Crowder v. The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan, et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Crowder
Defendant: The Administrative Subcommittee of the Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan, Delta Air Lines, Inc., John Does 1-10, Vesta Crowder, The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan, Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC and The Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04083
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Orinda D Evans
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to DELTA AIR LINES, INC., THE ADMINISTRATIVE SUBCOMMITTEE OF THE DELTA AIR LINES, INC. FAMILY-CARE SAVINGS PLAN and VESTA CROWDER, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i), with each party bearing their own costs and attorneys' fees. (ddm)
October 22, 2018 Filing 19 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC, The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan filed by Wanda Crowder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plan, #2 Exhibit SPD)(Sharman, Paul) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 22, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to DELTA AIR LINES, INC., THE ADMINISTRATIVE SUBCOMMITTEE OF THE DELTA AIR LINES, INC. FAMILY-CARE SAVINGS PLAN and VESTA CROWDER filed by Wanda Crowder (Sharman, Paul)
October 19, 2018 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure by Vesta Crowder. (Pridgen, Nancy)
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Vesta Crowder. (Pridgen, Nancy)
October 19, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC, The Administrative Subcommittee of the Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan, The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan identifying Corporate Parent FMR LLC for Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC. (McDonald, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I-III and VI-VII of Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC, The Administrative Subcommittee of the Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan, The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss - Declaration of Connie Schultz, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Connie Schultz - Delta Family-Care Savings Plan, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Connie Schultz - Summary Plan Description, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Connie Schultz - Complaint for Divorce, #6 Exhibit B to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss - Slakman v. Admin Comm of Delta Air Lines Inc.)(McDonald, John)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING the Parties' #11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended up to and including October 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 9/27/2018. (sap)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Filing Proposed Order by Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC, The Administrative Subcommittee of the Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan, The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan re #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonald, John)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC, The Administrative Subcommittee of the Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan, The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan. (McDonald, John)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy B. Pridgen on behalf of Vesta Crowder (Pridgen, Nancy)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Wanda Crowder. Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018; Vesta Crowder served on 9/1/2018, answer due 9/24/2018; Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018; Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018; The Administrative Subcommittee of the Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018; The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Sharman, Paul)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC. (sap)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Wanda Crowder (Sharman, Paul)
August 31, 2018 Submission of #1 Complaint for Review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Vesta Crowder. (eop)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Administrative Subcommittee of the Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan. (eop)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (eop)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan. (eop)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (eop)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wanda Crowder. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8110883) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - Plan, #2 Exhibit -B - SPD, #3 Exhibit -C - Call Log, #4 Exhibit -D - 12132016 Fidelity Appeal, #5 Exhibit -E - 01312017 Delta Response, #6 Exhibit - F - 04252017 Delta Response, #7 Exhibit - G - 05032017 Fidelity Appeal, #8 Exhibit - H - 08172017 Subcommittee Appeal, #9 Exhibit - I - 11172017 Delta Response, #10 Exhibit - J - 11212017 Response to Delta, #11 Exhibit - K - 12202017 Delta Response, #12 Exhibit - L - 01092018 Committee Appeal, #13 Exhibit -M - 03062018 Delta Request, #14 Exhibit - N - 03232018 Supplemental Appeal, #15 Exhibit - O - 07262018 Delta Final Denial, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowder v. The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Crowder
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Administrative Subcommittee of the Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vesta Crowder
Represented By: Nancy B. Pridgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Delta Air Lines, Inc. Family-Care Savings Plan
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?