Monroe El et al v. Ferdinand et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Dianne Brown Lee and Marva Melissa Monroe El
Defendant: Carla Jackson and Arthur E. Ferdinand
Case Number: 1:2018cv03220
Filed: July 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2018 Submission of #1 ,Motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (aar)
July 5, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-05548. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 27, 2018 Mailed a copy of #4 Order to Marva Melissa Monroe El P.O. Box 92166 Atlanta, GA 30314 Patricia Dianne Brown Lee P.O. Box 92166 Atlanta, GA 30060. (mhe) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/5/2018.]
June 26, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Georgia (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/5/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #4 Order to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/5/2018.]
June 26, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/5/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiffs, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. Whether Plaintiffs should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes the case in the Southern District of New York. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/26/2018) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/5/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/5/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Arthur E. Ferdinand, Carla Jackson. Document filed by Marva Melissa Monroe El, Patricia Dianne Brown Lee.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/5/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Patricia Dianne Brown Lee.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/5/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Marva Melissa Monroe El.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/5/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe El et al v. Ferdinand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Dianne Brown Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marva Melissa Monroe El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur E. Ferdinand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?