Royal v. City of Atlanta et al

Plaintiff: John C. Royal
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development and City of Atlanta
Case Number: 1:2018cv03820
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to John C. Royal re #4 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (btql)
August 30, 2018 Submission of #5 Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg for frivolity review. (btql)
August 30, 2018 5 COMPLAINT (Request for Documents) filed by John C. Royal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, it is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at thepresent time, and the Clerk shall submit this file to the assigned district judge for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/30/2018. (btql)
August 29, 2018 Submission of #3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (jtj)
August 27, 2018 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John C. Royal. (jtj)
August 15, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to John C. Royal re #2 Order and IFP application. (jtj)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon plaintiff's filing of a new application to proceed in forma pauperis or the expiration of 14 days from the date of this Order, whichever first occurs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/15/2018. (jtj)
August 13, 2018 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (ddm)
August 10, 2018 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John C. Royal. (Attachments: #1 Request, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal v. City of Atlanta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Atlanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Royal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?