Tissue Regeneration Technologies, LLC et al v. The Anti-Aging Group, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: General Patent, LLC and Tissue Regeneration Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Fayette Executive Health Services, Inc., Taylor Medical Wellness, Weight Loss and Aesthetic Group, Health Gain Solutions, Earl Eye, The Anti-Aging Group, L.L.C., Richard Gaines, Ava Bell-Taylor, Sexual MD Solutions LLC and Eldred Taylor
Case Number: 1:2018cv03482
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
County: Cherokee
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jpa)
July 25, 2018 Filing 14 PROPOSED AO 120 Amended. (Piland, Paul)
July 24, 2018 Filing 13 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jpa)
July 23, 2018 Filing 12 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Piland, Paul)
July 23, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/20/2018. (bgt)
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Eldred Taylor. (eop)
July 20, 2018 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Earl Eye. (eop)
July 20, 2018 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Health Gain Solutions. (eop)
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Fayette Executive Health Services, Inc.. (eop)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ava Bell-Taylor. (eop)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Taylor Medical Wellness, Weight Loss and Aesthetic Group. (eop)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Richard Gaines. (eop)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sexual MD Solutions LLC. (eop)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Anti-Aging Group, L.L.C.. (eop)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tissue Regeneration Technologies, LLC and General Patent, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8024436) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tissue Regeneration Technologies, LLC et al v. The Anti-Aging Group, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayette Executive Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Medical Wellness, Weight Loss and Aesthetic Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Gain Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Eye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Anti-Aging Group, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ava Bell-Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sexual MD Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldred Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Patent, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Piland
Represented By: Richard Randolph Edwards, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tissue Regeneration Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Piland
Represented By: Richard Randolph Edwards, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?