael C. Clough, Mathew Patterson Coe, Angela Colchin, Christine Coombs, Leo Michael Coombs, Aura Crespo, Atir Edwin, Christopher Enslow, Douglas C. Evans, Janet Evans, Kimbra Flanders, Cheminant M. Flitton, Shenna Gifford, Nosheen T. Hamid, Deborah Hendricks, Donald R. Hensley, Layne A. K. Hill, Nathan P. Hirst, Brent Hughes, Milo Gene Kartchner, Sr, Tamara Ann Kartchner, Michael S. Keenan, Amanda Knudson, Matthew Koehler, Julia Lindsay, Julia Lindsey, John MacInnis, Indra C. Madsen, Mike Madsen, Justin Edison Manco, Julia Mendoza, Nicci Mendoza, Geogory Michael Metzgar, Kimberly Joy C. Metzgar, Alison Moellmer, John Morgan, Julie Morgan, Jerry Nielson, Michelle Nielson, Dana James Normoyle, Sharon Normoyle, Gloria Noster, Russell A. Noster, Pamela Sue Ogden, Dana Oleson, Dana Olson, Brian M. Owens, Sean Parrott, Tom Partridge, Michelle Phillips, Diane Platts, Justin Poarch, Chiaquitta Purnell-Reid, Joseph Raynor, Steven Stonebraker, Theresa Stonebraker, Gene Tabish, Jan Tabish, Fernando Vera, Kara Vera, James Walters, Bristol Ward, David Weloth, William L. Wright, Mitchell Wyatt, Brooke Zaugg, Defendants Equifax, Equifax Information Services. Form due by 11/6/2017. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING of Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Norhtern District of Alabama and For Consolidation Pursuant to 28 USC 1407 in MDL 2800. (jwt) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support or, Alternatively, for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendants Equifax, Equifax Information Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Staying these Proceedings) Attorney Stewart O. Peay added to party Equifax(pty:dft), Attorney Stewart O. Peay added to party Equifax Information Services(pty:dft)(Peay, Stewart) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax, Equifax Information Services with Jury Demand. New Plaintiffs: Chelsea Arnell, Jerry Nielson, Michelle Nielson, Atir Edwin, Nosheen T. Hamid, Kimbra Flanders, Michael C. Clough, Christopher Enslow, Kara Vera, Fernando, Julia Mendoza, Nicci Mendoza, Kimberly Joy C. Metzgar, Geogory Michael Metzgar, Chiaquitta Purnell-Reid, Valencia Vee Bradley, Charles Carlson, Clara Carlson, Justin Poarch, Mathew Patterson Coe, Bristol Ward, Milo Gene Kartchner, Sr., Tamara Ann Kartchner, Dana James Normoyle, Sharon Normoyle, Alan B. Bassett, Pamela R. Bassett, Emil Budilov, Cheminant M. Flitton, Layne A. K. Hill, Amanda Knudson, Matthew Koehler, Michelle Phillips, Russell A. Noster, Gloria Noster, Aura Crespo, Dana Olson, Brian M. Owens, Diane Platts, Justin Poarch, Joseph Raynor, David Weloth, Justin Edison Manco, Steven Stonebraker, Theresa Stonebraker, Shenna Gifford, Julie Morgan, John Morgan, Dana Oleson, Christopher Agnew, Alison Moellmer, Tyler Chrisman, Ethan Chrisman, Michael S. Keenan, Angela Colchin, Deborah Hendricks, James Walters, Jared Zaugg, Brooke Zaugg, Nathan P. Hirst, Sean Parrott, Emil Bigler, Debra Bigler, Mitchell Wyatt, Pamela Sue Ogden, Christine Coombs, Leo Michael Coombs, Mike Madsen, Indra C. Madsen, Brent Hughes, Julia Lindsay, Gene Tabish, Jan Tabish, Julia Lindsey, Douglas C. Evans, Janet Evans, John MacInnis, William L. Wright, Sr., Donald R. Hensley. filed by Tom Partridge, Zane L. Christensen, Zachary A. Christensen, Cameron Christensen, Jennifer J. Christensen. (Christensen, Steven) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING of Notice of Related Action in MDL No. 2800. (jwt) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING of Motion of Plaintiff Barbara Hensley for Transfer of Related Actions to the Easter District of Pennsylvania for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings in MDL No. 2800. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit Part 1 - related case dockets and complaints, #3 Exhibit Part 2 - related dockets and complaints, #4 Amended Proof of Service, #5 Amended Schedule A for Motion to Transfer)(jwt) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING of Interested Party Response to motion to transfer to N.D. GA in MDL No. 2800 (jwt) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING of Notice of Appearance of R. Dean Hartley in MDL No. 2800. (jwt) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING of Notice of Related Actions filed in MDL No. 2800. (jwt) Modified on 9/21/2017 - corrected filing date(jwt). [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING of Filings in MDL 2800 - Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of Georgia, Memorandum in Support, Scheduled of Actions, Response in Support of Transfer of Actions. (Attachments: #1 Response in Support of Transfer of Actions)(jwt) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (lan) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2836962) filed by Tom Partridge, Zane L. Christensen, Zachary A. Christensen, Cameron Christensen, Jennifer J. Christensen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Christensen, Steven) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs Cameron Christensen, Jennifer J. Christensen, Zachary A. Christensen, Zane L. Christensen, Tom Partridge is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (lan) [Transferred from Utah on 12/27/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Partridge et al v. Equifax et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Platts
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Mendoza
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milo Gene Kartchner, Sr.
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Arnell
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiaquitta Purnell-Reid
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Edison Manco
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Stonebraker
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Raynor
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Nielson
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Lindsey
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Weloth
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emil Budilov
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan P. Hirst
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas C. Evans
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geogory Michael Metzgar
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan B. Bassett
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John MacInnis
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R. Hensley
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Oleson
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimbra Flanders
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Hendricks
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Ann Kartchner
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indra C. Madsen
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheminant M. Flitton
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Tabish
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Koehler
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Vera
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Parrott
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Phillips
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Bigler
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Normoyle
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Olson
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Evans
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Sue Ogden
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Colchin
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenna Gifford
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aura Crespo
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Zaugg
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer J. Christensen
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Vera
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicci Mendoza
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Hughes
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Michael Coombs
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Joy C. Metzgar
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Nielson
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Patterson Coe
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Poarch
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Walters
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Tabish
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Stonebraker
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Coombs
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell A. Noster
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Noster
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Wyatt
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana James Normoyle
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Enslow
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emil Bigler
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Wright
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian M. Owens
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Christensen
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Clough
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Zaugg
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Carlson
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol Ward
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Knudson
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Madsen
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary A. Christensen
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Layne A. K. Hill
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Moellmer
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Lindsay
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nosheen T. Hamid
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Keenan
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Chrisman
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atir Edwin
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valencia Vee Bradley
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Carlson
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Agnew
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Chrisman
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Morgan
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Partridge
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela R. Bassett
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Morgan
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Represented By: Stewart O. Peay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services
Represented By: Stewart O. Peay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?