Washington v. Skechers USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: La'Ketra Washington
Defendant: Daniel Siegel and Skechers USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03731
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: De Kalb
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Skechers USA, Inc. and Daniel Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Nekia) Modified on 10/1/2018 to add filer (jpa).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants shall have an additional 14 days to respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand through September 28, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the time for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is extended. In the event that this case is not remanded to state court, Defendants shall have 14 days following the ruling on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand to respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/7/18. (jpa)
September 7, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time File Responses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Motion to Remand re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #13 Amended Complaint, with Brief In Support by Skechers USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Johnson, Michelle)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only). In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Dkt. #13 ), Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dkts. #6 , #7 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/4/2018. (bgt)
August 31, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by La'Ketra Washington.(McCabe, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by La'Ketra Washington. (McCabe, James)
August 28, 2018 Submission of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpa)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the parties' #10 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and Related Proceedings. Discovery and all other deadlines in this matter are held in abeyance pending the Court's rulings on the Plaintiff's prospective Motion to Remand and/or the Defendants' pending Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/21/18. (ddm)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Related Proceedings with Brief In Support by Daniel Siegel, Skechers USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Nekia)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. In the event that this case is not remanded to state court, Plaintiff shall have 14 days following the ruling on Plaintiff's forthcoming Motion to Remand to respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/15/18. (jpa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by La'Ketra Washington. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McCabe, James)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Daniel Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Jones, Nekia)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Skechers USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Jones, Nekia)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting Defendants' #3 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal Exhibits A and B to the Notice of Removal #1 . Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/8/2018. (bgt)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Daniel Siegel, Skechers USA, Inc.. (Johnson, Michelle)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to Notice of Removal by Daniel Siegel, Skechers USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Nekia)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #1 Notice of Removal,,, by Daniel Siegel, Skechers USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Nekia)
August 7, 2018 Clerks Notation approving #5 CIP/CDS. (bgt)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/6/18. (ddm)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Siegel, Skechers USA, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-8057860) (Attachments: SEALED #1 Exhibit A, #2 SEALED Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 8/6/2018 to restrict Exhibit B per call from attorney; Motion to Seal & redacted copy to be filed. (cmd) Modified on 8/6/2018 to restrict Exhibt A per call from attorney; Motion to Seal & redacted copy to be filed (bnw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Skechers USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Siegel
Represented By: Michelle W. Johnson
Represented By: Nekia Hackworth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skechers USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle W. Johnson
Represented By: Nekia Hackworth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Ketra Washington
Represented By: James Metzger McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?