The City of Atlanta v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Plaintiff: The City of Atlanta
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., PSS World Medical, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Allergan PLC, Attain Med, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Amarc Medical Clinic, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen's Boots Alliance, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Bloodworth Wholesale Drugs, Ind., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Scott Fishman, CVS Health Corporation, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Medicine Center Pharmacy, Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc., Perry Fine, J.M. Smith Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Purdue Pharma, LP, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Lynn Webster and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03508
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Submission of #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
September 11, 2018 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Mazziotti, Thomas)
September 4, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Crumby on behalf of Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (Crumby, Daniel)
August 31, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - City of Atlanta - Opp to Motion to Remand)(Cole, Brenton)
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Mazziotti on behalf of Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (Mazziotti, Thomas)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Retail Pharmacy Defendants' #13 Motion to Stay. All proceedings, preliminary requirements, and filing deadlines in this action under this Courts local rules, including Initial Disclosures, Early Planning Conference, and Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, are STAYED until 45 days after the final determination of removal of this action to federal court or transfer to the multidistrict litigation pending in the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/20/2018. (rjs)
August 20, 2018 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Remand Or Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation 2804 by Walgreen's Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Daxe, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by The City of Atlanta. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Edmond, Roderick)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Bloodworth Wholesale Drugs, Ind. Answer due 9/21/2018. The parties are advised that all future joint/consent motions must be accompanied by a proposed order. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/1/2018. (pdw)
July 31, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons by J.M. Smith Corporation. (Penna, Christopher)
July 31, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.M. Smith Corporation by J.M. Smith Corporation.(Penna, Christopher)
July 31, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses and OCGA 51-12-33 Notice by J.M. Smith Corporation. Discovery ends on 12/28/2018.(Penna, Christopher) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Bloodworth Wholesale Drugs, Ind.. (Hayes, David)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Ortho- McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. shall have up to 45 days following any decision on a motion for remand that Plaintiff may file or final decision by the JPML transferring the case to In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL No. 2804 (N.D. Ohio) to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/30/2018. (rjs)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED, that CVS Health Corporation, Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., The Kroger Co., Wal-Mart Inc. and Walgreen's Boots Alliance, Inc.'s time to move, answer, object, or otherwise to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 45 days following the final determination of removal of this action to federal court or transfer to the multidistrict litigation pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/30/2018. (rjs)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that the period in which Defendants Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation and PSS World Medical, Inc. must answer, object, plead, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 30 days after the later of (i) the JPML's order granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise renders a final decision denying transfer to the MDL, or (ii) this Court's ruling on remand, should any party file a motion to remand. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/30/2018. (rjs)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cole, Brenton)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Walgreen's Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Daxe, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, and PSS World Medical, Inc. to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by McKesson Corporation, PSS World Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order)(Knapp, Halsey)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Endo Health Solutions, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8026969) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Exhibit -3, #4 Exhibit -4, #5 Exhibit -5)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of Atlanta v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: J. Matthew Donohue
Represented By: Joseph L. Franco
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Jennifer Grandoff Cooper
Represented By: Sean Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSS World Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Seth A. Litman
Represented By: Martin Louis Roth
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Seth A. Litman
Represented By: Martin Louis Roth
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attain Med, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarc Medical Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Jennifer Grandoff Cooper
Represented By: Sean Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen's Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Daxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloodworth Wholesale Drugs, Ind.
Represented By: David Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Crumby
Represented By: Thomas J. Mazziotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Represented By: Chad Allan Shultz
Represented By: Cecily J. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicine Center Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Crumby
Represented By: Thomas J. Mazziotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Chad Allan Shultz
Represented By: Cecily J. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Derek A. Mendicino
Represented By: Christopher Edward Penna
Represented By: David Cousins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, LP
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Chad Allan Shultz
Represented By: Cecily J. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Atlanta
Represented By: Jeffrey Brenton Norman
Represented By: Daniel R. Meachum
Represented By: Nina Hickson Perry
Represented By: Roderick E. Edmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?