Ultravision Technologies, LLC v. Formetco, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ultravision Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Formetco, Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: RMG Networks Holding Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric Power Products, Inc. and Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv03814
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Ultravision Technologies, LLC.(Risley, Stephen)
September 26, 2018 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Formetco, Inc..(Sudderth, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 42 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Jacob S. Wharton 's #39 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/10/18. (jkl)
September 10, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Jacob S. Wharton re #41 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkl)
September 10, 2018 Refund in the amount of $150.00 has been processed, effective 9/10/2018 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
September 7, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #39 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacob S. Wharton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8124415). Attorney David Scott Sudderth added appearing on behalf of Formetco, Inc. (jkm)
September 6, 2018 Clerks Approval re #40 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mmc)
September 5, 2018 Filing 40 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113E-8123215. (Sudderth, David)
September 5, 2018 Filing 39 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacob S. Wharton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8124415)by Formetco, Inc.. (Sudderth, David)
August 28, 2018 Filing 38 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jacob S. Wharton. Clerk to follow-up by 9/27/2018. (pmb)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Vincent J. Rubino, III 's #30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/23/18. (jkl)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Lawrence C. Drucker 's #28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8//2/318. (jkl)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting Alfred R. Fabricant's #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/23/18. (jkl)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting Peter Lambrianakos's #29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/23/18. (jkl)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Alessandra Carcaterra Messing's #25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/23/18. (jkl)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting Joseph M. Mercadante 's #27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/23/18. (jkl)
August 23, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Joseph M. Mercadante and Alessandra Carcaterra Messing #33 Order on Application for Admission PHV, #32 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkl)
August 22, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #30 APPLICATION for Admission of Vincent J. Rubino, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079363). Attorney Vincent J. Rubino, III added appearing on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (pmb)
August 22, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #28 APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence C. Drucker Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079338). Attorney Lawrence C. Drucker added appearing on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (pmb)
August 22, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #25 APPLICATION for Admission of Alessandra Carcaterra Messing Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079297). Attorney Alessandra Carcaterra Messing added appearing on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (pmb)
August 22, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #29 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter Lambrianakos Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079358). Attorney Peter Lambrianakos added appearing on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (pmb)
August 22, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph M. Mercadante Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079328). Attorney Joseph M. Mercadante added appearing on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (pmb)
August 22, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Alfred R. Fabricant Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079320). Attorney Alfred R. Fabricant added appearing on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (pmb)
August 15, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by David Scott Sudderth on behalf of Formetco, Inc. (Sudderth, David)
August 14, 2018 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Admission of Vincent J. Rubino, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079363)by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Risley, Stephen)
August 14, 2018 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission of Peter Lambrianakos Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079358)by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Risley, Stephen)
August 14, 2018 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence C. Drucker Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079338)by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Risley, Stephen)
August 14, 2018 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph M. Mercadante Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079328)by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Risley, Stephen)
August 14, 2018 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Alfred R. Fabricant Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079320)by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Risley, Stephen)
August 14, 2018 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission of Alessandra Carcaterra Messing Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8079297)by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Risley, Stephen)
August 14, 2018 Submission of #12 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, to Transfer, and Supporting Brief, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jkl)
August 13, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Robert Risley on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Risley, Stephen)
August 10, 2018 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00098. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECONSOLIDATION AND TRANSFER ORDER - RMG Networks Holding Corporation (Consolidated Civil Action 2:18cv109), Mitsubishi Electric Corporation (Consolidated Civil Action 2:18cv105) and Mitsubishi Electric Power Products, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:18cv105) terminated., Attorney Jon Collins Rice; Jeffrey Lance Johnson and Robert Gary Pluta terminated., Case association terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/9/2018. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2018 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/8/2018. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:18-cv-00098. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/7/2018. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 19 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, to Transfer, and Supporting Brief filed by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, to Transfer, and Supporting Brief filed by Formetco, Inc.. (Wharton, Jacob) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, to Transfer, and Supporting Brief filed by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Formetco, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative to Transfer (Dkt. No. 12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/11/2018. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Formetco, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative to Transfer (Dkt. No. 12) by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File its Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative to Transfer (Dkt. No. 12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/21/2018. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File its Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative to Transfer (Dkt. No. 12) by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, to Transfer, and Supporting Brief by Formetco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matthew Xander, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wharton, Jacob) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. Formetco, Inc. served on 5/23/2018, answer due 6/13/2018. (Fabricant, Alfred) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Formetco, Inc.. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/3/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Rubino, Vincent) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Michael Mercadante on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Mercadante, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alessandra Carcaterra Messing on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Messing, Alessandra) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ultravision Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ultravision Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Aral Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent A&A LED Technologies, LLC for Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Formetco, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6715569.), filed by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]
March 27, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/10/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ultravision Technologies, LLC v. Formetco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: RMG Networks Holding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Power Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultravision Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Alfred R. Fabricant
Represented By: Vincent J. Rubino, III
Represented By: Peter Lambrianakos
Represented By: Lawrence C. Drucker
Represented By: Joseph M. Mercadante
Represented By: Stephen Robert Risley
Represented By: Alessandra Carcaterra Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Formetco, Inc.
Represented By: David Scott Sudderth
Represented By: Jacob S. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?