Cruzan v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Plaintiff: Nicole Cruzan
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv02895
Filed: June 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Forsyth
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 93 BILL OF COSTS by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Wymer, Martin)
September 23, 2020 Filing 92 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (ah)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/23/2020. (ah)
September 23, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (ah)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
July 23, 2020 Filing 88 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 9-15, 2020, October 21-23, 2020, by Michael Alan Caldwell. (Caldwell, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (rvb) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
April 3, 2020 Filing 83 PROPOSED ORDER Plaintiff's Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re: #73 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing,. (Caldwell, Michael)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (mmc) (ADI)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that the time in which Plaintiff may submit a proposed order in accordance with #73 is extended through and including Friday, April 3, 2020. The Court does not anticipate granting any further extensions Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/27/2020. (ah)
March 27, 2020 Filing 80 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to submit proposed order re: #73 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing, by Nicole Cruzan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Mitchell)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that the time in which the parties may submit a proposed order in accordance with #73 Order is extended through and including Friday, March 27, 2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/18/2020. (ah)
March 18, 2020 Submission of #76 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (jpa)
March 17, 2020 Filing 77 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to submit proposed order re: #73 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing, by Nicole Cruzan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Mitchell)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ah)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that the time in which the parties may submit a proposed order in accordance with #73 is extended through and including March 18, 2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/12/2020. (ah)
March 12, 2020 Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to submit proposed order re: #73 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing, by Nicole Cruzan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Mitchell)
March 4, 2020 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/13/20 (Motions Hrg), before Judge William M. Ray, II. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/25/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (pjm)
February 13, 2020 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2020 TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court directs Mr. Benjamin to send a copy of Plaintiff's deposition video for the Court's review. The Court asks each side to prepare a substantive proposed order and email them to the Court in 30 days. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(jkl)
January 28, 2020 Submission of #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (rlb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 72 REPLY BRIEF re #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts - Defendant's Supplemental Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibit A - 6-20-17 Meeting Transcript, #3 Statement of Material Facts - Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Amended and Substituted Statement of Additional Material Facts)(Wymer, Martin)
January 16, 2020 Filing 71 AMENDED RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nicole Cruzan. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts : Plaintiff's Amended and Substituted Response to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Statement of Material Facts : Plaintiff's Amended and Substituted Statement of Additional Material Facts, #3 Exhibit : Excerpts from Deposition of Plaintiff Nicole Cruzan, #4 Exhibit : Excerpts from Cecelia Henley's April 2019 Deposition, #5 Exhibit : Excerpt from Deposition of James McAnally, #6 Exhibit : Excerpt from Timothy Cooper's April 2019 Deposition)(Caldwell, Michael)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File to File Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is allowed an extra seven (7) days. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/9/20. (rlb)
January 8, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents out of Time by Nicole Cruzan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Caldwell)(Caldwell, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 68 DEPOSITION of Timothy Cooper taken on April 19, 2019 by Nicole Cruzan.(Caldwell, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 67 DEPOSITION of James McAnally taken on April 19, 2019 by Nicole Cruzan.(Caldwell, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to Declaration of Nicole Cruzan by Nicole Cruzan re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 141, #2 Exhibit 142, #3 Exhibit 143, #4 Exhibit 144, #5 Exhibit 145, #6 Exhibit 146, #7 Exhibit 147 part 1, #8 Exhibit 147 part 2, #9 Exhibit 147 part 3, #10 Exhibit 147 part 4, #11 Exhibit 147 part 5, #12 Exhibit 147 part 6)(Caldwell, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to Declaration of Nicole Cruzan by Nicole Cruzan re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 121, #2 Exhibit 122, #3 Exhibit 123, #4 Exhibit 124, #5 Exhibit 125, #6 Exhibit 126, #7 Exhibit 127, #8 Exhibit 128, #9 Exhibit 129, #10 Exhibit 130, #11 Exhibit 131, #12 Exhibit 132, #13 Exhibit 133, #14 Exhibit 134, #15 Exhibit 135, #16 Exhibit 136, #17 Exhibit 137, #18 Exhibit 138, #19 Exhibit 139, #20 Exhibit 140)(Caldwell, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to Declaration of Nicole Cruzan by Nicole Cruzan re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 101, #2 Exhibit 102, #3 Exhibit 103, #4 Exhibit 104, #5 Exhibit 105, #6 Exhibit 106, #7 Exhibit 107 part 1, #8 Exhibit 107 part 2, #9 Exhibit 107 part 3, #10 Exhibit 107 part 4, #11 Exhibit 107 part 5, #12 Exhibit 107 part 6, #13 Exhibit 108, #14 Exhibit 109, #15 Exhibit 110, #16 Exhibit 111, #17 Exhibit 112, #18 Exhibit 113, #19 Exhibit 114, #20 Exhibit 115, #21 Exhibit 116, #22 Exhibit 117, #23 Exhibit 118, #24 Exhibit 119, #25 Exhibit 120)(Caldwell, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to Declaration of Nicole Cruzan by Nicole Cruzan re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 81, #2 Exhibit 82, #3 Exhibit 83, #4 Exhibit 84, #5 Exhibit 85, #6 Exhibit 86, #7 Exhibit 87, #8 Exhibit 88, #9 Exhibit 89, #10 Exhibit 90, #11 Exhibit 91, #12 Exhibit 92, #13 Exhibit 93, #14 Exhibit 94, #15 Exhibit 95, #16 Exhibit 96, #17 Exhibit 97, #18 Exhibit 98, #19 Exhibit 99, #20 Exhibit 100)(Caldwell, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to Declaration of Nicole Cruzan by Nicole Cruzan re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 61, #2 Exhibit 62, #3 Exhibit 63, #4 Exhibit 64, #5 Exhibit 65, #6 Exhibit 66, #7 Exhibit 67, #8 Exhibit 68, #9 Exhibit 69, #10 Exhibit 70, #11 Exhibit 71, #12 Exhibit 72, #13 Exhibit 73, #14 Exhibit 74, #15 Exhibit 75, #16 Exhibit 76, #17 Exhibit 77, #18 Exhibit 78, #19 Exhibit 79, #20 Exhibit 80)(Caldwell, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to Declaration of Nicole Cruzan by Nicole Cruzan re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit 42, #3 Exhibit 43, #4 Exhibit 44, #5 Exhibit 45, #6 Exhibit 46, #7 Exhibit 47, #8 Exhibit 48, #9 Exhibit 49, #10 Exhibit 50, #11 Exhibit 51, #12 Exhibit 52, #13 Exhibit 53, #14 Exhibit 54, #15 Exhibit 55 part 1, #16 Exhibit 55 part 2, #17 Exhibit 55 part 3, #18 Exhibit 56, #19 Exhibit 57, #20 Exhibit 58, #21 Exhibit 59, #22 Exhibit 60)(Caldwell, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to Declaration of Nicole Cruzan by Nicole Cruzan re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 29, #10 Exhibit 30, #11 Exhibit 31, #12 Exhibit 32, #13 Exhibit 33, #14 Exhibit 34, #15 Exhibit 35, #16 Exhibit 36, #17 Exhibit 37, #18 Exhibit 38, #19 Exhibit 39, #20 Exhibit 40)(Caldwell, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to Declaration of Nicole Cruzan by Nicole Cruzan re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Caldwell, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nicole Cruzan. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Declaration of Nicole Cruzan, #3 Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Material Facts)(Caldwell, Michael)
December 27, 2019 Filing 57 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): January 13, 2020, January 16, 2020, February 3-5, 2020, February 25-March 3, 2020, June 11-12, 2020, by Michael Alan Caldwell. (Caldwell, Michael)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #49 Motion for Summary Judgment. The time in which Plaintiff may file a response is extended through and including January 6, 2020 with a corresponding extension for Defendant's reply through January 27, 2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/10/19. (rlb)
December 9, 2019 Filing 55 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re: #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Nicole Cruzan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Mitchell)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Setting Hearing on #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Thursday, February, 13, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/25/19. (rlb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE Of Filing Cecelia Henley 10-15-2019 Deposition Transcript by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cecelia Henley 10-15-*2019 Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit 1)(Wymer, Martin)
November 25, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE Of Filing Cecelia Henley 04-19-2019 Deposition Transcript by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cecelia Henley 04-19-2019 Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18)(Wymer, Martin)
November 25, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE Of Filing Nicole Cruzan 02-07-2019 Deposition Transcript by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nicole Cruzan 02-07-2019 Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 25, #25 Exhibit 26, #26 Exhibit 27, #27 Exhibit 28, #28 Exhibit 29, #29 Exhibit 30, #30 Exhibit 31, #31 Exhibit 32, #32 Exhibit 33, #33 Exhibit 34, #34 Exhibit 35, #35 Exhibit 36, #36 Exhibit 37, #37 Exhibit 38, #38 Exhibit 39, #39 Exhibit 40, #40 Exhibit 41, #41 Exhibit 42, #42 Exhibit 43, #43 Exhibit 44, #44 Exhibit 45)(Wymer, Martin)
November 25, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE Of Filing Deposition Transcript of Timothy Cooper - 10-15-2019 by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Timothy Cooper 10-15-2019 Deposition Transcript)(Wymer, Martin)
November 25, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Material Facts Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Cecelia Henley, #4 Exhibit B - Cited Pages from April 19, 2019 Deposition of Cecelia Henley, #5 Exhibit C - Declaration of Timothy Cooper, #6 Exhibit D - Cited Pages from October 15, 2019 Deposition of Cecelia Henley, #7 Exhibit E - Declaration of James McAnally, #8 Exhibit F - Cited Pages from October 15, 2019 Deposition of Cecelia Henley, #9 Exhibit G - Cited Pages from Deposition of Nicole Cruzan, #10 Exhibit H - Declaration of Lisa Wallace, #11 Exhibit I - Grant v. Dominion East Ohio Gas, 2004-SOX-63, 41 (ALJ Mar. 10, 2005))(Wymer, Martin) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time. The dispositive motion deadline is extended for 10 days up to and including November 25, 2019. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/4/19. (rlb)
November 1, 2019 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositve Motion by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Wymer, Martin)
October 1, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company filed by Nicole Cruzan (Caldwell, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Serving Discovery and Certificate of Service (Plaintiff's 3rd Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant) by Nicole Cruzan.(Caldwell, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE and Certificate of Serving Discovery: Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Nicole Cruzan.(Caldwell, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE Of Filing of Subpoena by Nicole Cruzan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit : Subpoena to DXC Technology Services, LLC)(Caldwell, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 42 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 5, 2019, October 7, 2019, October 25-30, 2019, November 11-14, 2019, November 26-December 3, 2019, by Michael Alan Caldwell. (Caldwell, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alan Caldwell on behalf of Nicole Cruzan (Caldwell, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Douglas Benjamin on behalf of Nicole Cruzan (Benjamin, Mitchell)
July 17, 2019 Filing 39 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Porsche D. Austin replacing attorney Porsche D. Austin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Austin, Porsche)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Gordon Johnston as counsel for Plaintiff and to update the docket to reflect contact information for Plaintiff. The Court also ORDERS discovery be extended through and including October 15, 2019. Motions for summary judgment are due November 15, 2019; if none are filed, the proposed pretrial order is due November 15, 2019 and parties must be prepared to proceed with trial. Attorney Gordon S. Johnston terminated. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 7/9/19. (rlb)
July 9, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nicole Cruzan re #38 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (rlb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 37 Second MOTION to Withdraw Gordon S. Johnston as Attorneyby Nicole Cruzan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Notice of Withdrawal)(Johnston, Gordon)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO WITHDRAW: Plaintiff's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw and Extend Discovery #34 is DENIED because the motion to withdraw is conditioned upon what would be the fourth extension of discovery in this case. While the Court reserves the right to grant a motion to withdraw, the current Motion which is based on another extension of discovery, without a demonstration as to what the conflict is and why it has occurred, is DENIED. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 7/5/19. (rlb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Support re #34 MOTION to Withdraw Gordon S. Johnston as Attorney MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiff's Consent to Withdrawal filed by Nicole Cruzan. (Johnston, Gordon)
June 28, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw Gordon S. Johnston as Attorney and to Extend Discovery by Nicole Cruzan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Withdrawal)(Johnston, Gordon) . Added MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery on 7/1/2019 (rlb).
June 18, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Defendant 30(b)(6) filed by Nicole Cruzan (Johnston, Gordon)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: It is ordered that the Motion #31 is GRANTED, and that the discovery deadline is extended for 30 days up to and including July 15, 2019, and the dispositive motion deadline is extended until August 19, 2019. Those dates triggered by the close of discovery are also extended by thirty days. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 6/4/19. (rlb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Wymer, Martin)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery deadline is extended for 30 days up to and including June 14, 2019. Those dates triggered by the close of discovery are also extended by thirty days. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 5/8/19. (rlb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Wymer, Martin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Deposition, C.Henley by Nicole Cruzan.(Johnston, Gordon)
April 16, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Deposition, J. MacAnally by Nicole Cruzan.(Johnston, Gordon)
April 16, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Deposition, T. Cooper by Nicole Cruzan.(Johnston, Gordon)
March 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James McAnally filed by Nicole Cruzan (Johnston, Gordon)
March 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Timothy Cooper filed by Nicole Cruzan (Johnston, Gordon)
March 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cecelia Henley filed by Nicole Cruzan (Johnston, Gordon)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery deadline is extended for two months up to and including May 15, 2019. Those dates triggered by the close of discovery are also extended by two months. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 2/20/2019. (bnp)
February 20, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Nicole Cruzan. (Johnston, Gordon)
January 23, 2019 Filing 20 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nicole Cruzan filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Wymer, Martin)
November 20, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Combined First Request for Admissions, First Interrogatories and First Request for Documents to Defendant by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company.(Wymer, Martin)
October 30, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge William M Ray, II. Judge Leigh Martin May no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-02895-WMR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (btql)
October 22, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Response to Interrogatories by Nicole Cruzan.(Johnston, Gordon)
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Response to First Requests for Production by Nicole Cruzan.(Johnston, Gordon)
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nicole Cruzan filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Wymer, Martin)
October 4, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Combined First Request For Admision, Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Nicole Cruzan.(Johnston, Gordon)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company.(Wymer, Martin)
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 Initial Disclosures by Nicole Cruzan.(Johnston, Gordon)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 Initial Disclosures by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company.(Wymer, Martin)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER re #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 3/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/23/2019. Pre-Trial Order due thirty (30) days after the Court rules on dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/5/18. (hfm)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Wymer, Martin)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. Discovery ends on 1/14/2019.(Wymer, Martin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Nicole Cruzan. (Johnston, Gordon)
August 8, 2018 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
August 6, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Martin T. Wymer Pro Hac Vice (per rb) (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8050383). Attorney Martin T. Wymer added appearing on behalf of Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (pmb)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Martin T. Wymer. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 08/06/2018. (rvb)
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Martin T. Wymer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8050383)by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Austin, Porsche)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company Answer due 8/17/2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/24/18. (hfm)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Austin, Porsche)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Porsche D. Austin on behalf of Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Austin, Porsche)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/26/2018. (btql)
June 14, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (eop)
June 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Nicole Cruzan. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-7946454) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruzan v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Cruzan
Represented By: Gordon S. Johnston
Represented By: Michael Alan Caldwell
Represented By: Mitchell Douglas Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Represented By: Eric Leroy Barnum
Represented By: Martin T. Wymer
Represented By: Porsche D. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?