Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Barner et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: The Station Venue, Inc., Takela L. Barner and Shariph L. Bell
Case Number: 1:2018cv03789
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by The Station Venue, Inc. Discovery ends on 2/22/2019.(jkl) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. The Station Venue, Inc. served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Shariph L. Bell served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
August 10, 2018 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 AO Form 121 mailed to Registrar. (ddm)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (ddm)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Takela L. Barner, Shariph L. Bell, The Station Venue, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ddm)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8066535) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Barner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Station Venue, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takela L. Barner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shariph L. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?