Hendricks v. Lakeside at Arbor Place Master Lessee, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert A. Hendricks, IV
Defendant: Jean Marie Wagner and Lakeside at Arbor Place Master Lessee, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03889
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 Withdrawal of Motion #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert A. Hendricks, IV. (Winterich, Shawn)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Substitute Party. Lakeside at Arbor Place Master Lessee, LLC replaces Jean Marie Wagner as defendant.. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/2/18. (jkl)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant from Jean Marie Wagner, Trustee, to Lakeside at Arbor Place Master Lessee, LLCby Robert A. Hendricks, IV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winterich, Shawn)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 FILED IN ERROR Consent MOTION to Substitute Party from Jean Marie Wagner, as Trustee for Lakeside at Arbor Place DST to Lakeside at Arbor Place Master Lessee, LLCby Robert A. Hendricks, IV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winterich, Shawn) Modified on 10/2/2018 to terminate motion (jkl).
September 28, 2018 Clerks Notation re #9 Leave of Absence September 28, 2018; October 1, October 19-29, 2018; November 19-26, 2018; December 21, 2018 - January 3, 2019, by Shawn Michael Winterich. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by S. Winteerich on these dates. (ss)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 28, 2018; October 1, October 19-29, 2018; November 19-26, 2018; December 21, 2018 - January 3, 2019, by Shawn Michael Winterich. (Winterich, Shawn)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing EXHIBITS to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert A. Hendricks, IV (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Overview photo, #2 Exhibit Collapsing pipe from interior photo, #3 Exhibit Collapsing pipe from interior photo, #4 Exhibit Collapsing pipe from interior photo, #5 Exhibit Stress cracks in parking lot photo, #6 Exhibit Grassy sunken area photo, #7 Exhibit Grassy sunken area photo, #8 Exhibit Non-working trash rack photo, #9 Exhibit Non-working trash rack photo, #10 Exhibit Engulfed cement pad photo, #11 Exhibit Overflowing spillway photo, #12 Exhibit Survey images, #13 Exhibit Hydrology texts, #14 Exhibit Deed copies, #15 Exhibit Notices between parties)(Winterich, Shawn) Modified on 9/26/2018 (jkl).
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Robert A. Hendricks, IV. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Injunction, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Robert A. Hendricks, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Winterich, Shawn)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Shawn Michael Winterich replacing attorney Bryan P. Hilton. (Winterich, Shawn)
September 7, 2018 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Robert A. Hendricks, IV. (Winterich, Shawn)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Michael Winterich on behalf of Robert A. Hendricks, IV (Winterich, Shawn)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jean Marie Wagner. Discovery ends on 1/22/2019.(Caplan, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 20, 2018 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Jean Marie Wagner. (eop)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Jean Marie Wagner. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8081885) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit -B - State Court Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. Lakeside at Arbor Place Master Lessee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Hendricks, IV
Represented By: Bryan P. Hilton
Represented By: Shawn Michael Winterich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Marie Wagner
Represented By: Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Represented By: Michael A. Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeside at Arbor Place Master Lessee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?