Cathedral Art Metal Co., Inc. v. Divinity Boutique, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Cathedral Art Metal Co., Inc.
Defendant: Divinity Boutique, LLC and Nicole Brayden Gifts, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00141
Filed: January 10, 2018
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William S. Duffey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2018 73 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal 48 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Deadline for Filing Any Motion for Attorneys' Fees [49 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for attorneys fees shall be due fourteen (14) days following issuance of an opinion by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit that resolves Defendants' appeal of the Courts preliminary injunction order. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 5/24/2018. (bgt)
January 26, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 13 is GRANTED. Defendants Divinity Boutique, LLC and Nicole Brayden Gifts, LLC and all of their officers, agents, servants, employees, representatives, successors, assigns, atto rneys, and all other persons acting for, with, by, through, or under authority from Defendants, or in concert or participation with Defendants, be preliminarily enjoined from, and shall immediately stop selling products bearing Plaintiff's AMAZI NG WOMAN trademark, including products that bear the word mark "AMAZING WOMAN" and products that bear a poem entitled "Recipe for an Amazing Woman." Plaintiff Cathedral Art Metal Co., Inc., shall post an injunction bond with the Clerk of Court in the amount of $50,000.00 by the close of business on January 30, 2018. The parties' motions to file matters under seal 16 , 29 , and 39 are GRANTED. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/26/2018. (bgt)
January 12, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 2 is DENIED. Plaintiff shall file its Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 10:00 a.m. on January 16, 2018; Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs motion for Prelim inary Injunction by 10:00 a.m. on January 22, 2018; and Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any, by 10:00 a.m. on January 24, 2018. The parties shall submit a joint discovery plan by 5:00 p.m. on January 16, 2018. The time to respond to written disc overy propounded shall be seven (7) calendar days, and that written discovery shall be served so that responses are due on or before January 24, 2018. The Court will conduct a Preliminary Injunction hearing on January 24, 2018, at 1:00 p.m., in Courtroom 1705, Richard B. Russell Federal Building, 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW, Atlanta, Georgia 30303. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/12/2018. (bgt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cathedral Art Metal Co., Inc. v. Divinity Boutique, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathedral Art Metal Co., Inc.
Represented By: Walter Hill Levie, III
Represented By: Thomas R. Noel
Represented By: Stephen M. Schaetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Divinity Boutique, LLC
Represented By: Charles Marvin Landrum, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Brayden Gifts, LLC
Represented By: Charles Marvin Landrum, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?